Chiquita Fresh North America L.L.C. v. Green Transport Company et al
Plaintiff: Chiquita Fresh North America L.L.C.
Defendant: Green Transport Company and John Greene Logistics Company
Case Number: 4:2011cv06683
Filed: December 28, 2011
Court: U.S. District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: Oakland Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: Donna M. Ryu
Nature of Suit: Other Contract
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 19, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 111 ORDER DISMISSING CASE. The court having been advised that the parties have agreed to a settlement of this case, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that this case is dismissed in its entirety with prejudice; provided, however, that if any party hereto shall cert ify to this court, within 60 days, with proof of service of a copy thereon to opposing counsel, that the agreed consideration for said settlement has not been delivered over, the foregoing Order shall stand vacated and this case shall forthwith be restored to the calendar to be set for trial. All further dates are vacated. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 03/19/14. (dmrlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/19/2014)
February 26, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 107 ORDER. By March 10, 2014, GTC shall either oppose Plaintiff's proposed entry of partial judgment 105 or file a notice of non-opposition to it. If GTC opposes entry of partial judgment, Plaintiff shall respond within one week of GTC's opposition.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 02/26/14. (dmrlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/26/2014)
December 17, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 96 Order by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu granting 95 Discovery Letter Brief.(dmrlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/17/2013)
October 23, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 92 Order by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu granting in part and denying in part 72 Motion for Breach of Contract Damages.(dmrlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/23/2013)
September 24, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 88 ORDER TO RE-FILE REDACTED INVOICES. Plaintiff is ordered to redo the redactions to 75 and re-file the redacted invoices by Monday, September 30, 2013. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 09/24/13. (dmrlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/24/2013)
September 20, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 87 ORDER TO LODGE UNREDACTED INVOICES WITH THE COURT FOR IN CAMERA REVIEW. Plaintiff is ordered to lodge unredacted copies of the invoices presented in Plaintiff's Request for Judicial Notice in Support of Motion for Breach of Contract Damages 75 with the court for in camera review by September 25, 2013. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 09/20/13. (dmrlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/20/2013)
August 14, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 85 Order by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu granting 84 Stipulation.(dmrlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/14/2013)
August 8, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 83 ORDER RESETTING HEARING DATE. The previously-noticed hearing date of August 22, 2013 on Plaintiff's motion for damages 72 has been vacated. The hearing on the motion is reset for October 10, 2013 at 11:00 a.m. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 08/08/13. (dmrlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/8/2013)
June 26, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 71 Order by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu granting 70 Stipulation.(dmrlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/26/2013)
June 7, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 65 Order by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu granting in part and denying in part 53 Motion for Summary Judgment.(dmrlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/7/2013)
April 26, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 59 ORDER FOR SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEFING The court hereby orders Plaintiff and Defendant Greene Transport Company to each submit by no later than 12 p.m. on May 3, 2013 supplemental briefing related to Plaintiffs Motion for Partial Summary Judgment 53 . Each brief is not to exceed seven pages. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 04/26/13. (dmrlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/26/2013)
April 4, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 55 ORDER re 54 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER to Extend Certain Discovery Deadlines and re: Joint Statement of Facts with Respect to Plaintiff's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment filed by Green Transport Company, The deadline for completing non-expert discovery is continued from May 1, 2013, to June 15, 2013; the deadline for disclosing expert witnesses and reports is continued from May 1, 2013, to June 15, 2013; the deadline for disclosing rebuttal expert witnesses and repor ts is continued from May 15, 2013, to June 30, 2013; the deadline for completing expert discovery is continued from May 29, 2013, to July 14, 2013; the parties may, as necessary, submit one supplemental joint statement of material facts not in disput e to accompany GTCs response to Chiquitas motion for summary adjudication, andone such statement to accompany Chiquitas reply, under the standards set forth in Paragraph 14 of the Standing Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 04/04/13. (dmrlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/4/2013)
March 11, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 52 ORDER re 51 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Amended Stipulated Protective Order Regarding Defendant Greene Transport Company's Disclosure of Certain Insurance Information for Settlement Purposes Only filed by Green Transport Company. The stipluation is GRANTED. (dmrlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/11/2013)
November 1, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER Case Management Statement due by 1/2/2013. Case Management Conference set for 1/9/2013 01:30 PM. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 11/1/2012. (dmrlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/1/2012)
May 11, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER, Motions terminated: Denying 22 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint and All Causes of Action Pursuant to F.R.C.P. 12(b)(6) filed by Green Transport Company, Granting 21 MOTION to Dismiss PLAINTIFF'S BREACH OF CONTRACT AND DECLARATORY RELIEF CAUSES OF ACTION filed by John Greene Logistics Company. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 5/11/2012. (dmrlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/11/2012)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Chiquita Fresh North America L.L.C. v. Green Transport Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Green Transport Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Greene Logistics Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Chiquita Fresh North America L.L.C.
Represented By: Robert M. Bodzin
Represented By: Alison F. Greene
Represented By: Raymond A. Greene, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?