Mann et al v. Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. et al
Plaintiff: Michael W. Mann and Evelyn F. Mann
Defendant: Wells Fargo Home Mortgage, Inc., America's Servicing Company and Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.
Case Number: 4:2012cv03014
Filed: June 12, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: Oakland Office
County: San Mateo
Presiding Judge: Donna M. Ryu
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1681
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 16, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER DISMISSING CASE. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 08/16/2013. (dmrlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/16/2013)
March 15, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER Continuing Case Management Conference. Case Management Statement due by 5/22/2013. Case Management Conference set for 5/29/2013 01:30 PM. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 03/15/2013. (dmrlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/15/2013)
December 4, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 28 Order by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu denying 16 Motion to Dismiss.(dmrlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/4/2012)
November 29, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 27 CASE MANAGEMENT AND PRETRIAL ORDER: Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 11/29/12. (ig, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/29/2012)
November 8, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 24 Order by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu granting 23 Motion to Continue.(dmrlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/8/2012)
October 12, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER Continuing Case Management Conference. Case Management Statement due by 11/1/2012. Case Management Conference set for 11/8/2012 11:00 AM. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 10/12/2012. (dmrlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/12/2012)
August 27, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 12 Order by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu granting 7 Motion to Dismiss.(dmrlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/27/2012)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mann et al v. Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wells Fargo Home Mortgage, Inc.
Represented By: Daska P Babcock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: America's Servicing Company
Represented By: Daska P Babcock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.
Represented By: Daska P Babcock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael W. Mann
Represented By: Paul Gerard Minoletti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Evelyn F. Mann
Represented By: Paul Gerard Minoletti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?