American Automobile Association Inc v. Monterey Surf Inn et al
Plaintiff: American Automobile Association Inc
Defendant: Monterey Surf Inn and Digen Patel
Case Number: 4:2012cv02387
Filed: May 11, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: Oakland Office
County: Monterey
Presiding Judge: Claudia Wilken
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1114
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
November 2, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER Granting 27 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 11/2/2012. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/2/2012)
October 2, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken Granting 20 Motion to Continue. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/2/2012)
July 23, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER re 10 Default. Case Management Statement due by 10/24/2012. Case Management Conference set for 10/31/2012 02:00 PM. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 7/23/2012. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/23/2012)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: American Automobile Association Inc v. Monterey Surf Inn et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: American Automobile Association Inc
Represented By: Michael David Adams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Monterey Surf Inn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Digen Patel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?