Lewis v. Activision Blizzard, Inc. et al Featured Case
Plaintiff: Amanda Lewis
Defendant: Activision Blizzard, Inc. and Blizzard Entertainment, Inc
Case Number: 4:2012cv01096
Filed: March 5, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: Oakland Office
County: Orange
Presiding Judge: Claudia Wilken
Nature of Suit: Copyrights
Cause of Action: 17 U.S.C. ยง 501
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 25, 2014. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 26, 2012 Filing 14 MOTION to Dismiss Second and Third Claims for Relief of Plaintiff Amanda Lewis filed by Activision Blizzard, Inc., Blizzard Entertainment, Inc. Motion Hearing set for 6/7/2012 02:00 PM in Courtroom 2, 4th Floor, Oakland before Hon. Claudia Wilken. Responses due by 5/10/2012. Replies due by 5/17/2012. (Attachments: # 1 Request for Judicial Notice, # 2 Proposed Order)(Mayer, Marc) (Filed on 4/26/2012)
April 19, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 13 CASE MANAGEMENT SCHEDULING ORDER FOR REASSIGNED CIVIL CASE: Case Management Statement due by 6/13/2012. Case Management Conference set for 6/20/2012 02:00 PM. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 4/19/2012. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/19/2012)
April 19, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Hon. Claudia Wilken for all further proceedings. Judge Magistrate Judge Nathanael M. Cousins no longer assigned to the case. Signed by Executive Committee on 4/19/12. (mab, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/19/2012)
April 12, 2012 Filing 11 CLERK'S NOTICE of Impending Reassignment to U.S. District Judge. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/12/2012)
April 11, 2012 Filing 10 Declination to Proceed Before a U.S. Magistrate Judge by Activision Blizzard, Inc., Blizzard Entertainment, Inc . (Mayer, Marc) (Filed on 4/11/2012)
March 20, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER GRANTING Stipulation to Extend Time 8 by Judge Nathanael M. Cousins. This is a text only entry. There is no document associated with this notice. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/20/2012)
March 19, 2012 Filing 8 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER to extend time for defendants to respond to complaint filed by Activision Blizzard, Inc., Blizzard Entertainment, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Mayer, Marc) (Filed on 3/19/2012)
March 19, 2012 Filing 7 Certificate of Interested Entities by Activision Blizzard, Inc., Blizzard Entertainment, Inc identifying Other Affiliate Vivendi SA, Other Affiliate Activision Blizzard, Inc., Other Affiliate Blizzard Entertainment, Inc. for Activision Blizzard, Inc., Blizzard Entertainment, Inc. (Mayer, Marc) (Filed on 3/19/2012)
March 6, 2012 Filing 6 REPORT on the filing or determination of an action regarding: COPYRIGHT INFRINGEMENT (cc: form mailed to register). (aaa, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/6/2012)
March 5, 2012 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Blizzard Entertainment, Inc. (aaa, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/5/2012)
March 5, 2012 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Activision Blizzard, Inc. (aaa, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/5/2012)
March 5, 2012 Filing 3 Certificate of Interested Entities or Persons; by Amanda Lewis (aaa, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/5/2012)
March 5, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ADR SCHEDULING ORDER: Case Management Statement due by 6/13/2012. Case Management Conference set for 6/20/2012 10:00 AM. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nathanael Cousins on 3/5/12. (Attachments: # 1 NC Standing Order, # 2 Standing Order)(aaa, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/5/2012)
March 5, 2012 Filing 1 COMPLAINT FOR COPYRIGHT INFRINGEMENT; VOICE MISAPPROPRIATION; AND QUANTUM MERUIT: DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL; against Activision Blizzard, Inc., Blizzard Entertainment, Inc ( Filing fee $ 350.00, receipt number 34611071326.). Filed byAmanda Lewis. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet)(aaa, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/5/2012)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lewis v. Activision Blizzard, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Amanda Lewis
Represented By: Alan Edward Engle
Represented By: Stephen Harry Fredkin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Activision Blizzard, Inc.
Represented By: Marc E. Mayer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Blizzard Entertainment, Inc
Represented By: Marc E. Mayer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?