Labriola v. Bank of America, National Association
Plaintiff: John Robert Labriola
Defendant: Bank of America, National Association, Merrill Lynch, Pierce, Fenner & Smith Incorp. and Bank of America Corporation
Case Number: 4:2012cv00079
Filed: January 5, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: Oakland Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: Claudia Wilken
Nature of Suit: Labor: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 27, 2013. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 27, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 80 Order granting #79 Stipulation entered by Hon. Claudia Wilken. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.)
December 23, 2013 Filing 79 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER REGARDING EXTENSION OF DEADLINES FOR FUNDING AND DISTRIBUTION OF SETTLEMENT PAYMENTS filed by Merrill Lynch, Pierce, Fenner & Smith Incorp., John Robert LaBriola. (Van Hook, John) (Filed on 12/23/2013) Modified on 12/24/2013 (cpS, COURT STAFF).
December 20, 2013 Filing 78 JUDGMENT. ***Civil Case Terminated.*** Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 12/20/2013. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/20/2013)
December 20, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 77 ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken GRANTING #67 MOTION FOR AWARDS OF ATTORNEYS FEES AND COSTS AND INCENTIVE PAYMENT TO CLASS REPRESENTATIVE. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/20/2013)
December 20, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 76 ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken GRANTING #66 FINAL APPROVAL OF CLASS SETTLEMENT. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/20/2013)
December 19, 2013 Filing 75 Minute Entry: Motion Hearing held on 12/19/2013 before Claudia Wilken (Date Filed: 12/19/2013). (Recording #2:01:24-2:09.) (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 12/19/2013)
November 20, 2013 Filing 74 RESPONSE (re #66 MOTION for Final Approval of Class Settlement ) ; Declaration of John A. Van Hook filed byMerrill Lynch, Pierce, Fenner & Smith Incorp.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Van Hook, John) (Filed on 11/20/2013)
November 6, 2013 Filing 73 Proposed Order re #67 MOTION for Attorney Fees and Incentive Payment by John Robert Labriola. (Coll, Rebecca) (Filed on 11/6/2013)
November 6, 2013 Filing 72 Proposed Order re #66 MOTION for SetFinal Approval of Class Settlement by John Robert Labriola. (Coll, Rebecca) (Filed on 11/6/2013) Modified on 11/7/2013 (kcS, COURT STAFF).
November 6, 2013 Filing 71 Declaration of James A. Quadra in Support of #67 MOTION for Attorney Fees and Incentive Payment, #66 MOTION for >Final Approval of Class Settlement filed by John Robert Labriola. (Related document(s) #67 , #66 ) (Coll, Rebecca) (Filed on 11/6/2013) Modified on 11/7/2013 (kcS, COURT STAFF).
November 6, 2013 Filing 70 Declaration of Rebecca Coll in Support of #67 MOTION for Attorney Fees and Incentive Payment, #66 MOTION for Final Approval of Class Settlement filed by John Robert Labriola. (Related document(s) #67 , #66 ) (Coll, Rebecca) (Filed on 11/6/2013) Modified on 11/7/2013 (kcS, COURT STAFF).
November 6, 2013 Filing 69 Declaration of Julie Redell in Support of #66 MOTION for Final Approval of Class Settlement filed by John Robert Labriola. (Related document(s) #66 ) (Coll, Rebecca) (Filed on 11/6/2013) Modified on 11/7/2013 (kcS, COURT STAFF).
November 6, 2013 Filing 68 Declaration of John LaBriola in Support of #67 MOTION for Attorney Fees and Incentive Payment, #66 MOTION for Final Approval of Class Settlement filed by John Robert Labriola. (Related document(s) #67 , #66 ) (Coll, Rebecca) (Filed on 11/6/2013) Modified on 11/7/2013 (kcS, COURT STAFF).
November 6, 2013 Filing 67 MOTION for Attorney Fees and Incentive Payment filed by John Robert Labriola. Motion Hearing set for 12/19/2013 02:00 PM in Courtroom 2, 4th Floor, Oakland before Hon. Claudia Wilken. Responses due by 11/27/2013. Replies due by 12/5/2013. (Coll, Rebecca) (Filed on 11/6/2013)
November 6, 2013 Filing 66 MOTION for Final Approval of Class Settlement filed by John Robert Labriola. Motion Hearing set for 12/19/2013 02:00 PM in Courtroom 2, 4th Floor, Oakland before Hon. Claudia Wilken. Responses due by 11/27/2013. Replies due by 12/5/2013. (Coll, Rebecca) (Filed on 11/6/2013) Modified on 11/7/2013 (kcS, COURT STAFF).
September 17, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 65 SECOND #64 AMENDED ORDER GRANTING PRELIMINARY APPROVAL OF CLASS SETTLEMENT. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 9/17/2013. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Notice, #2 Exhibit B - Claim Form, #3 Exhibit C - Exclusion Form)(ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/17/2013) Modified on 9/17/2013 (ndr, COURT STAFF).
September 17, 2013 See Docket No. #64 . Reset Deadlines/Hearing: Motions due by 11/6/2013; Responses due by 11/27/2013; Replies due by 12/5/2013; Motion Hearing set for 12/19/2013 02:00 PM before Hon. Claudia Wilken. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/17/2013)
August 29, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 64 AMENDED ORDER GRANTING PRELIMINARY APPROVAL OF CLASS SETTLEMENT. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 8/29/2013. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Notice, #2 Exhibit B - Claim Form, #3 Exhibit C - Exclusion Form)(ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/29/2013)
August 27, 2013 Filing 63 Notice of Errata re: Incorrect Document Filed (Dkt. #59 ) and Ommission of Stipulation Regarding Amendment to Settlement by Merrill Lynch, Pierce, Fenner & Smith Incorp.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Van Hook, John) (Filed on 8/27/2013) Modified on 8/28/2013 (cpS, COURT STAFF).
August 27, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 62 ORDER RE: AMENDED SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT AND PROPOSED AMENDED ORDER GRANTING PRELIMINARY APPROVAL. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 8/27/2013. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/27/2013)
August 7, 2013 Filing 61 Declaration of Joseph Bush regarding settlement data filed byMerrill Lynch, Pierce, Fenner & Smith Incorp.. (Van Hook, John) (Filed on 8/7/2013) Modified on 8/8/2013 (cpS, COURT STAFF).
August 7, 2013 Filing 60 Proposed Order Amended Order Granting Preliminary Approval of Class Settlement by Merrill Lynch, Pierce, Fenner & Smith Incorp., John Robert Labriola. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Van Hook, John) (Filed on 8/7/2013) Modified on 8/8/2013 (cpS, COURT STAFF).
August 7, 2013 Filing 59 STIPULATION Re Class Action Settlement filed by Merrill Lynch, Pierce, Fenner & Smith Incorp., John Robert Labriola. (Van Hook, John) (Filed on 8/7/2013) Modified on 8/8/2013 (cpS, COURT STAFF).
August 7, 2013 Filing 58 ***DISREGARD, SEE DOCUMENT NO. #60 .*** (Proposed) Amended Order Granting Preliminary Approval of Class Settlement filed by Merrill Lynch, Pierce, Fenner & Smith Incorp., Merrill Lynch, Pierce, Fenner & Smith Incorp.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Van Hook, John) (Filed on 8/7/2013) Modified on 8/8/2013 (cpS, COURT STAFF). Modified on 8/29/2013 (ndr, COURT STAFF).
July 29, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 57 SCHEDULING ORDER. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 7/29/2013. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/29/2013)
July 24, 2013 Filing 56 Brief re #54 Order on Stipulation and Status of Settlement filed byJohn Robert Labriola. (Related document(s) #54 ) (Coll, Rebecca) (Filed on 7/24/2013)
July 24, 2013 Filing 55 STATUS REPORT by Defendant Regarding Settlement In Response to Scheduling Order (Dkt. #53) by Merrill Lynch, Pierce, Fenner & Smith Incorp.. (Van Hook, John) (Filed on 7/24/2013)
July 22, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 54 SCHEDULING ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken re #53 Stipulation Regarding Request for Case Management Conference. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/22/2013) Modified on 7/22/2013 (ndr, COURT STAFF).
July 17, 2013 Filing 53 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Regarding Request for Case Management Conference filed by Merrill Lynch, Pierce, Fenner & Smith Incorp., John Robert Labriola. (Van Hook, John) (Filed on 7/17/2013) Modified on 7/18/2013 (cpS, COURT STAFF).
June 6, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 52 ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken GRANTING #48 PRELIMINARY APPROVAL OF CLASS SETTLEMENT. (Attachments: #1 Class Notice, #2 Claim Form, #3 Exlusion Form) (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/6/2013)
June 4, 2013 Filing 51 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re #48 MOTION for Preliminary Approval of Class Settlement filed by John Robert Labriola, Merrill Lynch Pierce Fenner & Smith Incorp. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Coll, Rebecca) (Filed on 6/4/2013) Modified on 6/5/2013 (cpS, COURT STAFF).
May 30, 2013 Filing 50 Minute Entry: Motion Hearing held on 5/30/2013 before Claudia Wilken (Date Filed: 5/30/2013). Motion Hearing set for 10/17/2013 02:00 PM before Hon. Claudia Wilken. (Court Reporter Diane Skillman.) (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 5/30/2013)
May 8, 2013 Filing 49 Declaration of John LaBriola in Support of #48 MOTION for Preliminary Approval of Class Settlement filed byJohn Robert Labriola. (Related document(s) #48 ) (Coll, Rebecca) (Filed on 5/8/2013)
April 26, 2013 CLERKS NOTICE. Notice is hereby given that the Case Management Conference, previously set for Thursday, May 2, 2013, is vacated. (This is a text only docket entry, there is no document associated with this notice.) (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/26/2013)
April 25, 2013 Filing 48 MOTION for Preliminary Approval of Class Settlement filed by John Robert Labriola. Motion Hearing set for 5/30/2013 02:00 PM in Courtroom 2, 4th Floor, Oakland before Hon. Claudia Wilken. Responses due by 5/9/2013. Replies due by 5/16/2013. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Rebecca Coll, #2 Declaration of James Quadra, #3 Declaration of Brandon Schwartz, #4 Proposed Order)(Coll, Rebecca) (Filed on 4/25/2013) Modified on 4/26/2013 (cpS, COURT STAFF).
April 25, 2013 Filing 47 JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by Merrill Lynch, Pierce, Fenner & Smith Incorp., John Robert Labriola. (Van Hook, John) (Filed on 4/25/2013) Modified on 4/26/2013 (cpS, COURT STAFF).
March 22, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken Granting #44 JOINT STIPULATION TO CONTINUE STATUS CONFERENCE STATEMENT. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/22/2013)
March 22, 2013 Reset Deadline/Hearing: Case Management Statement due by 4/25/2013. Further Case Management Conference set for 5/2/2013 02:00 PM. See Docket No. #46 . (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/22/2013)
March 21, 2013 Filing 45 JOINT STATUS CONFERENCE STATEMENT by Merrill Lynch, Pierce, Fenner & Smith Incorp., John Robert Labriola. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Van Hook, John) (Filed on 3/21/2013) Modified on 3/22/2013 (cpS, COURT STAFF).
March 21, 2013 Filing 44 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER TO CONTINUE STATUS CONFERENCE STATEMENT filed by Merrill Lynch, Pierce, Fenner & Smith Incorp., John Robert Labriola. (Van Hook, John) (Filed on 3/21/2013) Modified on 3/22/2013 (cpS, COURT STAFF).
January 22, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken Granting #42 Stipulation TO VACATE LITIGATION DATES. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/22/2013)
January 18, 2013 Filing 42 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER TO VACATE LITIGATION DATES filed by John Robert Labriola, Merrill Lynch, Pierce, Fenner & Smith Incorp.. (Coll, Rebecca) (Filed on 1/18/2013) Modified on 1/22/2013 (cp, COURT STAFF).
September 18, 2012 CLERKS NOTICE. Notice is hereby given that Jury Selection and the Jury Trial, previously set for Monday, January 20, 2014, are continued to Tuesday, January 21, 2014, at 8:30 a.m., in Courtroom 2, 4th Floor, 1301 Clay Street, Oakland, CA 94612. Monday January 20, 2014 is a holiday. (This is a text only docket entry, there is no document associated with this notice.) (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/18/2012)
September 18, 2012 Reset Deadlines/Hearings: Motions due by 8/15/2013. Responses /Cross Motions due by 8/29/2013. Replies due by 9/5/2013. Replies due by 9/12/2013. Case Management Statement due by 9/26/2013. Motion/ Further Case Management Conference set for 10/3/2013 02:00 PM. Final Pretrial Conference set for 1/8/2014 02:00 PM. Jury Selection set for 1/20/2014 08:30 AM before Hon. Claudia Wilken. Jury Trial (5 day)set for 1/20/2014 08:30 AM before Hon. Claudia Wilken. See Docket No. 41. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/18/2012)
September 17, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 41 Order granting #40 Stipulation entered by Hon. Claudia Wilken. A further case management conference will be held on the case dispositive motion hearing date whether or not any motions are filed. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.)
September 14, 2012 Filing 40 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER To Continue Pre-Trial Dates and To Mediate filed by John Robert Labriola, Merrill Lynch, Pierce, Fenner & Smith Incorp. (Coll, Rebecca) (Filed on 9/14/2012) Modified on 9/17/2012 (cpS, COURT STAFF).
August 13, 2012 Set/Reset Hearing ENE Hearing set for 10/11/2012 at 09:30 AM in the Evaluator's office. (cmf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/13/2012)
July 26, 2012 Filing 39 Transcript of Proceedings held on May 30, 2012, Court Reporter Raynee H. Mercado, Telephone number 510-451-7530, raynee_mercado@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Redaction Request due 8/16/2012. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 8/27/2012. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 10/24/2012. (rhm, ) (Filed on 7/26/2012)
July 26, 2012 Filing 38 ADR Clerk's Notice Appointing Martin H. Dodd as ENE Evaluator. (cmf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/26/2012)
July 17, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken GRANTING #35 MOTION TO VACATE ORDER TO PRIVATE MEDIATION AND REFERRING CASE TO EARLY NEUTRAL EVALUATION. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/17/2012)
July 16, 2012 Filing 36 RESPONSE (re #35 MOTION to Vacate Order to Mediation ) filed byMerrill Lynch, Pierce, Fenner & Smith Incorp.. (Van Hook, John) (Filed on 7/16/2012)
July 12, 2012 Filing 35 MOTION to Vacate Order to Mediation filed by John Robert Labriola. Responses due by 7/16/2012. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Coll, Rebecca) (Filed on 7/12/2012)
June 21, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 34 Order granting #33 Stipulation entered by Hon. Claudia Wilken. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.)
June 20, 2012 Filing 33 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER PROTECTIVE ORDER FOR STANDARD LITIGATION filed by John Robert Labriola, Bank of America Corporation. (Coll, Rebecca) (Filed on 6/20/2012) Modified on 6/21/2012 (cp, COURT STAFF).
May 30, 2012 Filing 32 Minute Entry AND CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER: Initial Case Management Conference held on 5/30/2012 before Claudia Wilken (Date Filed: 5/30/2012). Motions due by 4/18/2013. Responses/Cross Motions due by 5/2/2013. Replies due by 5/9/2013. Replies due by 5/16/2013. Motion Hearing set for 6/6/2013 02:00 PM before Hon. Claudia Wilken. Case Management Statement due by 5/30/2013. Further Case Management Conference set for 6/6/2013 02:00 PM. Motion Hearing set for 12/13/2012 02:00 PM before Hon. Claudia Wilken. Final Pretrial Conference set for 9/11/2013 02:00 PM. Jury Selection set for 9/23/2013 08:30 AM before Hon. Claudia Wilken. Jury Trial set for 9/23/2013 08:30 AM before Hon. Claudia Wilken. (Court Reporter Raynee Mercado.) (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 5/30/2012) Modified on 6/5/2012 (cpS, COURT STAFF).
May 24, 2012 Filing 31 Answer to Amended Complaint #7 Amended Complaint, byMerrill Lynch, Pierce, Fenner & Smith Incorp.. (Mandel, Michael) (Filed on 5/24/2012)
May 21, 2012 Filing 30 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT AND JOINT RULE 26(F) REPORT filed by John Robert Labriola, Merrill Lynch, Pierce, Fenner & Smith Incorp. (Coll, Rebecca) (Filed on 5/21/2012) Modified on 5/22/2012 (cpS, COURT STAFF).
May 11, 2012 Filing 29 NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher Anthony Killens (Killens, Christopher) (Filed on 5/11/2012)
May 11, 2012 Filing 28 NOTICE of Appearance by Van Hook Arthur John (John, Van Hook) (Filed on 5/11/2012)
May 10, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 27 Order granting #24 Stipulation selecting Private ADR entered by Hon. Claudia Wilken. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.)
May 10, 2012 Filing 26 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options (Coll, Rebecca) (Filed on 5/10/2012)
May 10, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken DENYING DEFENDANTS #9 MOTION TO DISMISS OR STRIKE.(ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/10/2012)
May 9, 2012 Filing 24 STIPULATION and Proposed Order selecting Private ADR by Bank of America Corporation, Bank of America, National Association filed by Bank of America Corporation, Bank of America, National Association, John Robert Labriola. (Mandel, Michael) (Filed on 5/9/2012) Modified on 5/10/2012 (cp, COURT STAFF).
April 12, 2012 Filing 23 Minute Entry: Motion Hearing held on 4/12/2012 before Claudia Wilken (Date Filed: 4/12/2012). (Court Reporter Diane Skillman.) (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 4/12/2012)
March 29, 2012 Filing 22 REPLY (re #9 MOTION to Dismiss and/or Strike Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(6), 12(f) and/or 23(d)(1)(D) ) filed byMerrill Lynch, Pierce, Fenner & Smith Incorp.. (Mandel, Michael) (Filed on 3/29/2012)
March 22, 2012 Filing 21 Request for Judicial Notice re #20 Opposition/Response to Motion to Dismiss and/or Strike filed byJohn Robert Labriola. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Related document(s) #20 ) (Coll, Rebecca) (Filed on 3/22/2012)
March 22, 2012 Filing 20 RESPONSE (re #9 MOTION to Dismiss and/or Strike Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(6), 12(f) and/or 23(d)(1)(D) ) filed byJohn Robert Labriola. (Coll, Rebecca) (Filed on 3/22/2012)
March 21, 2012 Filing 19 NOTICE of Substitution of Counsel; (Proposed) Order by Rebecca Coll (Coll, Rebecca) (Filed on 3/21/2012) Modified on 3/22/2012 (cp, COURT STAFF).
February 29, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 18 Order granting #16 Stipulation entered by Hon. Claudia Wilken. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.)
February 29, 2012 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #9 MOTION to Dismiss and/or Strike Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(6), 12(f) and/or 23(d)(1)(D). Responses due by 3/22/2012. Replies due by 3/29/2012. Motion Hearing set for 4/12/2012 02:00 PM before Hon. Claudia Wilken. See Text Order (Docket No. 18) (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/29/2012)
February 29, 2012 CLERKS NOTICE. Notice is hereby given that the Case Management Conference, previously set for Wednesday, April 25, 2012, is continued to Wednesday, May 30, 2012, at 2:00 p.m., in Courtroom 2, 4th Floor, 1301 Clay Street, Oakland, CA 94612. Case Management Statement due by. (This is a text only docket entry, there is no document associated with this notice.) (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/29/2012)
February 28, 2012 Filing 17 Notice of Withdrawal of Motion OF PLAINTIFFS ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO ENLARGE TIME TO OPPOSE TO DEFENDANTS MOTION TO DISMISS PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULES 6-3, 7-11 (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Hebert, William) (Filed on 2/28/2012)
February 28, 2012 Filing 16 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Extending briefing schedule re #9 MOTION to Dismiss and/or Strike First Amended Complaint and Rescheduling CMC filed by John Robert Labriola, Merrill Lynch Pierce Fenner & Smith Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Hebert, William) (Filed on 2/28/2012) Modified on 2/29/2012 (cp, COURT STAFF).
February 27, 2012 Filing 15 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #9 MOTION to Dismiss and/or Strike Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(6), 12(f) and/or 23(d)(1)(D) filed by John Robert Labriola. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Hebert, William) (Filed on 2/27/2012)
February 24, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER Granting #13 STIPULATION TO DISMISS DEFENDANTS BANK OF AMERICA, N.A. AND BANK OF AMERICA CORPORATION. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 2/24/2012. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/24/2012)
February 23, 2012 Filing 13 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER TO DISMISS DEFENDANTS BANK OF AMERICA, N.A. AND BANK OF AMERICA CORPORATION filed by Bank of America Corporation, Bank of America, National Association, Merrill Lynch, Pierce, Fenner & Smith Incorp, John Robert Labriola.. (Mandel, Michael) (Filed on 2/23/2012) Modified on 2/24/2012 (cp, COURT STAFF).
February 14, 2012 Filing 12 Second Amended Certificate of Interested Entities by Bank of America Corporation, Bank of America, National Association, Merrill Lynch, Pierce, Fenner & Smith Incorp. (Mandel, Michael) (Filed on 2/14/2012) Modified on 2/15/2012 (cp, COURT STAFF).
February 14, 2012 Filing 11 NOTICE of Errata re #9 MOTION to Dismiss and/or Strike Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(6), 12(f) and/or 23(d)(1)(D) by Bank of America Corporation, Bank of America, National Association, Merrill Lynch, Pierce, Fenner & Smith Incorp. (Mandel, Michael) (Filed on 2/14/2012) Modified on 2/15/2012 (cp, COURT STAFF).
February 13, 2012 Filing 10 AMENDED CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED ENTITIES. by Bank of America Corporation, Bank of America, National Association, Merrill Lynch, Pierce, Fenner & Smith Incorp.. Amendment to #3 Certificate of Interested Entities, (Mandel, Michael) (Filed on 2/13/2012) Modified on 2/14/2012 (cp, COURT STAFF).
February 13, 2012 Filing 9 MOTION to Dismiss and/or Strike Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(6), 12(f) and/or 23(d)(1)(D) filed by Bank of America Corporation, Bank of America, National Association, Merrill Lynch, Pierce, Fenner & Smith Incorp.. Motion Hearing set for 3/22/2012 02:00 PM in Courtroom 2, 4th Floor, Oakland before Hon. Claudia Wilken. Responses due by 2/27/2012. Replies due by 3/5/2012. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Granting Motion to Dismiss and/or Strike First Amended Complaint)(Mandel, Michael) (Filed on 2/13/2012)
January 19, 2012 Filing 8 Summons Issued as to Bank of America Corporation, Merrill Lynch, Pierce, Fenner & Smith Incorp.. (Attachments: #1 Merril Lynch Pierce Fenner & Smith Inc)(cp, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/19/2012)
January 13, 2012 Filing 7 AMENDED COMPLAINT; Jury Demand against All Defendants. Filed byJohn Robert Labriola. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Certificate/Proof of Service Certificate of Interested Parties or Entities, #3 Summons Defendant Bank of America Corporation, #4 Summons Defendant MLPFS Incorp., #5 Certificate/Proof of Service Proof of Service)(Coll, Rebecca) (Filed on 1/13/2012) Modified on 1/17/2012 (cp, COURT STAFF).
January 12, 2012 Filing 6 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME TO RESPOND TO INITIAL COMPLAINT by Bank of America, National Association, John Robert Labriola. (Mandel, Michael) (Filed on 1/12/2012) Modified on 1/13/2012 (cp, COURT STAFF).
January 10, 2012 CLERKS NOTICE. Notice is hereby given that the Case Management Conference, previously set for Wednesday, April 18, 2012, is continued to Wednesday, April 25, 2012, at 2:00 p.m., in Courtroom 2, 4th Floor, 1301 Clay Street, Oakland, CA 94612. Case Management Statement due by April 18, 2012. (This is a text only docket entry, there is no document associated with this notice.) (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/10/2012)
January 5, 2012 Filing 5 ADR SCHEDULING ORDER: Case Management Statement due by 4/11/2012. Case Management Conference set for 4/18/2012 at 02:00 PM before Hon. Claudia Wilken. (Attachments: #1 Standing Order)(kc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/5/2012)
January 5, 2012 Filing 4 NOTICE of No Related Cases by Bank of America, National Association (kc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/5/2012)
January 5, 2012 Filing 3 Certificate of Interested Entities by Bank of America, National Association identifying Other Affiliate NB Holdings Corporation, Other Affiliate BAC North America Holding Company, Other Affiliate BANA Holding Corporation, Other Affiliate Merrill Lynch, Pierce, Fenner & Smith, Inc, Other Affiliate Bank of America, N.A., Other Affiliate Merrill Lynch & Co., Inc., Other Affiliate Bank of America Corporation for Bank of America, National Association. (kc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/5/2012)
January 5, 2012 Filing 2 Declaration of Robert M. Drozynski in Support of #1 Notice of Removal filed byBank of America, National Association. (Related document(s) #1 ) (kc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/5/2012)
January 5, 2012 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL, no process, from San Francisco County Superior Court. Their case number is CGC-11-516307. (Filing fee $350 receipt number 34611068857). Filed byBank of America, National Association. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(kc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/5/2012)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Labriola v. Bank of America, National Association
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Robert Labriola
Represented By: James Andrew Quadra
Represented By: William N. Hebert
Represented By: Rebecca Coll
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bank of America, National Association
Represented By: Michael David Mandel
Represented By: Matthew C. Kane
Represented By: Sylvia Jihae Kim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Merrill Lynch, Pierce, Fenner & Smith Incorp.
Represented By: Michael David Mandel
Represented By: Christopher Anthony Killens
Represented By: John Arthur Van Hook
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bank of America Corporation
Represented By: Michael David Mandel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?