Creditors Trade Association, Inc. v. Globalware Solutions, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Creditors Trade Association, Inc.
Defendant: John P. Viliesis, Globalware Solutions, Inc., Globalware Solutions Massachusetts, Inc. and David I. Beatson
Case Number: 4:2012cv03110
Filed: June 15, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Sonoma
Presiding Judge: Donna M. Ryu
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Other Contract
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 14, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ORDER APPROVING STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on May 14, 2013. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/14/2013)
April 26, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER DIRECTING PLAINTIFF TO SHOW CAUSE WHY ACTION SHOULD NOT BE DISMISSED FOR LACK OF SUBJECT MATTER JURISDICTION Plaintiff is ordered to show cause, in writing and no later than May 10, 2013, why the instant action should not be dismissed for lack of subject-matter jurisdiction. Defendants Beatson and Viliesis shall file any response no later than May 17, 2013, on which date, unless the parties are otherwise advised, the Court will take the matter under submission. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on April 26, 2013. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/26/2013)
March 11, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO SET ASIDE DEFAULT AND DEFAULT JUDGMENT; VACATING HEARING; DIRECTIONS TO CLERK; DIRECTIONS TO DEFENDANTS. Beatson and Viliesis's motion is granted; the entry of default and entry of default judgment, as against Beatson an d Viliesis, are set aside, and the Clerk is directed to reopen the case. Beatson and Viliesis are directed to file their response(s) to the complaint no later than March 29, 2013. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on March 11, 2013. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/11/2013)
September 14, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER VACATING INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AND SETTING DEADLINE FOR FILING MOTION FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 09/14/2012. (dmrlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/14/2012)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Creditors Trade Association, Inc. v. Globalware Solutions, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John P. Viliesis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Globalware Solutions, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Globalware Solutions Massachusetts, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David I. Beatson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Creditors Trade Association, Inc.
Represented By: Stephen M. Kappos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?