Fteja v. Facebook, Inc. Featured Case
Plaintiff: Mustafa Fteja
Defendant: Facebook Inc.
Case Number: 4:2012cv01010
Filed: February 29, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: Oakland Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers
Nature of Suit: Other Contract
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 9, 2012. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 29, 2012 Filing 33 CLERKS NOTICE re: transfer of case. (vlk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/29/2012)
February 29, 2012 Filing 32 ADR SCHEDULING ORDER: Case Management Statement due by 6/6/2012. Case Management Conference set for 6/13/2012 01:30 PM. (Attachments: # 1 Standing Order)(vlk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/29/2012)
February 29, 2012 Filing 31 Case transferred in from District of New York Southern; Case Number 1:11-cv-00918. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
January 24, 2012 CASE TRANSFERRED OUT ELECTRONICALLY from the U.S.D.C. Southern District of New York to the United States District Court - Northern District of California. (mro)
January 24, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER granting 4 Motion to Transfer Case; denying 12 Motion to be added as plaintiff. For the foregoing reasons, Facebook's motion 4 to transfer is GRANTED. The Clerk of Court is directed to transfer this action to the docket of the United States District Court for the Northern District of California. Fatouros's motion 12 to join the action is DENIED without prejudice for administrative reasons. (Signed by Judge Richard J. Holwell on 1/24/2012) (mro)
May 23, 2011 Filing 29 REPLY IN OPPOSITION TO THE SECOND DECLARATION OF JUSTIN NOLAN KINNEY IN SUPPORT OF FACEBOOK, MOTION TO TRANSFER VENUE, MOTION TO DISMISS ACTION & MOTION FOR A MORE DEFINATE STATEMENT. Document filed by Mustafa Fteja. (mbe)
May 18, 2011 Filing 28 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Reply Memorandum of Law, Declaration of Justin Nolan Kinney, Declaration of David Willner served on Plaintiff Fteja on May 18, 2011. Service was made by MAIL. Document filed by Facebook, Inc.. (Kinney, Justin)
May 18, 2011 Filing 27 DECLARATION of David Willner in Support re: 4 MOTION to Transfer Case to the Northern District of California. MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint. MOTION for More Definite Statement.. Document filed by Facebook, Inc.. (Kinney, Justin)
May 18, 2011 Filing 26 DECLARATION of Justin N. Kinney in Support re: 4 MOTION to Transfer Case to the Northern District of California. MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint. MOTION for More Definite Statement.. Document filed by Facebook, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F)(Kinney, Justin)
May 18, 2011 Filing 25 REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 4 MOTION to Transfer Case to the Northern District of California. MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint. MOTION for More Definite Statement.. Document filed by Facebook, Inc.. (Kinney, Justin)
May 3, 2011 Filing 24 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Facebook, Inc.'s Opposition to Motion for Joinder by Non-Party Dimitrios Fatouros and Declaration of Justin N. Kinney in Support of Opposition served on Mustafa Fteja and Dimitrios Fatouros on May 3, 2011. Service was made by Overnight Mail and Electronic Mail. Document filed by Facebook, Inc.. (Kinney, Justin)
May 3, 2011 Filing 23 DECLARATION of Justin N. Kinney in Opposition re: 12 MOTION to be added as plaintiff, reply in Opposition to defendant's Motion to change Venue, Reply in Opposition to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss Action & Cross-Motion for Time to File More Specific Complaint(s). MOTION to be added as plaintiff, reply in Opposition to defendant's Motion to change Venue, Reply in Opposition to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss Action & Cross-Motion for Time to File More Specific Complaint(s).. Document filed by Facebook, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Kinney, Justin)
May 3, 2011 Filing 22 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: 12 MOTION to be added as plaintiff, reply in Opposition to defendant's Motion to change Venue, Reply in Opposition to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss Action & Cross-Motion for Time to File More Specific Complaint(s). MOTION to be added as plaintiff, reply in Opposition to defendant's Motion to change Venue, Reply in Opposition to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss Action & Cross-Motion for Time to File More Specific Complaint(s).. Document filed by Facebook, Inc.. (Kinney, Justin)
May 3, 2011 Filing 21 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY (SEE DOCUMENT #24) - CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Opposition to Motion for Joinder by Non-Party Dimitrios Fatouros and Declaration of Justin N. Kinney in Support of Opposition served on Mustafa Fteja and Dimitrios Fatouros on May 3, 2011. Service was made by Overnight Mail. Document filed by Facebook, Inc. (Kinney, Justin) Modified on 5/4/2011 (ldi).
May 3, 2011 Filing 20 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY (SEE DOCUMENT #23) - DECLARATION of Justin N. Kinney in Opposition re: 12 MOTION to be added as plaintiff, reply in Opposition to defendant's Motion to change Venue, Reply in Opposition to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss Action & Cross-Motion for Time to File More Specific Complaint(s). MOTION to be added as plaintiff, reply in Opposition to defendant's Motion to change Venue, Reply in Opposition to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss Action & Cross-Motion for Time to File More Specific Complaint(s). Document filed by Facebook, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Kinney, Justin) Modified on 5/4/2011 (ldi).
May 3, 2011 Filing 19 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY (SEE DOCUMENT #22) - MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: 12 MOTION to be added as plaintiff, reply in Opposition to defendant's Motion to change Venue, Reply in Opposition to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss Action & Cross-Motion for Time to File More Specific Complaint(s). MOTION to be added as plaintiff, reply in Opposition to defendant's Motion to change Venue, Reply in Opposition to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss Action & Cross-Motion for Time to File More Specific Complaint(s).. Document filed by Facebook, Inc. (Kinney, Justin) Modified on 5/4/2011 (ldi).
April 28, 2011 Filing 18 ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Richard J. Holwell from Justin Kinney dated 4/21/11 re: cousnel for defendant writes for guidance as to how and when the Court would like Facebook to respond to the papers filed by non-party Dimitrios Fatouros on April 18, 2011. ENDORSEMENT: Defendant shall have until May 3, 2011 to respond to the Rule 20(a) motion. ( Responses due by 5/3/2011) (Signed by Judge Richard J. Holwell on 4/27/11) (pl)
April 26, 2011 Filing 17 REPLY to 20(A) Motion of Joinder. Reply in Opposition to Defendant's Motion to Change venue, Reply in Opposition to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss Action and Cross-Motion for Time to file a Specific Complaint. Document filed by Mustafa Fteja. (Attachments: # 1 Part 2)(mbe)
April 26, 2011 Filing 16 CONSENT TO Joinder Applicant. Document filed by Mustafa Fteja.(mbe)
April 18, 2011 Filing 15 Plaintiff's Consent to JOINDER Applicant. Document filed by Mustafa Fteja.(kj)
April 18, 2011 Filing 13 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Mustafa Fteja. (mbe)
April 18, 2011 Filing 12 MOTION to be added as plaintiff, reply in Opposition to defendant's Motion to change Venue, Reply in Opposition to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss Action & Cross-Motion for Time to File More Specific Complaint(s). Document filed by Mustafa Fteja. (Attachments: # 1 Part 2)(mbe)
April 5, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER OF REFERENCE TO A MAGISTRATE JUDGE. Order that case be referred to the Clerk of Court for assignment to a Magistrate Judge for General Pretrial (includes scheduling, discovery, non-dispositive pretrial motions, and settlement). Referred to Magistrate Judge Theodore H. Katz. SO ORDERED. Motions referred to Theodore H. Katz. (Signed by Judge Richard J. Holwell on 4/5/2011) (lnl)
April 5, 2011 Filing 9 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Notice of Motion to Transfer Venue, to Dismiss, or for a More Definite Statement; Declaration of Justin N. Kinney in Support and Exhibit; Declaration of Ana Yang in Support and Exhibits; and Memorandum of Law in Support served on Mustafa Fteja on April 4, 2011. Service was accepted by Pete, Doorman. Document filed by Facebook, Inc.. (Kinney, Justin)
April 4, 2011 ***NOTE TO ATTORNEY TO RE-FILE DOCUMENT - EVENT TYPE ERROR. Note to Attorney Justin Nolan Kinney to RE-FILE Document 8 Affirmation in Support of Motion. Use the event type Certificate of Service found under the event list Service of Process. (ldi)
April 4, 2011 Filing 8 FILING ERROR - WRONG EVENT TYPE SELECTED FROM MENU - AFFIRMATION of Justin N. Kinney in Support re: 4 MOTION to Transfer Case to the Northern District of California. MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint. MOTION for More Definite Statement. Document filed by Facebook, Inc. (Kinney, Justin) Modified on 4/5/2011 (ldi).
April 4, 2011 Filing 7 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 4 MOTION to Transfer Case to the Northern District of California. MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint. MOTION for More Definite Statement.. Document filed by Facebook, Inc.. (Kinney, Justin)
April 4, 2011 Filing 6 DECLARATION of Ana Yang in Support re: 4 MOTION to Transfer Case to the Northern District of California. MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint. MOTION for More Definite Statement.. Document filed by Facebook, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibits A and B to Declaration of Ana Yang)(Kinney, Justin)
April 4, 2011 Filing 5 DECLARATION of Justin N. Kinney in Support re: 4 MOTION to Transfer Case to the Northern District of California. MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint. MOTION for More Definite Statement.. Document filed by Facebook, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit A to Declaration of Justin N. Kinney)(Kinney, Justin)
April 4, 2011 Filing 4 MOTION to Transfer Case to the Northern District of California., MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint., MOTION for More Definite Statement.( Responses due by 5/4/2011) Document filed by Facebook, Inc..(Kinney, Justin)
March 8, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 3 SCHEDULING ORDER: The Court establishes the following briefing schedule for a motion by defendant Facebook, Inc. to transfer or dismiss this action: Defendant's motion by April 4, 2011; Opposition papers by May 4, 2011; Reply papers by May 18, 2011. SO ORDERED. Motions due by 4/4/2011. Responses due by 5/4/2011. Replies due by 5/18/2011. (Signed by Judge Richard J. Holwell on 3/7/2011) (lnl)
February 15, 2011 ***NOTE TO ATTORNEY TO E-MAIL PDF. Note to Attorney Justin Nolan Kinney for noncompliance with Section (14.3) of the S.D.N.Y. Electronic Case Filing Rules & Instructions. E-MAIL the PDF for Document 1 Notice of Removal, 2 Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement to: case_openings@nysd.uscourts.gov. (mro)
February 9, 2011 Filing 2 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Facebook, Inc.(mro) (ama).
February 9, 2011 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Supreme Court, County of New York. Case Number: 100975-11. (Filing Fee $ 350.00, Receipt Number 928838).Document filed by Facebook, Inc.(mro) (ama).
February 9, 2011 Magistrate Judge Theodore H. Katz is so designated. (mro)
February 9, 2011 Case Designated ECF. (mro)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Fteja v. Facebook, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mustafa Fteja
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Facebook Inc.
Represented By: Brian Patrick Hennessy
Represented By: Justin Nolan Kinney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?