Dorger et al v. City of Napa et al
Plaintiff: Samanda Dorger and Gabrielle Poccia
Defendant: City of Napa, Richard Melton, Brad Baker and Nick Dalessi
Case Number: 4:2012cv00440
Filed: January 27, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: Oakland Office
County: Napa
Presiding Judge: Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 29, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 110 ORDER DISMISSING CASE. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 01/29/2015. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/29/2015)
November 17, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 99 STIPULATION AND ORDER TO CONTINUE PRETRIAL FILING DATE AND PRETRIAL CONFERENCE re 98 Stipulation. The filing date for all required Pre-Trial Conference pleadings and related documents and papers is continued to 12/15/2014. Pretrial Conference continued to 12/19/2014 09:00 AM in Courtroom 12, 19th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 11/17/2014. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/17/2014)
March 14, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 92 ORDER granting 91 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re Continuance of Trial Date and Pretrial Conference and ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero for Settlement. Final Pretrial Conference continued to 12/15/2014 and Jury Trial continued to 1/12/2015 08:30 AM, both in Courtroom 12, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. William H. Orrick. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 03/14/2014. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/14/2014)
January 3, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 90 AMENDED CIVIL PRETRIAL ORDER. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 01/03/2014. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/3/2014)
November 4, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 87 STIPULATION AND ORDER TO CONTINUE NOVEMBER 12, 2013 CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE TO DECEMBER 3, 2013 re 86 Stipulation. Further Case Management Conference continued to 12/3/2013 02:00 PM in Courtroom 2, 17th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 11/04/2013. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/4/2013)
October 24, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 85 ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART DEFENDANTS' 74 MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT by Judge William H. Orrick. Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment as to plaintiffs' First, Third, and Fifth Claims is DENIED. Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment as to plaintiffs' Second and Sixth Claims is GRANTED. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/24/2013)
August 26, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 73 CIVIL PRETRIAL ORDER FOR JURY TRIAL. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 08/26/2013. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/26/2013)
August 16, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 71 STIPULATION AND ORDER TO RESCHEDULE CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE, EXPERTS DISCLOSURE DATE AND SET MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT BRIEFING SCHEDULE re 70 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER. Case Management Conference set for 11/12/2013 02:00 PM in Courtroom 2, 17th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 08/16/2013. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/16/2013)
August 7, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 68 STIPULATION AND ORDER TO DISMISS CERTAIN DEFENDANTS AND CERTAIN CLAIMS WITH PREJUDICE re 66 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 08/08/2013. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/7/2013)
March 21, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 60 ORDER CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AND MEDIATION DEADLINE Case Management Conference set for 3/25/2013 is CONTINUED to 6/10/2013 02:00 PM ; granting request for extension of mediation deadline to May 30, 2013. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 3/21/13. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/21/2013)
February 21, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 58 ORDER Case Management Conference set for 2/25/2013 is CONTINUED to Monday, 3/25/2013 02:00 PM in Courtroom 5, 2nd Floor, Oakland. Court Grants an extension of the mediation deadline to March 28, 2013, only. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 2/21/13. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/21/2013)
October 24, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 48 CASE MANAGEMENT AND PRETRIAL ORDER. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 10/23/12. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/24/2012)
August 31, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers denying 38 Motion to Dismiss. The Court VACATES the hearing set for September 4, 2012. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/31/2012)
July 17, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 36 AMENDED ORDER granting 34 Stipulation to File Amended Complaint and Continue Case Management Conference to September 10, 2012 re 35 Order on Stipulation. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 7/17/12. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/17/2012)
May 14, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER ENTERING TENTATIVE RULING ON MOTION TO DISMISS AS ORDER OF THE COURT by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers granting 17 Motion to Dismiss with Leave to Amend. The May 15, 2012 hearing on the motion is VACATED. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/14/2012)
May 10, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER REGARDING: NOTICE OF TENTATIVE RULING ON MOTION TO DISMISS. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 5/10/12. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/10/2012)
April 16, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 22 STIPULATION AND [REVISED]ORDER CONTINUING BRIEFING SCHEDULE AND HEARING, Set/Reset Deadlines as to 17 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint. Responses due by 5/1/2012. Replies due by 5/8/2012. 17 Motion to Dismiss Hearing se t for 5/15/2012 02:00 PM before Hon. Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers.Case Management Conference re-set for Monday, 6/25/2012 02:00 PM.. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 4/16/12. Joint Case Managemetn Statement filed by 6/11/12.(fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/16/2012)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dorger et al v. City of Napa et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Samanda Dorger
Represented By: Khaldoun Baghdadi
Represented By: Michael Albert Kelly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gabrielle Poccia
Represented By: Khaldoun Baghdadi
Represented By: Michael Albert Kelly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Napa
Represented By: Gregory Mellon Fox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard Melton
Represented By: Gregory Mellon Fox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brad Baker
Represented By: Gregory Mellon Fox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nick Dalessi
Represented By: Gregory Mellon Fox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?