Brandix v. Seton Medical Center et al
Plaintiff: Elizabeth A. Brandix
Defendant: Rosanne Slusar, Nancy Mattis, Seton Medical Center and Daughters of Charity Health System
Case Number: 4:2012cv02096
Filed: April 26, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: Oakland Office
County: San Mateo
Presiding Judge: Donna M. Ryu
Nature of Suit: Employment
Cause of Action: 42:2000
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 15, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 70 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 69 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER of Dismissal filed by Seton Medical Center, Daughters of Charity Health Systems, Elizabeth Bradix. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on July 15, 2013. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/15/2013)
June 28, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 68 ORDER TO FILE STIPULATION FOR DISMISSAL re 67 Stipulation filed by Daughters of Charity Health System, Seton Medical Center. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on June 28, 2013. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/28/2013)
May 14, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 65 ORDER TO FILE STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL re 63 Settlement Conference. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on May 14, 2013. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/14/2013)
May 13, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 64 ORDER RE SEALED TRANSCRIPT as to 63 Settlement Conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 5/13/13. (ig, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/13/2013)
February 5, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 55 ORDER DENYING IN PART AND GRANTING IN PART DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO DISMISS WITHOUT LEAVE TO AMEND; DENYING DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO STRIKE 41 (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 2/5/2013)
October 16, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO DISMISS WITH LEAVE TO AMEND 21 (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 10/16/2012)
September 4, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR CONTINUANCE; SETTING NEW BRIEFING AND HEARING SCHEDULE 24 (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 9/4/2012)
July 30, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER CONTINUING INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Case Management Statement due by 9/19/2012. Initial Case Management Conference set for 9/26/2012 01:30 PM in Courtroom 4, 3rd Floor, Oakland. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 7/30/2012. (hlkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/30/2012)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Brandix v. Seton Medical Center et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rosanne Slusar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nancy Mattis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Seton Medical Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Daughters of Charity Health System
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elizabeth A. Brandix
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?