Amie v. City of Martinez et al
Plaintiff: Maisha Amie
Defendant: Muncher, Zachary Poertner, City of Martinez, Martinez Police Department and Tom J. Simonetti
Case Number: 4:2012cv00145
Filed: January 9, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: Oakland Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1981
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 17, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER VACATING DATES AND SETTING COMPLIANCE HEARING. Compliance Hearing set for 11/30/2012 09:01 AM before Hon. Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 10/17/12. (nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/17/2012)
September 27, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER VACATING SHOW CAUSE HEARING/COMPLIANCE HEARING re 33 Response to Order to Show Cause filed by City of Martinez, Maisha Amie, Tom J. Simonetti, Zachary Poertner, Tyson Muncher, Martinez Police Department. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 9/27/12. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/27/2012)
September 21, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER STRIKIING JOINT LETTER BRIEF AND ORDERING PARTIES TO SHOW CAUSE REGARDING FAILURE TO COMPLY WITH COURT'S STANDING ORDER ; Order to Show Cause Hearing set for Friday, 9/28/2012 09:01 AM. Show Cause Response due by Tuesday,9/25/2012.. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 9/21/12. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/21/2012)
May 16, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 17 CASE MANAGEMENT AND PRETRIAL ORDER. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 5/16/12. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/16/2012)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Amie v. City of Martinez et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Muncher
Represented By: Peter Pratt Edrington
Represented By: Keith Richard Schirmer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Zachary Poertner
Represented By: Peter Pratt Edrington
Represented By: Keith Richard Schirmer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Martinez
Represented By: Keith Richard Schirmer
Represented By: Peter Pratt Edrington
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Martinez Police Department
Represented By: Keith Richard Schirmer
Represented By: Peter Pratt Edrington
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tom J. Simonetti
Represented By: Peter Pratt Edrington
Represented By: Keith Richard Schirmer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maisha Amie
Represented By: Panos Lagos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?