Beltran v. EMI Music, Inc.

Plaintiff: Graciela Beltran
Defendant: EMI Music, Inc. and Capitol Records, LLC
Case Number: 4:2012cv01002
Filed: February 28, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: Oakland Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers
Nature of Suit: Other Contract
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 12, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 74 ORDER by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers granting 51 Motion to Dismiss without Leave to Amend. The Second Amended Complaint is DISMISSED. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/12/2013)
December 26, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 68 ORDER VACATING 1/7/2013 CMC AND RESETTING Initial Case Management Conference set for 2/11/2013 02:00 PM in Courtroom 5, 2nd Floor, Oakland., Motions terminated: 66 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER to Continue Initial Case Management Conference. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 12/26/12. (kk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/26/2012)
October 16, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 62 ORDER VACATING AND CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Case Management Conference set for 10/22/2012 is VACATED. Case Management Conference reset to 1/7/2013 at 02:00 PM. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 10/16/12. (kc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/16/2012)
August 27, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 57 ORDER VACATING AND CONTINUING HEARING ON MOTION TO DISMISS. The Hearing on the pending Motion to Dismiss is VACATED AND RESET to October 2, 2012 at 2:00pm. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 8/27/12. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/27/2012)
August 1, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 53 ORDER by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers denying (45) Motion to Consolidate Cases without Prejudice in case 4:12-cv-01002-YGR (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/1/2012)
June 15, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers granting in part and denying in part 14 Motion to Dismiss Complaint. The July 3, 2012 hearing on the motion is VACATED. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/15/2012)
June 13, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER RE: NOTICE OF TENTATIVE RULING ON MOTION TO DISMISS re 14 MOTION to Dismiss First Amended filed by Capitol Records, LLC.. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 6/13/12. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/13/2012)
May 30, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE REGARDING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO STRIKE Order to Show Cause Hearing set for Friday,6/8/2012 09:01 AM. Show Cause Response due no later than Friday, 6/1/2012 at 5:00pm. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 5/30/12. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/30/2012)
May 25, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 29 STIPULATION AND ORDER SELECTING ADR PROCESS. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 5/25/12. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/25/2012)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Beltran v. EMI Music, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Graciela Beltran
Represented By: William M. Audet
Represented By: Joshua Caleb Ezrin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: EMI Music, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Capitol Records, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?