First National Insurance Company of America v. Cutting Edge Grading, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: First National Insurance Company of America
Defendant: Billy Joe Taylor, Cutting Edge Grading, Inc. and Lou's Rental
Case Number: 4:2012cv01928
Filed: April 18, 2012
Court: U.S. District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: Oakland Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: Donna M. Ryu
Nature of Suit: Other Contract
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 9, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER DISMISSING CASE: The Court has reviewed the Notice of Bankruptcy indicating that all defendants in this case have now filed for bankruptcy protection.THEREFORE IT IS HEREBY ORDERED this case shall be stayed and statistically closed due to the pending bankruptcy proceeding. Signed by Judge Illston on 8/9/12 (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/9/2012)
August 8, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 20 JUDGE ILLSTON'S STANDING ORDER (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/8/2012)
July 13, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER VACATING INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AND SETTING DEADLINE TO FILE MOTION FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT. Motions due by 8/31/2012. Consent or declination to proceed before United States Magistrate Judge due by 7/25/2012. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 7/13/2012. (hlkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/13/2012)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: First National Insurance Company of America v. Cutting Edge Grading, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Billy Joe Taylor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cutting Edge Grading, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lou's Rental
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: First National Insurance Company of America
Represented By: James D. Curran
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?