Yelp Inc. v. Datafiniti LLC et al Featured Case
Plaintiff: Yelp Inc.
Defendant: Datafiniti LLC and Shion Deysarkar
Case Number: 4:2012cv01444
Filed: March 22, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: Oakland Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: Donna M. Ryu
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 14, 2013. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 29, 2012 Filing 7 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Yelp Inc. Proof of service as to defendant Shion Deysarkar (Lewis, Marc) (Filed on 3/29/2012)
March 29, 2012 Filing 6 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Yelp Inc. Proof of service as to defendant Datafiniti (Lewis, Marc) (Filed on 3/29/2012)
March 28, 2012 Filing 5 NOTICE by Yelp Inc. Notice of Pendency of Other Action or Proceeding (Lewis, Marc) (Filed on 3/28/2012)
March 26, 2012 Filing 4 Certificate of Interested Entities by Yelp Inc. and Disclosure Statement (Lewis, Marc) (Filed on 3/26/2012)
March 22, 2012 Filing 3 ADR SCHEDULING ORDER: Case Management Statement due by 7/4/2012. Case Management Conference set for 7/11/2012 01:30 PM. (Attachments: # 1 Standing Order)(vlk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/22/2012)
March 22, 2012 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Datafiniti LLC, Shion Deysarkar. (vlk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/22/2012)
March 22, 2012 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with jury demand against Datafiniti LLC, Shion Deysarkar ( Filing fee $ 350, receipt number 34611072037.). Filed byYelp Inc.. (vlk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/22/2012)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Yelp Inc. v. Datafiniti LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Yelp Inc.
Represented By: Marc Robert Lewis
Represented By: Paul Timothy Llewellyn
Represented By: Aaron Schur
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Datafiniti LLC
Represented By: Gregory Kent Klingsporn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shion Deysarkar
Represented By: Gregory Kent Klingsporn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?