Braun v. Primary Distributor Doe Number One
Plaintiff: Axel Braun
Defendant: Primary Distributor Doe Number One
Case Number: 4:2012cv03690
Filed: July 13, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: Oakland Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: Jacqueline Scott Corley
Presiding Judge: Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers
Nature of Suit: Copyrights
Cause of Action: 17 U.S.C. ยง 501
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 8, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER DISCHARGING OSC AND CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Case Management Conference set for 5/13/2013 is CONTINUED to 8/12/2013 02:00 PM in Courtroom 5, 2nd Floor, Oakland. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 5/8/13. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/8/2013)
April 17, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE; CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Order to Show Cause Hearing set for 5/13/2013 02:00 PM. Show Cause Response due by 5/6/2013. Case Management Conference set for 4/22/2013 is CONTINUED to 5/13/2013 02:00 PM in Courtroom 5, 2nd Floor, Oakland. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 4/17/13. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/17/2013)
February 20, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE Case Management Conference set for 2/25/2013 is CONTINUED to Monday, 4/22/2013 02:00 PM in Courtroom 5, 2nd Floor, Oakland. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 2/20/13. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/20/2013)
December 11, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE Case Management Conference set for 12/17/2012 is CONTINUED to 2/25/2013 02:00 PM in Courtroom 5, 2nd Floor, Oakland. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 12/11/12. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/11/2012)
August 21, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley granting 4 Motion for LEAVE TO TAKE DISCOVERY PRIOR TO RULE 26 CONFERENCE (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/21/2012)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Braun v. Primary Distributor Doe Number One
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Primary Distributor Doe Number One
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Axel Braun
Represented By: D. Gill Sperlein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?