Ruff et al v. Diversified Collection Services, Inc.
Plaintiff: Bridgette Ruff and Leeing Haworth
Defendant: Diversified Collection Services, Inc.
Case Number: 4:2012cv02781
Filed: May 31, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: Oakland Office
County: Contra Costa
Presiding Judge: Donna M. Ryu
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1692
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
December 19, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER OF DISMISSAL. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 12/19/2012. (tmi, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/19/2012)
December 13, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 29 SUPPLEMENTAL ORDER for additional information (Plaintiffs by 12/13/12 at noon and both parties by 12/17/12 at 9:30 a.m.). Signed by Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler on 12/13/2012. (Beeler, Laurel) (Filed on 12/13/2012)
December 12, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE re Plaintiff's failure to submit settlement conference statement and instructions to parties to correct deficiencies. Court orders meet and confer by 10 a.m. on 12/13/2012, e-filed statement by Plaintiff showing cause by 12 noon on 12/13/12, emailed settlement papers to be submitted by Plaintiff by noon on 12/13/12, and supplemental submission by Defendant by 2 p.m. on 12/13/12. Signed by Judge Beeler on 12/12/12. (Beeler, Laurel) (Filed on 12/12/2012)
September 18, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 20 STIPULATION AND ORDER Selecting ADR Process. Case referred to mediation. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 09/18/2012. (tmi, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/18/2012)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ruff et al v. Diversified Collection Services, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bridgette Ruff
Represented By: G. Thomas Martin, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Leeing Haworth
Represented By: G. Thomas Martin, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Diversified Collection Services, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?