Verdiyan v. Capital One, N.A. et al
Plaintiff: Irina V. Verdiyan
Defendant: Capital One, N.A., Trans Union LLC, Equifax Information Services LLC and Experian Infornation Solutions, Inc.
Case Number: 4:2012cv01841
Filed: April 12, 2012
Court: U.S. District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: Oakland Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Claudia Wilken
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1681
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 12, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 64 ORDER OF CONDITIONAL DISMISSAL. Signed by Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte on 9/9/13. (mclS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/12/2013)
September 10, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 63 ORDER OF CONDITIONAL DISMISSAL. Signed by Judge Elizabeth D Laporte on 9/9/2013. (knm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/10/2013)
September 5, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 60 ORDER regarding settlement conference. The parties have a settlement conference set for Monday, September 9, 2013. The court requires a demand, a response, attorney's fees and costs to date and projected through trial, and the persons atten ding. See Order, ECF No. 55 at 4-5. Defendant's statement does not include its attorney's fees and costs or the persons attending, and it also does not provide a response to Plaintiff's demand. The court directs Defendant to email t his missing information to the court today to lbpo@cand.uscourts.gov. (With respect to the attorney's fees and costs to date and projected through trial, Defendant may let the court know confidentially.) If that time line is too ambitious for a response to Plaintiff's most recent demand, Defendant must make best efforts to submit the response to Plaintiff and the court as soon as possible and in any event in sufficient time before Monday's settlement conference for Plaintif f to digest it with counsel. If the holiday affects the timing of Defendant's response, that is fine, but this needs to be accomplished before Monday. Signed by Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler on 9/5/2013. (lblc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/5/2013)
June 18, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 52 ORDER OF REFERENCE TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE UPON CONSENT AND SETTING CERTAIN CASE MANAGEMENT DATES (CASE to Magistrate Judge Laporte and to Magistrate Judge Beeler for Settlement). Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 6/18/2013. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/18/2013)
February 15, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken Granting 43 Stipulation CONTINUING FACT AND EXPERT DISCOVERY CUT-OFF. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/15/2013)
October 22, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER Granting 40 Stipulation for Dismissal of Equifax. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 10/22/2012. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/22/2012)
October 15, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER RE: ATTENDANCE AT MEDIATION. Signed by Judge Laporte on 10/15/12. (edllc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/15/2012)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Verdiyan v. Capital One, N.A. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Irina V. Verdiyan
Represented By: Mark F. Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Capital One, N.A.
Represented By: Christian Penn Foote
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Trans Union LLC
Represented By: Breanne J. Strubinger
Represented By: Debra J. Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Equifax Information Services LLC
Represented By: Thomas P. Quinn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Experian Infornation Solutions, Inc.
Represented By: Angela M. Taylor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?