Kung v. State of California
Plaintiff: Kin Wah Kung
Defendant: State of California
Case Number: 4:2012cv00645
Filed: February 9, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: Oakland Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers
Nature of Suit: Constitutionality of State Statutes
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
November 26, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER DISMISSING CASE WITH PREJUDICE, ***Civil Case Terminated. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 11/26/13. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/26/2013)
October 22, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. Plaintiff Show Cause Response due by 11/13/2013. Defendants response by 11/20/13. Matter will be submitted on the papers. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 10/22/13. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/22/2013)
May 3, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers denying 26 Motion to Dismiss Complaint. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/3/2013)
April 5, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER VACATING COMPLIANCE HEARING. The Compliance Hearing set for Monday, April 8, 2013 is VACATED. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 4/5/2013. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/5/2013)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kung v. State of California
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State of California
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kin Wah Kung
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?