Smith v. Payne et al
Plaintiff: Gwendolyn Smith
Defendant: Paul Payne and Santa Rosa Press Democrat
Case Number: 4:2012cv01732
Filed: April 6, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: Oakland Office
County: Sonoma
Presiding Judge: Donna M. Ryu
Nature of Suit: Other Personal Injury
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 15, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 76 Order by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu granting 58 Motion for Attorney Fees.(dmrlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/15/2013)
December 26, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 54 Order by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu granting 34 Motion to Strike and Dismissing Complaint.(dmrlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/26/2012)
September 21, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER re 26 Letter filed by Paul Payne, Santa Rosa Press Democrat. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 09/21/2012. (dmrlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/21/2012)
July 13, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER Setting Case Management Conference after reassignment. Case Management Statement due by 9/5/2012. Initial Case Management Conference set for 9/12/2012 01:30 PM. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 7/13/2012. (hlkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/13/2012)
July 12, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER Withdrawing 11 Order for Reassignment. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 7/12/2012. (hlkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/12/2012)
July 6, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER for Reassignment. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 7/6/2012. (hlkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/6/2012) (Additional attachment(s) added on 7/6/2012: # 1 Certificate/Proof of Service) (ig, COURT STAFF).
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Smith v. Payne et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paul Payne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Santa Rosa Press Democrat
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gwendolyn Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?