Varela et al v. Wells Fargo Home Mortgage et al
Plaintiff: Jaime Varela and Noelia L Varela
Defendant: Wells Fargo Home Mortgage and Cal-Western Reconveyance Corp.
Case Number: 4:2012cv03502
Filed: July 5, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: Oakland Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: Kandis A. Westmore
Nature of Suit: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1444
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 22, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 66 ORDER DISMISSING CASE. Signed by Judge Kandis A. Westmore on July 22, 2013. (kawlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/22/2013)
June 4, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 64 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE Show Cause Response due by 6/18/2013.. Signed by Judge Kandis A. Westmore on June 4, 2013. (kawlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/4/2013)
May 16, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 62 ORDER by Judge Kandis A. Westmore granting 53 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney September Joy Katje and Kimberly A Harris Moses terminated (kawlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/16/2013)
April 30, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 58 ORDER by Judge Kandis A. Westmore granting 48 Motion to Dismiss with leave to amend. (kawlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/30/2013)
April 15, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 56 ORDER by Judge Kandis A. Westmore denying 55 Motion to Appear by Telephone, vacating hearing on Defendants' Motion to Dismiss. (kawlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/15/2013)
December 21, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER by Judge Kandis A. Westmore granting 15 Motion to Dismiss; denying 16 Motion to Strike. Plaintiff may file an amended complaint within 30 days. (kawlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/21/2012)
December 3, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER by Judge Kandis A. Westmore granting 42 Motion to Appear by Telephone (kawlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/3/2012)
October 23, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER re: Attendance at Mediation. Signed by Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte on 10/23/2012. (tmi, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/23/2012)
October 12, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER vacating 35 ADR Scheduling Order. Signed by Judge Kandis A. Westmore on 10/12/2012. (kawlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/12/2012)
October 3, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER re 33 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re Set Deadlines/Hearings filed by Jaime Varela, Noelia L Varela, Wells Fargo Home Mortgage Case Management Conference set for 12/6/2012 11:00 AM in Courtroom 4, 3rd Floor, Oakland. Motion Hearing set for 12/6/2012 11:00 AM in Courtroom 4, 3rd Floor, Oakland before Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore.. Signed by Judge Kandis A. Westmore on October 3, 2012. (kawlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/3/2012)
September 27, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER by Judge Kandis A. Westmore denying 30 Motion to Appear by Telephone; denying 31 Stipulation; rescheduling hearings for 15 Motion to Dismiss, 16 Motion to Strike (kawlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/27/2012)
August 22, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 23 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 21 STIPULATION and Proposed Order selecting Mediation by Wells Fargo Home Mortgage filed by Jaime Varela, Noelia L Varela, Wells Fargo Home Mortgage. Signed by Judge Kandis Westmore on 8/20/12. (sisS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/22/2012)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Varela et al v. Wells Fargo Home Mortgage et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jaime Varela
Represented By: September Joy Katje
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Noelia L Varela
Represented By: September Joy Katje
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wells Fargo Home Mortgage
Represented By: Daniel A Armstrong
Represented By: Jeremy E Shulman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cal-Western Reconveyance Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?