Whitley et al v. National Railroad Passenger Corporation
Plaintiff: Derrell Whitley, Odis Tillis, Jr., Stanley Jacks, Willis Frazier, III, Melvin Jones, Tamika McGee, Alesia Styner, Andre Smith, Mark Green, Alfred Henry and Albert Harris
Defendant: National Railroad Passenger Corporation
Case Number: 4:2012cv01781
Filed: April 10, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: Oakland Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: Saundra Brown Armstrong
Nature of Suit: Employment
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 19, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 70 STIPULATION AND ORDER DISMISSING CASE WITH PREJUDICE, ***Civil Case Terminated.. Signed by Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley on 8/19/2014. (tlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/19/2014)
March 3, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 63 AMENDED PRETRIAL ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley on 3/3/2014. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/3/2014) Modified on 3/3/2014 (ahm, COURT STAFF).
March 21, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 42 AMENDED CASE MANAGEMENT SCHEDULING ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley on 3/21/2013. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/21/2013)
February 4, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER NO. 1 RE: DISCOVERY. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley on 2/4/2013. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/4/2013)
January 11, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 30 STIPULATION AND ORDER re (29 in 3:12-cv-01781-JSC) STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER [Stipulated Protective Order], (15 in 3:12-cv-02381-JSC) STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER [Stipulated Protective Order]. Signed by Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley on January 11, 2013. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/11/2013)
August 31, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 21 PRETRIAL ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley on 8/30/2012. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/31/2012)
August 8, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 16 STIPULATION AND ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge. Signed by Judge ARMSTRONG on 8/8/12. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/8/2012)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Whitley et al v. National Railroad Passenger Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: National Railroad Passenger Corporation
Represented By: Philip James Smith
Represented By: L. Julius M. Turman
Represented By: Adelmise Roseme Warner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Derrell Whitley
Represented By: Paul Brian Justi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Odis Tillis, Jr.
Represented By: Paul Brian Justi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stanley Jacks
Represented By: Paul Brian Justi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Willis Frazier, III
Represented By: Paul Brian Justi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Melvin Jones
Represented By: Paul Brian Justi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tamika McGee
Represented By: Paul Brian Justi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alesia Styner
Represented By: Paul Brian Justi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Andre Smith
Represented By: Paul Brian Justi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mark Green
Represented By: Paul Brian Justi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alfred Henry
Represented By: Paul Brian Justi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Albert Harris
Represented By: Paul Brian Justi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?