Rickman v. NDEX West, L.L.C. et al

Plaintiff: Chantal Rickman
Defendant: NDEX West, L.L.C. and Wells Fargo Bank, N.A
Case Number: 4:2012cv00146
Filed: January 9, 2012
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: Oakland Office
County: Contra Costa
Presiding Judge: Donna M. Ryu
Nature of Suit: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1444
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
February 22, 2012 31 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER REMANDING CASE, granting 30 Stipulation to Remand Case to State Court and Extend Time for Response to First Amended Complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 02/22/2012. (dmrlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/22/2012)
February 8, 2012 23 Opinion or Order of the Court Order by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu VACATING Hearing on 7 Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction 7 and DENYING 22 Plaintiff's Motion to Remand.(dmrlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/8/2012)
January 26, 2012 15 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER REFERRING CASE TO ADR UNIT FOR ASSESSMENT TELEPHONE CONFERENCE. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 01/26/2012. (dmrlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/26/2012)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rickman v. NDEX West, L.L.C. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NDEX West, L.L.C.
Represented By: Edward A. Treder
Represented By: Thomas K Agawa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wells Fargo Bank, N.A
Represented By: Daniel A Armstrong
Represented By: Robert Arthur Bailey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Chantal Rickman
Represented By: Wayne Vincent Robert Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?