Trabakoolas et al v. Watts Water Technologies, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Jason Trabakoolas and Sheila Stetson
Defendant: Watts Water Technologies, Inc., Watts Regulator Company, Watts Anderson-Barrows Metal Corp., Watts Plumbing Technologies (Taizho) Co., Ltd., Savard Plumbing Company and Wolverine Brass, Inc.
Case Number: 4:2012cv01172
Filed: March 8, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: Oakland Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers
Nature of Suit: Tort Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 5, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 304 FINAL ORDER AND JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 08/05/2014. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/5/2014)
February 21, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 278 ORDER CONTINUING DATE FOR FINAL FAIRNESS HEARING re 277 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re 276 Order on Motion for Settlement. The final fairness hearing currently scheduled for June 25, 2014 is hereby CONTINUED to July 16, 2014 at 2:00 p.m. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 02/21/2014. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/21/2014)
February 14, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 276 ORDER GRANTING PRELIMINARY APPROVAL OF CLASS ACTION SETTLEMENT; CERTIFICATION OF SETTLEMENT CLASS; AND APPROVAL OF FORM AND CONTENT OF PROPOSED NOTICE by Hon. William H. Orrick as to 270 Motion for Settlement. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/14/2014)
December 12, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 267 ORDER re 266 Status Report. Case Management Conference scheduled for 12/17/2013 is vacated. Case Management Statement due by 1/31/2014. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 12/12/2013. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/12/2013)
November 6, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 264 ORDER STAYING LITIGATION AND PENDING DEADLINES UNTIL DECEMBER 10, 2013 re 263 Status Report. Case Management Statement due by 12/12/2013. Further Case Management Conference set for 12/17/2013 02:00 PM in Courtroom 2, 17th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 11/06/2013. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/6/2013)
August 22, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 258 STIPULATION AND ORDER STAYING LITIGATION AND PENDING DEADLINES FOR 45 DAYS re 256 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER. Within 30 days the parties will submit a joint report to the Court advising of the status of the settlement discussions and, if necessary, propose a schedule for further proceedings. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 08/22/2013. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/22/2013)
August 20, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 254 ORDER REGARDING DKT. NO. 213. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 8/20/13. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/20/2013)
August 19, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 228 CIVIL PRETRIAL ORDER FOR JURY TRIAL. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 08/19/2013. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/19/2013)
August 1, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 210 Order by Chief Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte granting in part and denying in part 152 Motion to Compel.(knmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/1/2013)
June 7, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 148 ORDER REGARDING JOINT DEPOSITION SCHEDULE. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 6/7/2013. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/7/2013)
May 30, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 144 ORDER by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers denying 124 Motion for In Camera Privilege Review. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/30/2013)
May 22, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 138 ORDER re 135 Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge for Discovery/ Privilege Dispute. Signed by Judge Elizabeth D Laporte on 5/22/2013. (knm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/22/2013)
May 17, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 137 Discovery Procedure Order. Signed by Judge Elizabeth D Laporte on 5/16/2013. (knm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/17/2013)
April 29, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 128 ORDER re 123 Discovery Letter Brief Discovery Dispute Joint Submission: Plaintiffs' Request for a Protective Order filed by Sheila Stetson, Jason Trabakoolas. The Court GRANTS Plaintiffs' request for a protective order. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 4/29/13. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/29/2013)
April 12, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 121 ORDER REGARDING PRIVILEGE DISPUTE INVOLVING COUNSEL FOR LIBERTY MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 4/12/13. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/12/2013)
April 10, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 120 STIPULATION AND PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 4/10/13. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/10/2013)
February 25, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 114 REVISED SCHEDULING ORDER [AS MODIFIED BY THE COURT] re 110 Proposed Order filed by Jason Trabakoolas, Set/Reset Deadlines as to 110 Proposed Order. Case Management Conference set 4/1/13 at 2:00pm.Plaintiff Motion for Class Certification file d by 8/27/13. Responses due by 9/17/2013. Replies due by 10/1/2013. Class Certification Motion Hearing set for 10/22/2013 02:00 PM in Courtroom 5, 2nd Floor, Oakland before Hon. Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 2/25/13. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/25/2013)
February 14, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 109 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE REGARDING DISCOVERY OF COMMUNICATIONS WITH INSURANCE COMPANY. Plaintiff Show Cause Response due by 2/20/2013; Defendants Response by 2/2/5/13. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 2/14/13. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/14/2013)
January 25, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 108 ORDER CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AND REQUIRING PERSONAL APPEARANCE OF TRIAL COUNSEL TO MEET AND CONFER. Case Management Conference set for 1/28/2013 is CONTINUED to Monday, 2/11/2013 02:00 PM in Courtroom 5, 2nd Floor, Oakland. Counsel to Meet and Confer re Discovery Disputes on 2/11/2013 09:30 AM. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 1/25/13. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/25/2013)
October 25, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 99 ORDER REGARDING re 97 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Appointing Interim Lead Counsel filed by Wolverine Brass, Inc., Sheila Stetson, Watts Regulator Company, Watts Water Technologies, Inc., Jason Trabakoolas. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 10/25/12. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/25/2012)
October 22, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 98 STIPULATION AND ORDER FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 10/22/12. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/22/2012)
October 17, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 96 ORDER by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers GRANTING 87 STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER (AS MODIFIED BY THE COURT). (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/17/2012).
October 9, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 93 STIPULATION AND ORDER RE TERMS OF DISMISSAL OF TAIZHOU AND WITHDRAWAL OF MOTION TO DISMISS FOR LACK OF PERSONAL JURISDICTION, Motions terminated: 72 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction [FRCP 12(b)(2)] filed by Watts Plumbin g Technologies (Taizho) Co., Ltd., 91 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re 72 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction [FRCP 12(b)(2)] filed by Watts Plumbing Technologies (Taizho) Co., Ltd., Watts Plumbing Technologies (Taizho) Co., Ltd. terminated. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 10/9/12. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/9/2012)
October 2, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 89 ORDER REQUIRING ADDITIONAL BRIEFING REGARDING MOTION TO DISMISS. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 10/2/12. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/2/2012)
September 18, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 84 ORDER STRIKING DEFENDANT WATTS PLUMBING TECHNOLOGIES(TAIZHOU)CO. LTD.'S MOTION TO STRIKE re 82 MOTION to Strike Inadmisisble Evidence Offered by Plaintiffs in Opposition to Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction filed by Watts Plumbing Technologies (Taizho) Co., Ltd.. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 9/18/12. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/18/2012)
August 15, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 71 ORDER REQUIRING RE-FILING OF MOTION TO DISMISS FOR LACK OF JURISDICTION AND VACTING HEARING. Motions terminated: 67 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Watts Plumbing Technologies (Taizho) Co., Ltd. The hearing scheduled for September 11, 2012 is VACATED. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 8/15/12. (kc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/15/2012)
July 11, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 63 SCHEDULING ORDER re 61 Proposed Order filed by Sheila Stetson, Jason Trabakoolas. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 7/11/12. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/11/2012)
July 9, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 62 ORDER by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers granting in part and denying in part 44 Defendants' Amended Motion to Dismiss Second and Fifth Causes of Action, or in the Alternative, Strike Certain Allegations. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/9/2012)
June 6, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ORDER REQUIRING ADDITIONAL BRIEFING REGARDING MOTION TO DISMISS. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 6/6/12. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/6/2012)
April 27, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER VACATING ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 4/27/12. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/27/2012)
April 26, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE REGARDING DEFENDANTS' FAILURE TO COMPLY WITH CIVIL LOCAL RULE 7-2 AND THIS COURT'S STANDING ORDER IN CIVIL CASES Order to Show Cause Hearing set for 5/4/2012 09:01 AM. Show Cause Response due by 4/30/2012. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 4/26/12. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/26/2012)
March 14, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER, Case reassigned to Hon. Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers. Magistrate Judge Maria-Elena James no longer assigned to the case. Signed by Executive Committee on 3/14/12. (ha, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/14/2012)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Trabakoolas et al v. Watts Water Technologies, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Watts Water Technologies, Inc.
Represented By: David Spruance MacCuish
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Watts Regulator Company
Represented By: David Spruance MacCuish
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Watts Anderson-Barrows Metal Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Watts Plumbing Technologies (Taizho) Co., Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Savard Plumbing Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wolverine Brass, Inc.
Represented By: Brian Seishin Inamine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jason Trabakoolas
Represented By: Charles J Kocher
Represented By: Simon Bahne Paris
Represented By: Patrick Howard
Represented By: Jeff D Friedman
Represented By: Elaine T. Byszewski
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Represented By: Todd Anthony Seaver
Represented By: Anthony D. Shapiro
Represented By: Joseph J. Tabacco, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sheila Stetson
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Represented By: Elaine T. Byszewski
Represented By: Jeff D Friedman
Represented By: Patrick Howard
Represented By: Charles J Kocher
Represented By: Simon Bahne Paris
Represented By: Todd Anthony Seaver
Represented By: Anthony D. Shapiro
Represented By: Joseph J. Tabacco, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?