Carr v. Beverly Health and Rehabilitation Services, Inc.
Plaintiff: Andrew Carr
Defendant: Beverly Health and Rehabilitation Services, Inc.
Case Number: 4:2012cv02980
Filed: June 8, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Sonoma
Presiding Judge: Donna M. Ryu
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 28:1331 Fed. Question: Fair Labor Standards
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 21, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 98 STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL re 97 Stipulation filed by Andrew Carr. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 9/21/15. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/21/2015)
February 14, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 85 ORDER by Judge Edward M. Chen Denying 71 Veurink's Motion to Intervene. (emcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/14/2014)
January 3, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 74 ORDER by Judge Edward M. Chen denying 67 Plaintiff's Motion to Reconsider (emclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/3/2014)
December 4, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 68 ORDER re Briefing Schedule for 67 Plaintiff's Motion to Reconsider. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 12/4/2013. (emclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/4/2013)
November 5, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 65 ORDER by Judge Edward M. Chen Granting 55 Defendant's Motion to Dismiss. (emcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/5/2013)
June 24, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 46 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 45 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE filed by Andrew Carr Case Management Statement due by 7/18/2013. Case Management Conference set for 7/25/2013 09:00 AM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 6/24/13. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/24/2013)
April 12, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 44 STIPULATION AND ORDER VACATING 5/9/13 MOTION HEARING AND RESETTING CMC TO 6/27/13 re 43 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER CONTINUING MOTION TO DISMISS AND CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE filed by Beverly Health and Rehabilitation Services, Inc., Motions terminated: 6 MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to F.R.C.P. 12(B)(6) filed by Beverly Health and Rehabilitation Services, Inc., 43 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER CONTINUING MOTION TO DISMISS AND CASE MANAGEMENT CONFER ENCE filed by Beverly Health and Rehabilitation Services, Inc.. Case Management Statement due by 6/20/2013. Case Management Conference set for 6/27/2013 09:00 AM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 4/12/13. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/12/2013)
March 6, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 41 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 40 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER CONTINUING MOTION TO DISMISS AND CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE filed by Andrew Carr, Set/Reset Deadlines as to 40 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER CONTINUING MOTION TO DIS MISS AND CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE, 6 MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to F.R.C.P. 12(B)(6). Case Management Statement due by 4/25/2013. Case Management Conference set for 5/2/2013 01:30 PM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco. Motion Hearing set for 5/2/2013 01:30 PM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Edward M. Chen.. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 3/6/13. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/6/2013)
January 10, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 39 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 38 CONTINUING MOTION TO DISMISS AND CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE filed by Andrew Carr, Set/Reset Deadlines as to 38 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER CONTINUING MOTION TO DISMISS AND CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE, 6 MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to F.R.C.P. 12(B)(6). Motion Hearing set for 3/14/2013 01:30 PM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Edward M. Chen.. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 1/10/13. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/10/2013)
November 8, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 37 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 36 CONTINUING MOTION TO DISMISS AND CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE filed by Andrew Carr, Set/Reset Deadlines as to 36 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER CONTINUING MOTION TO DISMISS AND CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE, 6 MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to F.R.C.P. 12(B)(6). Case Management Statement due by 1/10/2013. Case Management Conference set for 1/17/2013 01:30 PM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco. Motion Hearing set for 1/17/2013 01:30 PM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Edward M. Chen.. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 11/8/12. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/8/2012)
October 4, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 35 STIPULATION AND ORDER CONTINUING MOTION TO DISMISS AND CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Case Management Statement due by 12/7/2012. Case Management Conference set for 12/14/2012 01:30 PM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco. Motion Hearing set for 12/14/2012 01:30 PM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Edward M. Chen. Signed by Judge Edward Chen on 10/4/12. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/4/2012)
September 12, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 33 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 30 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER CONTINUING MOTION TO DISMISS AND CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE filed by Andrew Carr Motion and CMC set for 11/9/12 at 1:30 p.m.. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 9/11/12. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/12/2012)
August 8, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 25 STANDING ORDER. Signed by Judge EDWARD M. CHEN on 8/8/12. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/8/2012)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Carr v. Beverly Health and Rehabilitation Services, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Andrew Carr
Represented By: Alan Dale Harris
Represented By: David S. Harris
Represented By: Abigail Ameri Treanor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Beverly Health and Rehabilitation Services, Inc.
Represented By: Sharon Beth Bauman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?