Jack v. Jack
Plaintiff: Joseph Rolando Jack
Defendant: Loretta Jack
Case Number: 4:2012cv02459
Filed: May 15, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: Oakland Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: Donna M. Ryu
Nature of Suit: Other Personal Injury
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 12, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 70 Order by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu granting 58 Motion to Dismiss.(dmrlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/12/2013)
December 5, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 60 Order by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu granting 59 Motion to Substitute Attorney. Added attorney Gary Robert Lieberman for Loretta Jack. (dmrlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/5/2012)
November 27, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 51 Order by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu granting 48 Motion to Appear by Telephone.(dmrlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/27/2012)
October 2, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER re 40 Letter filed by Joseph Rolando Jack. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 10/02/2012. (dmrlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/2/2012)
September 17, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 39 Order by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu granting 10 Motion to Dismiss.(dmrlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/17/2012)
September 4, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 9/4/2012. (dmrlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/4/2012)
August 17, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 8/17/2012. (dmrlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/17/2012)
August 16, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 8/16/2012. (dmrlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/16/2012)
August 15, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 8/15/2012. (dmrlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/15/2012)
July 31, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER re 10 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Loretta Jack Case Management Statement due by 9/6/2012. Initial Case Management Conference set for 6/13/2012 11:00 AM in Courtroom 4, 3rd Floor, Oakland. Motion Hearing set for 9/13/2012 11:00 AM in Courtroom 4, 3rd Floor, Oakland before Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu.. Signed by Judge Donna M. Ryu on 7/31/2012. (dmrlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/31/2012)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jack v. Jack
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph Rolando Jack
Represented By: Chaune Marie Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Loretta Jack
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?