Intellisoft, Ltd v. International Business Machines Corporation
Plaintiff: Intellisoft, Ltd
Defendant: International Business Machines Corporation
Case Number: 4:2012cv01462
Filed: March 22, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: Oakland Office
County: Los Angeles
Presiding Judge: Phyllis J. Hamilton
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 17, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 68 ORDER re 67 Order on Motion for Discovery, Order on Motion for Leave to File,,. Signed by Judge Hamilton on 10/17/2014. (pjhlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/17/2014)
October 10, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 51 ORDER. Signed by Judge Hamilton on 10/10/2014. (pjhlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/10/2014)
September 13, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER by Judge Hamilton granting in part and denying in part 19 Motion to Dismiss; ORDER staying case. (pjhlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/13/2012)
August 10, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER CONTINUING HEARING DATE. Signed by Judge Hamilton on 8/10/2012. (pjhlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/10/2012)
June 22, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER. Signed by Judge Hamilton on 6/22/2012. (pjhlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/22/2012)
May 1, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Joint Case Management Statement due by 7/5/2012. Initial Case Management Conference set for 7/12/2012 02:00 PM. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 5/1/12. (nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/1/2012)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Intellisoft, Ltd v. International Business Machines Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: International Business Machines Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Intellisoft, Ltd
Represented By: Mickel Montalban Arias
Represented By: J. Paul Gignac
Represented By: Helen U Kim
Represented By: Thomas Gerard Stolpman
Represented By: Alfredo Torrijos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?