Travelers Property Casualty Company of American v. Centex Homes et al
Plaintiff: Travelers Property Casualty Company of American
Defendant: Centex Homes and Newmeyer & Dillion, LLP
Case Number: 4:2012cv00371
Filed: January 24, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: Oakland Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Phyllis J. Hamilton
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Insurance Contract
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 253 STIPULATION AND ORDER DISMISSING CASE - CASE SETTLED. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 10/16/2020. (lsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/16/2020)
June 3, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 187 ORDER re 186 Status Report filed by Centex Homes. Joint Status Report due by 6/16/2016. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 5/31/2016. (beS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/3/2016)
April 28, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 185 ORDER granting 184 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER to Stay Case filed by Centex Homes, Newmeyer & Dillion, LLP. Status Report due by 5/24/2016. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 4/28/2016. (beS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/28/2016)
February 2, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 173 ORDER granting 171 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re 170 Case Management Conference - Further,,, Set Deadlines/Hearings,, filed by Centex Homes. Case Management Statement due by 3/11/2016. Status Conference reset for 3/18/2016 08:30 AM in Courtroom 6, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Charles R. Breyer. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 2/1/2016. (beS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/2/2016)
August 26, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 150 ORDER by Judge Samuel Conti granting (132) Motion to Dismiss; denying (133) Motion to Strike ; granting in part and denying in part (134) Motion to Dismiss in case 3:12-cv-00371-SC; granting (47) Motion to Dismiss; denying (48) Motion to Strike ; granting in part and denying in part (49) Motion to Dismiss in case 3:13-cv-00088-SC (sclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/26/2013)
August 12, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 146 STIPULATION AND ORDER To Strike Allegations Relating To The Underlying Spicer, Bennett, Mira Loma, Mir Ali And Yunker Underlying Actions And Rgls Fiduciary Duties From The Fourth Amended Complaint And First Amended Complaint Signed by Judge Samuel Conti on 08/12/2013. (tmi, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/12/2013)
May 30, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 127 ORDER by Judge Samuel Conti in case 3:12-cv-00371-SC; granting in part and denying in part (11) Motion to Strike ; granting in part and denying in part (13) Motion to Dismiss; granting in part and denying in part (27) Motion to Amend/Correct ; in case 3:13-cv-00088-SC (sclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/30/2013)
April 10, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 119 STIPULATION AND ORDER of Dismissal of any and all allegations by all parties relating to the underlying spicer action. Signed by Judge Samuel Conti on 04/09/2013. (tmi, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/10/2013)
March 27, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 110 ORDER REFERRING CASE TO JUDGE SAMUEL CONTI TO CONSIDER WHETHER CASES ARE RELATED, STAYING PROCEEDINGS AND VACATING HEARINGS. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on March 27, 2013. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/27/2013)
January 11, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 87 ORDER by Judge Hamilton granting in part and denying in part 79 Motion to Dismiss (pjhlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/11/2013)
October 30, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 82 ORDER RE CHAMBERS COPIES. Signed by Judge Hamilton on 10/30/2012. (pjhlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/30/2012)
September 13, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 75 ORDER by Judge Hamilton granting 63 Motion to Dismiss (pjhlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/13/2012)
August 21, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 68 ORDER by Judge Charles R. Breyer denying Motion to Relate Case C-11-3638SC and C-12-0371PJH to C-10-2757CRB. Cases are not related. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 8/20/2012. (beS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/21/2012)
June 15, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 53 ORDER by Judge Hamilton denying 34 Motion for Sanctions; granting 18 Motion to Dismiss and Motion to Strike. (pjhlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/15/2012)
February 8, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Joint Case Management Statement due by 5/17/2012. Initial Case Management Conference set for 5/24/2012 02:00 PM. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 2/8/12. (nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/8/2012)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Travelers Property Casualty Company of American v. Centex Homes et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Travelers Property Casualty Company of American
Represented By: A. Eric Aguilera
Represented By: Thomas Lether
Represented By: Kari Marie Myron
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Centex Homes
Represented By: Jeffrey Michael Hayes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Newmeyer & Dillion, LLP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?