Permito v. Wells Fargo, N.A.

Plaintiff: Maria Elena Permito
Defendant: Wells Fargo, N.A. and Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.
Case Number: 4:2012cv00545
Filed: February 2, 2012
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: Oakland Office
County: San Mateo
Presiding Judge: Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers
Nature of Suit: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
April 20, 2012 25 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers granting 19 Motion to Dismiss with leave to Amend; finding as moot 24 Motion to Appear by Telephone for motion hearing. The 4/24/12 at 2:00pm hearing date is vacated. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/20/2012)
June 14, 2012 29 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER REGARDING PLAINTIFF'S FAILURE TO FILE AN AMENDED COMPLAINT; AND PLAINTIFF'S FAILURE TO FILE AN OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS.The 7/10/2012 Hearing date is VACATED. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 6/14/12. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/14/2012)
June 28, 2012 30 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DISMISSING CASE WITHOUT PREJUDICE FOR FAILURE TO PROSECUTE, ***Civil Case Terminated.. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 6/28/12. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/28/2012)
February 8, 2012 9 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE WHY THIS COURT HAS JURISDICTION AND SETTING COMPLIANCE HEARING Compliance Hearing re this Show Cause Order is set for Friday, 2/10/2012 09:01 AM. Show Cause Response due by 2/9/2012 by 4:00pm.. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 2/8/2012. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/8/2012)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Permito v. Wells Fargo, N.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maria Elena Permito
Represented By: Michael James Yesk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wells Fargo, N.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.
Represented By: Michael Rapkine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.