Aguiar et al v. Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. et al
Plaintiff: Susan Aguiar and Roberto Aguiar
Defendant: Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. and Regional Service Corporation
Case Number: 4:2012cv03653
Filed: July 12, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: Oakland Office
County: Marin
Presiding Judge: Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers
Nature of Suit: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 11, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER DISMISSING CASE FOR FAILURE TO PROSECUTE, ***Civil Case Terminated.The Case Management Conference set for Monday, January 14, 2013 is VACATED. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 1/11/13. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/11/2013)
November 26, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers dismissing with Leave to Amend 7 Motion to Dismiss (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/26/2012)
October 26, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER VACATING HEARING. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 10/26/12. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/26/2012)
September 20, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER REGARDING PLAINTIFF'S FAILURE TO FILE AN OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers.Plaintiff's Opposition to Motion to Dismiss to be filed no later than 9/28/2012; Hearing date of 10/9/2012 is V ACATED. The Court re-sets the hearing for October 30, 2012; granting 11 Stipulation to Continue the Date for Plaintiffs to File an Opposition; Denying as moot 18 Defendant's Motion to Appear by Telephone at the October 9, 2012 Hearing. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/20/2012)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Aguiar et al v. Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Susan Aguiar
Represented By: James Zachary Margolis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Roberto Aguiar
Represented By: James Zachary Margolis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.
Represented By: Michael Rapkine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Regional Service Corporation
Represented By: Nicolas Adam Daluiso
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?