Lord Abbett Municipal Income Fund, Inc. et al v. Asami et al
Plaintiff: Lord Abbett National Tax-Free Income Fund, Lord Abbett California Tax-Free Income Fund and Lord Abbett Municipal Income Fund, Inc.
Defendant: Jennifer Lowe Campbell, R. Thomas Beach, Tim Moppin, Roz Hamar, Natasha Beery, Curry Villeneuve, Joann Asami, Lynn De Jonghe, Jane Breyer, Oren Cheyette, Orpheus Crutchfield, Sarah Clugg, Andrew Weill, Joanne Rubio, Gina Moreland, Natalie Lenz-Acuna and Valerie McCann Woodson
Consolidated Defendant: Stone & Youngberg LLC
Case Number: 4:2012cv03694
Filed: July 13, 2012
Court: U.S. District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: Oakland Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: Donna M Ryu
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. § 1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 3, 2016. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 3, 2016 Filing 324 MANDATE of USCA as to (294 in 4:12-cv-03694-DMR) Notice of Appeal, filed by Lord Abbett National Tax-Free Income Fund, Lord Abbett Municipal Income Fund, Inc., Lord Abbett California Tax-Free Income Fund (vlkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/3/2016)
August 2, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 323 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu finding as moot #321 Defendant Stone & Youngberg's Motion for Taxation of Costs. On 8/1/2016, the Clerk issued a notice that Defendant Stone & Youngberg's costs could not be taxed because the cost bill was untimely. #320 After Stone & Youngberg filed a motion for review of taxation of costs, the Clerk taxed costs for Stone & Youngberg. #322 Accordingly, the Motion for Taxation of Costs is denied as moot. (This is a text-only entry; there is no document associated with this entry.)(dmrlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/2/2016)
August 2, 2016 Filing 322 Costs Taxed in amount of $54,224.52 against Lord Abbett re #316 Bill of Costs. (kc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/2/2016)
August 1, 2016 Filing 321 MOTION for Review of Taxation of Costs Defendant Stone & Youngberg's Motion to Review Clerk's Denial of Costs filed by Stone & Youngberg LLC. Motion Hearing set for 9/22/2016 11:00 AM in Courtroom 4, 3rd Floor, Oakland before Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu. Responses due by 8/15/2016. Replies due by 8/22/2016. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Jaskowiak, Nathan) (Filed on 8/1/2016)
August 1, 2016 Filing 320 CLERK'S NOTICE that costs cannot be taxed as cost bill is untimely per LR 54-1(a) re #316 Bill of Costs. (kc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/1/2016)
July 29, 2016 Filing 319 Response to #318 Objection by Stone & Youngberg LLC (Jaskowiak, Nathan) (Filed on 7/29/2016) Modified on 8/1/2016 (vlkS, COURT STAFF).
July 27, 2016 Filing 318 OBJECTIONS to #316 Stone & Youngberg's Bill of Costs by Lord Abbett California Tax-Free Income Fund, Lord Abbett Municipal Income Fund, Inc., Lord Abbett National Tax-Free Income Fund. (Tiedeken, Jennifer) (Filed on 7/27/2016) Modified on 7/28/2016 (vlkS, COURT STAFF).
July 22, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 317 ORDER of USCA as to (294 in 4:12-cv-03694-DMR) Notice of Appeal, filed by Lord Abbett National Tax-Free Income Fund, Lord Abbett Municipal Income Fund, Inc., Lord Abbett California Tax-Free Income Fund. Plaintiffs-Appellants petition for panel rehearing is DENIED. (vlkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/22/2016)
July 13, 2016 Filing 316 BILL OF COSTS by Stone & Youngberg LLC. Objections due by 7/27/2016 (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration of Nathan R. Jaskowiak ISO Bill of Costs, #2 Exhibit Exhibit A to the Declaration of Nathan R. Jaskowiak, #3 Exhibit Exhibit B to the Declaration of Nathan R. Jaskowiak, #4 Exhibit Exhibit C to the Declaration of Nathan R. Jaskowiak, #5 Exhibit Exhibit D to the Declaration of Nathan R. Jaskowiak, #6 Exhibit Exhibit E to the Declaration of Nathan R. Jaskowiak, #7 Exhibit Exhibit F to the Declaration of Nathan R. Jaskowiak, #8 Exhibit Exhibit G to the Declaration of Nathan R. Jaskowiak, #9 Exhibit Exhibit H to the Declaration of Nathan R. Jaskowiak, #10 Exhibit Exhibit I to the Declaration of Nathan R. Jaskowiak, #11 Exhibit Exhibit J to the Declaration of Nathan R. Jaskowiak, #12 Exhibit Exhibit K to the Declaration of Nathan R. Jaskowiak)(Jaskowiak, Nathan) (Filed on 7/13/2016)
December 4, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 315 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu granting #314 Stipulation Re Supersedeas Bond. (ig, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/4/2014)
December 1, 2014 Filing 314 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Regarding Supersedeas Bond filed by Lord Abbett California Tax-Free Income Fund, Lord Abbett Municipal Income Fund, Inc., Lord Abbett National Tax-Free Income Fund. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Tiedeken, Jennifer) (Filed on 12/1/2014)
October 29, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 313 Order by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu re #312 Joint Letter Brief.(dmrlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/29/2014)
September 25, 2014 Filing 312 Letter from Plaintiff Lord Abbett and Board Member Defendants Concerning Dispute Regarding Windrush School Computers. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Andrew Crain)(Pappas, Valeri) (Filed on 9/25/2014) Modified on 10/29/2014 (dmrlc1, COURT STAFF).
September 22, 2014 Filing 311 Costs Taxed in amount of $78,862.53 against Lord Abbett Municipal Income Fund, Inc. (kcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/22/2014)
September 17, 2014 Filing 310 Transcript of Proceedings held on June 26, 2014, before Judge Donna M. Ryu. Transcriber Raynee H. Mercado, Telephone number 510-502-6175, cacsr8258@gmail.com,. Tape Number: 11:03:44 - 12:03:48. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Re #280 Transcript Order, #281 Transcript Order, #283 Transcript Order ) Release of Transcript Restriction set for 10/30/2014. (Related document(s) #280 , #281 , #283 ) (rhm) (Filed on 9/17/2014)
September 3, 2014 Filing 309 REPLY in Support of #304 BILL OF COSTS by Joann Asami, R. Thomas Beach, Jane Breyer, Jennifer Lowe Campbell, Oren Cheyette, Lynn De Jonghe, Roz Hamar, Tim Moppin, Gina Moreland, Curry Villeneuve, Valerie McCann Woodson. (Attachments: #1 Declaration In Support of Reply, #2 Exhibit F, #3 Exhibit G, #4 Exhibit H, #5 Exhibit I)(Catalona, Alex) (Filed on 9/3/2014) Modified on 9/3/2014 (vlkS, COURT STAFF).
September 2, 2014 Filing 308 OBJECTIONS to re #304 Bill of Costs, by Lord Abbett California Tax-Free Income Fund, Lord Abbett Municipal Income Fund, Inc., Lord Abbett National Tax-Free Income Fund. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 to Declaration of Jennifer A. Tiedeken In Support Of Plaintiffs Objections to the Board, #2 Exhibit 2 to Declaration of Jennifer A. Tiedeken In Support Of Plaintiffs Objections to the Board, #3 Exhibit 3 to Declaration of Jennifer A. Tiedeken In Support Of Plaintiffs Objections to the Board, #4 Exhibit 4 to Declaration of Jennifer A. Tiedeken In Support Of Plaintiffs Objections to the Board, #5 Exhibit 5 to Declaration of Jennifer A. Tiedeken In Support Of Plaintiffs Objections to the Board, #6 Exhibit 6 to Declaration of Jennifer A. Tiedeken In Support Of Plaintiffs Objections to the Board, #7 Declaration of Jennifer A. Tiedeken In Support Of Plaintiffs Objections to the Board)(Tiedeken, Jennifer) (Filed on 9/2/2014)
August 28, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 307 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu granting #306 Stipulation to substitute Exhibit C to Docket #300 with new Exhibit C. (ig, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/28/2014)
August 21, 2014 Filing 306 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER To Replace Exhibit C to Dkt. No. 300 With New Exhibit C filed by Joann Asami, R. Thomas Beach, Jane Breyer, Jennifer Lowe Campbell, Oren Cheyette, Lynn De Jonghe, Roz Hamar, Tim Moppin, Gina Moreland, Curry Villeneuve, Valerie McCann Woodson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit New Exhibit C (part 1), #2 Exhibit New Exhibit C (part 2), #3 Proposed Order)(Catalona, Alex) (Filed on 8/21/2014)
August 19, 2014 Filing 305 Notice of Withdrawal of Motion To File Under Seal [Dkt. Nos. 300, 301] By The Board Member Defendants (Catalona, Alex) (Filed on 8/19/2014)
August 18, 2014 Filing 304 BILL OF COSTS of Board Member Defendants by Joann Asami, R. Thomas Beach, Jane Breyer, Jennifer Lowe Campbell, Oren Cheyette, Lynn De Jonghe, Roz Hamar, Tim Moppin, Gina Moreland, Curry Villeneuve, Valerie McCann Woodson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Declaration of Alex P. Catalona, #2 Exhibit B - Itemized Costs, #3 Exhibit C - Documentation (Part 1), #4 Exhibit C - Documentation (Part 2))(Catalona, Alex) (Filed on 8/18/2014)
August 18, 2014 Filing 303 Statement Regarding Bill of Costs by Stone & Youngberg LLC. (Jaskowiak, Nathan) (Filed on 8/18/2014)
August 18, 2014 Filing 302 Supplemental Declaration of Alex P. Catalona in Support of #300 Emergency Administrative Motion to File Documents Regarding Bill of Costs Under Seal filed by Joann Asami, R. Thomas Beach, Jane Breyer, Jennifer Lowe Campbell, Oren Cheyette, Lynn De Jonghe, Roz Hamar, Tim Moppin, Gina Moreland, Curry Villeneuve, Valerie McCann Woodson. (Related document(s) #300 ) (Catalona, Alex) (Filed on 8/18/2014) Modified on 8/19/2014 (kcS, COURT STAFF).
August 15, 2014 Filing 301 Errata to #300 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by Joann Asami, R. Thomas Beach, Natasha Beery, Jane Breyer, Jennifer Lowe Campbell, Oren Cheyette, Sarah Clugg, Orpheus Crutchfield, Lynn De Jonghe, Roz Hamar, Natalie Lenz-Acuna, Tim Moppin, Gina Moreland, Joanne Rubio. (Attachments: #1 Supplement Administrative Motion to file documents under seal, #2 Declaration of Catalona in support, #3 Exhibit Slip Sheet, #4 Exhibit to Declaration of Catalona, #5 Proposed Order)(Catalona, Alex) (Filed on 8/15/2014) Modified on 8/18/2014 (kcS, COURT STAFF).
August 15, 2014 Filing 300 Emergency Administrative Motion to File Documents Regarding Bill of Costs Under Seal filed by Joann Asami, R. Thomas Beach, Natasha Beery, Jane Breyer, Jennifer Lowe Campbell, Oren Cheyette, Sarah Clugg, Orpheus Crutchfield, Lynn De Jonghe, Roz Hamar, Natalie Lenz-Acuna, Tim Moppin, Gina Moreland, Joanne Rubio. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Catalona, #2 Exhibit slip sheet, #3 Exhibit Exhibit A to Declaration of Catalona, #4 Proposed Order, #5 Exhibit Exhibit B (redacted), #6 Exhibit Exhibit B (unredacted), # 7 Exhibit Exhibit C (redacted part 1), # 8 Exhibit Exhibit C (redacted part 2), # 9 Exhibit Exhibit C (unredacted part 1), # 10 Exhibit Exhibit C (unredacted part 2), #11 Exhibit Exhibit D (redacted), #12 Exhibit Exhibit D (unredacted), #13 Exhibit Exhibit D (redacted), #14 Exhibit Exhibit D (unredacted))(Beneville, Susan) (Filed on 8/15/2014) Modified on 8/18/2014 (kcS, COURT STAFF). (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/29/2014: #15 Exhibit C part 1 (replaced document per Order #307 , #16 Exhibit C part 2 (replaced document per Order #307 ) (vlkS, COURT STAFF).
August 14, 2014 Filing 299 TRANSCRIPT ORDER by Lord Abbett California Tax-Free Income Fund, Lord Abbett Municipal Income Fund, Inc., Lord Abbett National Tax-Free Income Fund for Court Reporter Raynee Mercado. (Tiedeken, Jennifer) (Filed on 8/14/2014)
August 8, 2014 Filing 298 USCA Case Number 14-16532 Ninth Circuit Court of Appeals for (294 in 4:12-cv-03694-DMR) Notice of Appeal, filed by Lord Abbett National Tax-Free Income Fund, Lord Abbett Municipal Income Fund, Inc., Lord Abbett California Tax-Free Income Fund. (cjlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/8/2014)
August 8, 2014 Filing 297 USCA Appeal Fees received $ 505.00 receipt number 44611011767 re #294 Notice of Appeal, filed by Lord Abbett National Tax-Free Income Fund, Lord Abbett Municipal Income Fund, Inc., Lord Abbett California Tax-Free Income Fund. (cjlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/8/2014) Modified on 8/8/2014 (cjlS, COURT STAFF).
August 8, 2014 Filing 296 ***DISREGARD, SEE DOCKET ENTRY 297*** Notice of Appeal FEE PAID (Filing fee $505.00, Receipt No. 44611011767). (cjlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/8/2014) Modified on 8/8/2014 (cjlS, COURT STAFF).
August 8, 2014 Filing 295 Statement re #294 Notice of Appeal, (Representation Statement) by Lord Abbett California Tax-Free Income Fund, Lord Abbett Municipal Income Fund, Inc., Lord Abbett National Tax-Free Income Fund. (Cillo, Michael) (Filed on 8/8/2014)
August 8, 2014 Filing 294 NOTICE OF APPEAL to the 9th Circuit Court of Appeals filed by Lord Abbett California Tax-Free Income Fund, Lord Abbett Municipal Income Fund, Inc., Lord Abbett National Tax-Free Income Fund. Appeal of Judgment, #293 , Order on Motion for Summary Judgment, #244 (Appeal fee FEE NOT PAID.) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Service List)(Cillo, Michael) (Filed on 8/8/2014) Modified on 8/11/2014 (vlkS, COURT STAFF).
August 4, 2014 Filing 293 Stipulated Final JUDGMENT As Modified. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 08/04/2014. (dmrlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/4/2014)
August 2, 2014 Filing 292 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re #291 Letter - Errata Re: Proposed Final Judgment filed by Joann Asami. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Corrected Final Judgment)(Catalona, Alex) (Filed on 8/2/2014)
August 1, 2014 Filing 291 Letter from Valeri S. Pappas regarding agreed upon proposed final judgment. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Final Judgment)(Pappas, Valeri) (Filed on 8/1/2014)
July 29, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 290 ORDER Granting Stipulation of Dismissal #289 . Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 07/29/2014. (dmrlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/29/2014)
July 29, 2014 Filing 289 STIPULATION to Dismiss with Prejudice Plaintiff's Claim Against Stone & Youngberg for Negligent Misrepresentation Relating to 2007 Purchase of the Bonds filed by Lord Abbett California Tax-Free Income Fund, Lord Abbett Municipal Income Fund, Inc., Lord Abbett National Tax-Free Income Fund. (Attachments: #1 Cover letter for voluntary dismissal)(Radford, Francine) (Filed on 7/29/2014)
July 25, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 288 ORDER Vacating #287 Order Dismissing Case; stipulated proposed final judgment due by 8/1/14. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 07/25/2014. (dmrlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/25/2014)
July 24, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 287 ORDER DISMISSING CASE. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 07/24/2014. (dmrlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/24/2014)
July 23, 2014 Filing 286 Joint Notice of Settlement Between Plaintiff Lord Abbett and Defendant Stone & Youngberg of Plaintiff's 2007 Negligent Misrepresentation Claim by Lord Abbett California Tax-Free Income Fund, Lord Abbett Municipal Income Fund, Inc., Lord Abbett National Tax-Free Income Fund (Radford, Francine) (Filed on 7/23/2014) Modified on 7/24/2014 (vlkS, COURT STAFF).
July 21, 2014 Filing 285 CLERKS NOTICE: Notice is hereby given that the Settlement Conference is vacated and removed from Chief Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte's July 25, 2014 calendar. Therefore, no appearances are required. The parties must update the Chief Magistrate Judge regarding the status of their settlement no later than July 23, 2014. This is a text only entry, there is no document associated with this notice. (shyS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/21/2014)
July 21, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 284 ORDER re Pretrial Motions. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 07/21/2014. (dmrlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/21/2014)
July 17, 2014 Filing 283 TRANSCRIPT ORDER by Stone & Youngberg LLC for Court Reporter FTR - Oakland. (Jaskowiak, Nathan) (Filed on 7/17/2014)
July 16, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 282 ORDER by Chief Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte. The parties are hereby excused from complying with the provision of the Courts Notice and Settlement Conference Order #245 that requires the parties lodge settlement conference documents by July 18, 2014. However, the parties shall update Chief Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte regarding the status of their settlement conference discussions no later than July 21, 2014. (shyS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/16/2014)
July 16, 2014 Filing 281 TRANSCRIPT ORDER by Joann Asami for Court Reporter FTR - Oakland. (Catalona, Alex) (Filed on 7/16/2014)
July 15, 2014 Filing 280 TRANSCRIPT ORDER by Lord Abbett California Tax-Free Income Fund, Lord Abbett Municipal Income Fund, Inc., Lord Abbett National Tax-Free Income Fund for Court Reporter FTR - Oakland. (Cillo, Michael) (Filed on 7/15/2014)
July 15, 2014 Filing 279 OBJECTIONS to re #277 Defendants' Designated Deposition Testimony by Lord Abbett California Tax-Free Income Fund, Lord Abbett Municipal Income Fund, Inc., Lord Abbett National Tax-Free Income Fund. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 1)(Pappas, Valeri) (Filed on 7/15/2014) Modified on 7/16/2014 (vlk, COURT STAFF).
July 14, 2014 Filing 278 Objections to Defendants' Joint Exhibit List by Lord Abbett California Tax-Free Income Fund, Lord Abbett Municipal Income Fund, Inc., Lord Abbett National Tax-Free Income Fund. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Tiedeken, Jennifer) (Filed on 7/14/2014) Modified on 7/15/2014 (kcS, COURT STAFF).
July 14, 2014 Filing 277 Objections and Counter-Designations to #210 , #211 Defendants' Designated Deposition Testimony by Lord Abbett California Tax-Free Income Fund, Lord Abbett Municipal Income Fund, Inc., Lord Abbett National Tax-Free Income Fund. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7)(Tiedeken, Jennifer) (Filed on 7/14/2014) Modified on 7/15/2014 (kcS, COURT STAFF).
July 14, 2014 Filing 276 Objections to #214 Defendants' Proposed Jury Instructions and Verdict Forms by Lord Abbett California Tax-Free Income Fund, Lord Abbett Municipal Income Fund, Inc., Lord Abbett National Tax-Free Income Fund. (Tiedeken, Jennifer) (Filed on 7/14/2014) Modified on 7/15/2014 (kcS, COURT STAFF).
July 14, 2014 Filing 275 RESPONSE (re #190 MOTION in Limine to Determine the Applicable Law to Plaintiff's Negligent Misrepresentation Claim ) filed byLord Abbett California Tax-Free Income Fund, Lord Abbett Municipal Income Fund, Inc., Lord Abbett National Tax-Free Income Fund. (Tiedeken, Jennifer) (Filed on 7/14/2014)
July 14, 2014 Filing 274 OBJECTIONS to Defendants' Expert Qualifications and Experience by Lord Abbett California Tax-Free Income Fund, Lord Abbett Municipal Income Fund, Inc., Lord Abbett National Tax-Free Income Fund. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Jennifer A. Tiedeken in Support of Plaintiff's Objections to Defendants' Expert Qualifications and Experience, #2 Exhibit 1)(Tiedeken, Jennifer) (Filed on 7/14/2014)
July 14, 2014 Filing 273 RESPONSE (re #191 MOTION in Limine to Exclude Evidence or Argument that Wells Fargo's Use of the Debt Service Reserve Fund was Proper ) filed byLord Abbett California Tax-Free Income Fund, Lord Abbett Municipal Income Fund, Inc., Lord Abbett National Tax-Free Income Fund. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Jennifer A. Tiedeken in Support of Plaintiff's Response to Defendants' Motion in Limine to Exclude Evidence or Argument that Wells Fargo's Use of the Debt Service Reserve Fund Was Proper, #2 Exhibit 1 (Part 1), #3 Exhibit 1 (Part 2), #4 Exhibit 1 (Part 3), #5 Exhibit 2, #6 Exhibit 3, #7 Exhibit 4)(Tiedeken, Jennifer) (Filed on 7/14/2014)
July 14, 2014 Filing 272 OBJECTIONS to Lord Abbett's Discovery Designations by Stone & Youngberg LLC. (Jaskowiak, Nathan) (Filed on 7/14/2014)
July 14, 2014 Filing 271 OBJECTIONS to #233 Proposed Form of Verdict, #228 Proposed Voir Dire, #235 Proposed Jury Instructions, by Stone & Youngberg LLC. (Jaskowiak, Nathan) (Filed on 7/14/2014) Modified on 7/15/2014 (kcS, COURT STAFF).
July 14, 2014 Filing 270 RESPONSE (re #197 MOTION in Limine to Limit Testimony of Lord Abbett's Witness Patrick Donovan ) filed byLord Abbett California Tax-Free Income Fund, Lord Abbett Municipal Income Fund, Inc., Lord Abbett National Tax-Free Income Fund. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Jennifer A. Tiedeken in Support of Plaintiff's Response to Defendants' Motion to Limit the Testimony of Lord abbett's Witness Patrick Donovan, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5)(Tiedeken, Jennifer) (Filed on 7/14/2014)
July 14, 2014 Filing 269 RESPONSE (re #215 MOTION in Limine to Exclude from Evidence Deposition Exhibit 302) by Lord Abbett California Tax-Free Income Fund, Lord Abbett Municipal Income Fund, Inc., Lord Abbett National Tax-Free Income Fund. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Jennifer A. Tiedeken in Support of Plaintiff's Response to Defendants' Motion in Limine to Exclude Deposition Exhibit 302, #2 Exhibit 1 to Declaration of Jennifer A. Tiedeken, #3 Exhibit 2 to Declaratin of Jennifer A. Tiedeken)(Tiedeken, Jennifer) (Filed on 7/14/2014) Modified on 7/15/2014 (kcS, COURT STAFF).
July 14, 2014 Filing 268 OBJECTIONS to Lord Abbett's Exhibits by Stone & Youngberg LLC. (Jaskowiak, Nathan) (Filed on 7/14/2014)
July 14, 2014 Filing 267 OBJECTIONS to Lord Abbett's Witness List by Stone & Youngberg LLC. (Jaskowiak, Nathan) (Filed on 7/14/2014)
July 14, 2014 Filing 266 Objections to Stone & Youngberg's Designated Witnesses by Lord Abbett California Tax-Free Income Fund, Lord Abbett Municipal Income Fund, Inc., Lord Abbett National Tax-Free Income Fund. (Tiedeken, Jennifer) (Filed on 7/14/2014) Modified on 7/15/2014 (kcS, COURT STAFF).
July 14, 2014 Filing 265 RESPONSE (re #226 MOTION to Strike Expert Testimony of Paul Maco ) (In Opposition) filed byStone & Youngberg LLC. (Jaskowiak, Nathan) (Filed on 7/14/2014)
July 14, 2014 Filing 264 RESPONSE (re #195 MOTION in Limine to Exclude Evidence or Argument Relating to Prior Lawsuit Involving Expert Witness Paul Maco ) filed byLord Abbett California Tax-Free Income Fund, Lord Abbett Municipal Income Fund, Inc., Lord Abbett National Tax-Free Income Fund. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Jennifer A. Tiedeken in Support of Plaintiff's Response to Stone & Youngberg's Motion in Limine to Exclude Evidence or Argument relating to Prior Lawsuit Involving Expert Witness Paul Maco, #2 Exhibit 1 to Declaration of Jennifer A. Tiedeken, #3 Exhibit 2 to Declaration of Jennifer A. Tiedeken)(Tiedeken, Jennifer) (Filed on 7/14/2014)
July 14, 2014 Filing 263 RESPONSE (re #225 MOTION in Limine Regarding the Board Defendants' Reliance on Counsel Defense ) (In Opposition) filed byStone & Youngberg LLC. (Jaskowiak, Nathan) (Filed on 7/14/2014)
July 14, 2014 Filing 262 RESPONSE (re #207 MOTION in Limine to Exclude Evidence or Argument that Mitigation of Damages is a Defense to the California and New Jersey Securities Acts, #202 MOTION in Limine to Exclude Evidence or Argument that Plaintiff has a Duty to Investigate Under the Securities Laws of California and New Jersey, #192 MOTION in Limine Regarding Reliance and Causation ) (In Opposition) filed byStone & Youngberg LLC. (Jaskowiak, Nathan) (Filed on 7/14/2014)
July 14, 2014 Filing 261 Objections to Defendants' Use of Discovery Responses re #208 , #213 by Lord Abbett California Tax-Free Income Fund, Lord Abbett Municipal Income Fund, Inc., Lord Abbett National Tax-Free Income Fund. (Tiedeken, Jennifer) (Filed on 7/14/2014) Modified on 7/15/2014 (kcS, COURT STAFF).
July 14, 2014 Filing 260 OBJECTIONS to Defendants' Proposed Voir Dire Questions by Lord Abbett California Tax-Free Income Fund, Lord Abbett Municipal Income Fund, Inc., Lord Abbett National Tax-Free Income Fund. (Pappas, Valeri) (Filed on 7/14/2014)
July 14, 2014 Filing 259 RESSPONSE (re #217 MOTION in Limine to Exclude Hearsay Statements from Deposition Exhibits 67 and 280 by Lord Abbett California Tax-Free Income Fund, Lord Abbett Municipal Income Fund, Inc., Lord Abbett National Tax-Free Income Fund. (Radford, Francine) (Filed on 7/14/2014) Modified on 7/15/2014 (kcS, COURT STAFF).
July 14, 2014 Filing 258 Declaration of Nathan R. Jaskowiak In Support Of Stone & Youngberg's Opposition to Plaintiff's Motions In Limine and Objections to Plaintiff's Exhibits filed byStone & Youngberg LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit L)(Jaskowiak, Nathan) (Filed on 7/14/2014)
July 14, 2014 Filing 257 RESPONSE (re #201 MOTION in Limine to Exclude Video Exhibits ) (In Opposition) filed byStone & Youngberg LLC. (Jaskowiak, Nathan) (Filed on 7/14/2014)
July 14, 2014 Filing 256 RESPONSE (re #221 MOTION in Limine to Exclude Entry in Stone & Youngberg's Internal "SYFI" System Relating to September 12, 2008 Investor Call ) (In Opposition) filed byStone & Youngberg LLC. (Jaskowiak, Nathan) (Filed on 7/14/2014)
July 14, 2014 Filing 255 RESPONSE (re #203 MOTION in Limine to Exclude Evidence or Argument Related to Plaintiff's Other Lawsuits ) (In Opposition) filed byStone & Youngberg LLC. (Jaskowiak, Nathan) (Filed on 7/14/2014)
July 14, 2014 Filing 254 RESPONSE (re #222 MOTION in Limine to Exclude Newspaper Articles ) (In Opposition) filed byStone & Youngberg LLC. (Jaskowiak, Nathan) (Filed on 7/14/2014)
July 14, 2014 Filing 253 RESPONSE (re #198 MOTION in Limine to Exclude Evidence or Argument that Windrush did not Default on the Bonds ) (In Opposition) filed byStone & Youngberg LLC. (Jaskowiak, Nathan) (Filed on 7/14/2014)
July 14, 2014 Filing 252 RESPONSE (re #230 MOTION in Limine to Exclude Evidence or Argument that Plaintiff's Damages Should be Offset by the Reserve Fund ) (In Opposition) filed byStone & Youngberg LLC. (Jaskowiak, Nathan) (Filed on 7/14/2014)
July 14, 2014 Filing 251 Declaration of Jennifer A. Tiedeken in Support of Response to #199 MOTION in Limine to Exclude the Testimony of Lord Abbett's Expert Witness Cynthia King filed by Lord Abbett California Tax-Free Income Fund, Lord Abbett Municipal Income Fund, Inc., Lord Abbett National Tax-Free Income Fund. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Related document(s) #250 ) (Tiedeken, Jennifer) (Filed on 7/14/2014) Modified on 7/15/2014 (kcS, COURT STAFF).
July 14, 2014 Filing 250 RESPONSE (re #199 MOTION in Limine to Exclude the Testimony of Lord Abbett's Expert Witness Cynthia King ) filed byLord Abbett California Tax-Free Income Fund, Lord Abbett Municipal Income Fund, Inc., Lord Abbett National Tax-Free Income Fund. (Tiedeken, Jennifer) (Filed on 7/14/2014)
July 14, 2014 Filing 249 Declaration of Jennifer A. Tiedeken in Support of Response to #194 MOTION in Limine to Exclude Evidence or Argument Relating to Alleged Concealment of Making Waves filed by Lord Abbett California Tax-Free Income Fund, Lord Abbett Municipal Income Fund, Inc., Lord Abbett National Tax-Free Income Fund. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 11, #2 Exhibit 12, #3 Exhibit 13, #4 Exhibit 14, #5 Exhibit 15, #6 Exhibit 16, #7 Exhibit 17, #8 Exhibit 18, #9 Exhibit 19)(Related document(s) #248 ) (Tiedeken, Jennifer) (Filed on 7/14/2014) Modified on 7/15/2014 (kcS, COURT STAFF).
July 14, 2014 Filing 248 DECLARATION of Jennifer A. Tiedeken in Support of Response to #194 MOTION in Limine to Exclude Evidence or Argument Relating to Alleged Concealment of Making Waves filed by Lord Abbett California Tax-Free Income Fund, Lord Abbett Municipal Income Fund, Inc., Lord Abbett National Tax-Free Income Fund. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10)(Related document(s) #194 ) (Tiedeken, Jennifer) (Filed on 7/14/2014) Modified on 7/15/2014 (kcS, COURT STAFF).
July 14, 2014 Filing 247 RESPONSE (re #194 MOTION in Limine to Exclude Evidence or Argument Relating to Alleged Concealment of Making Waves ) filed byLord Abbett California Tax-Free Income Fund, Lord Abbett Municipal Income Fund, Inc., Lord Abbett National Tax-Free Income Fund. (Tiedeken, Jennifer) (Filed on 7/14/2014)
July 14, 2014 Filing 246 OBJECTIONS to #218 Request for Judicial Notice, by Lord Abbett California Tax-Free Income Fund, Lord Abbett Municipal Income Fund, Inc., Lord Abbett National Tax-Free Income Fund. (Pappas, Valeri) (Filed on 7/14/2014) Modified on 7/15/2014 (kcS, COURT STAFF).
July 11, 2014 Set/Reset Hearing: Settlement Conference set for 7/25/2014 09:30 AM. (vlkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/11/2014)
July 11, 2014 Filing 245 NOTICE of Settlement Conference and Settlement Conference Order by Chief Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte. (shyS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/11/2014)
July 11, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 244 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu granting in part and denying in part #115 Stone & Youngberg's Motion for Summary Judgment; granting #124 Board Member Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment. Lord Abbett and Stone & Youngberg are referred to Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte for a mandatory settlement conference to take place on 7/25/2014 9:30 AM. Further information regarding the settlement conference will be provided by notice from Judge Laporte. (dmrlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/11/2014) Modified on 7/11/2014 (ig, COURT STAFF).
July 11, 2014 Filing 243 Declaration of Jennifer A. Tiedeken in Support of #225 MOTION in Limine Regarding the Board Defendants' Reliance on Counsel Defense, #201 MOTION in Limine to Exclude Video Exhibits, #224 MOTION to Strike Expert Testimony of Joshua Winter, #207 MOTION in Limine to Exclude Evidence or Argument that Mitigation of Damages is a Defense to the California and New Jersey Securities Acts, #202 MOTION in Limine to Exclude Evidence or Argument that Plaintiff has a Duty to Investigate Under the Securities Laws of California and New Jersey, #222 MOTION in Limine to Exclude Newspaper Articles, #226 MOTION to Strike Expert Testimony of Paul Maco, #192 MOTION in Limine Regarding Reliance and Causation, #221 MOTION in Limine to Exclude Entry in Stone & Youngberg's Internal "SYFI" System Relating to September 12, 2008 Investor Call, #203 MOTION in Limine to Exclude Evidence or Argument Related to Plaintiff's Other Lawsuits, #230 MOTION in Limine to Exclude Evidence or Argument that Plaintiff's Damages Should be Offset by the Reserve Fund, #223 MOTION in Limine Regarding Stone & Youngberg's Reliance on Counsel Defense, #198 MOTION in Limine to Exclude Evidence or Argument that Windrush did not Default on the Bonds filed byLord Abbett California Tax-Free Income Fund, Lord Abbett Municipal Income Fund, Inc., Lord Abbett National Tax-Free Income Fund. (Related document(s) #225 , #201 , #224 , #207 , #202 , #222 , #226 , #192 , #221 , #203 , #230 , #223 , #198 ) (Pappas, Valeri) (Filed on 7/11/2014)
July 11, 2014 Filing 242 RESPONSE (re #196 MOTION in Limine to Exclude Evidence or Argument Relating to Stone & Youngberg's Routine Destruction of Documents ) filed byLord Abbett California Tax-Free Income Fund, Lord Abbett Municipal Income Fund, Inc., Lord Abbett National Tax-Free Income Fund. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Jennifer A. Tiedeken in Support of Plaintiff's Response to Defendant's Motion in Limine to Exclude Evidence Relating to Stone & Youngberg's Destruction of Documents Policy, #2 Exhibit 1 to Declaration of Jennifer A. Tiedeken)(Pappas, Valeri) (Filed on 7/11/2014)
July 11, 2014 Filing 241 RESPONSE (re #219 MOTION in Limine To Preclude Witness Mark Loewenstein From Testifying At Trial ) filed byLord Abbett California Tax-Free Income Fund, Lord Abbett Municipal Income Fund, Inc., Lord Abbett National Tax-Free Income Fund. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Francine T. Redford in Support of Plaintiff's Response to Defendants' Motion in Limine to Preclude Expert Testimony of Mark Loewenstein, #2 Exhibit 1 to Declaration of Francine T. Radford)(Pappas, Valeri) (Filed on 7/11/2014)
July 11, 2014 Filing 240 Notice of Withdrawal of Motion of Board Member Defendants Motion in Limine to Exclude Testimony of Tom Puckett and Teresa Hempeck From Evidence (Catalona, Alex) (Filed on 7/11/2014)
July 11, 2014 Filing 239 RESPONSE (re #193 MOTION in Limine to Exclude Evidence or Argument that Interest on Plaintiff's Negligent Misrepresentation Claim Should Accrue From the Date of Purchase of the Bonds ) filed byLord Abbett California Tax-Free Income Fund, Lord Abbett Municipal Income Fund, Inc., Lord Abbett National Tax-Free Income Fund. (Pappas, Valeri) (Filed on 7/11/2014)
July 8, 2014 Filing 238 ERRATA re #230 MOTION in Limine to Exclude Evidence or Argument that Plaintiff's Damages Should be Offset by the Reserve Fund by Lord Abbett California Tax-Free Income Fund, Lord Abbett Municipal Income Fund, Inc., Lord Abbett National Tax-Free Income Fund. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Pappas, Valeri) (Filed on 7/8/2014)
July 8, 2014 Filing 237 ERRATA re #217 MOTION in Limine to Exclude Hearsay Statements from Deposition Exhibits 67 and 280: An email from Jennifer Campbell to Ilana Kaufman and Caroline Mccall Dated April 11, 2010; Request for Rule 403 Hearing by Joann Asami, R. Thomas Beach, Jane Breyer, Jennifer Lowe Campbell, Oren Cheyette, Lynn De Jonghe, Roz Hamar, Tim Moppin, Gina Moreland, Curry Villeneuve, Valerie McCann Woodson. (Beneville, Susan) (Filed on 7/8/2014)
July 7, 2014 Filing 236 Proposed Jury Instructions by Lord Abbett California Tax-Free Income Fund, Lord Abbett Municipal Income Fund, Inc., Lord Abbett National Tax-Free Income Fund With Submitting Party and Sources. (Tiedeken, Jennifer) (Filed on 7/7/2014)
July 7, 2014 Filing 235 Proposed Jury Instructions by Lord Abbett California Tax-Free Income Fund, Lord Abbett Municipal Income Fund, Inc., Lord Abbett National Tax-Free Income Fund (Disputed) without Submitting Party and Authorities. (Tiedeken, Jennifer) (Filed on 7/7/2014) Modified on 7/8/2014 (vlkS, COURT STAFF).
July 7, 2014 Filing 234 Proposed Jury Instructions by Lord Abbett California Tax-Free Income Fund, Lord Abbett Municipal Income Fund, Inc., Lord Abbett National Tax-Free Income Fund Stipulated by the Parties. (Pappas, Valeri) (Filed on 7/7/2014)
July 7, 2014 Filing 233 Proposed Form of Verdict by Lord Abbett California Tax-Free Income Fund, Lord Abbett Municipal Income Fund, Inc., Lord Abbett National Tax-Free Income Fund . (Pappas, Valeri) (Filed on 7/7/2014)
July 7, 2014 Filing 232 Plaintiff's Discovery DesignationsMunicipal Income Fund, Inc., Lord Abbett National Tax-Free Income Fund (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3)(Pappas, Valeri) (Filed on 7/7/2014) Modified on 7/8/2014 (vlkS, COURT STAFF).
July 7, 2014 Filing 231 Pretrial Conference Statement by Lord Abbett California Tax-Free Income Fund, Lord Abbett Municipal Income Fund, Inc., Lord Abbett National Tax-Free Income Fund Jointly Prepared. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6)(Tiedeken, Jennifer) (Filed on 7/7/2014)
July 7, 2014 Filing 230 MOTION in Limine to Exclude Evidence or Argument that Plaintiff's Damages Should be Offset by the Reserve Fund filed by Lord Abbett California Tax-Free Income Fund, Lord Abbett Municipal Income Fund, Inc., Lord Abbett National Tax-Free Income Fund. Responses due by 7/21/2014. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2 Part 1, #4 Exhibit 2 Part 2, #5 Exhibit 3, #6 Exhibit 4, #7 Exhibit 5, #8 Exhibit 6, #9 Exhibit 7, #10 Exhibit 8)(Pappas, Valeri) (Filed on 7/7/2014)
July 7, 2014 Filing 229 TRIAL BRIEF by Lord Abbett California Tax-Free Income Fund, Lord Abbett Municipal Income Fund, Inc., Lord Abbett National Tax-Free Income Fund. (Tiedeken, Jennifer) (Filed on 7/7/2014)
July 7, 2014 Filing 228 Proposed Voir Dire by Lord Abbett California Tax-Free Income Fund, Lord Abbett Municipal Income Fund, Inc., Lord Abbett National Tax-Free Income Fund . (Tiedeken, Jennifer) (Filed on 7/7/2014)
July 7, 2014 Filing 227 NOTICE of Plaintiff's Exhibit Setting Forth Qualifications and Experience for Its Expert Witnesses by Lord Abbett California Tax-Free Income Fund, Lord Abbett Municipal Income Fund, Inc., Lord Abbett National Tax-Free Income Fund (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3)(Tiedeken, Jennifer) (Filed on 7/7/2014) Modified on 7/8/2014 (vlkS, COURT STAFF).
July 7, 2014 Filing 226 MOTION to Strike Expert Testimony of Paul Maco filed by Lord Abbett California Tax-Free Income Fund, Lord Abbett Municipal Income Fund, Inc., Lord Abbett National Tax-Free Income Fund. Responses due by 7/21/2014. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Proposed Order)(Tiedeken, Jennifer) (Filed on 7/7/2014)
July 7, 2014 Filing 225 MOTION in Limine Regarding the Board Defendants' Reliance on Counsel Defense filed by Lord Abbett California Tax-Free Income Fund, Lord Abbett Municipal Income Fund, Inc., Lord Abbett National Tax-Free Income Fund. Responses due by 7/21/2014. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3)(Pappas, Valeri) (Filed on 7/7/2014)
July 7, 2014 Filing 224 MOTION to Strike Expert Testimony of Joshua Winter filed by Lord Abbett California Tax-Free Income Fund, Lord Abbett Municipal Income Fund, Inc., Lord Abbett National Tax-Free Income Fund. Responses due by 7/21/2014. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Proposed Order)(Tiedeken, Jennifer) (Filed on 7/7/2014)
July 7, 2014 Filing 223 MOTION in Limine Regarding Stone & Youngberg's Reliance on Counsel Defense filed by Lord Abbett California Tax-Free Income Fund, Lord Abbett Municipal Income Fund, Inc., Lord Abbett National Tax-Free Income Fund. Responses due by 7/21/2014. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Proposed Order)(Pappas, Valeri) (Filed on 7/7/2014)
July 7, 2014 Filing 222 MOTION in Limine to Exclude Newspaper Articles filed by Lord Abbett California Tax-Free Income Fund, Lord Abbett Municipal Income Fund, Inc., Lord Abbett National Tax-Free Income Fund. Responses due by 7/21/2014. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Tiedeken, Jennifer) (Filed on 7/7/2014)
July 7, 2014 Filing 221 MOTION in Limine to Exclude Entry in Stone & Youngberg's Internal "SYFI" System Relating to September 12, 2008 Investor Call filed by Lord Abbett California Tax-Free Income Fund, Lord Abbett Municipal Income Fund, Inc., Lord Abbett National Tax-Free Income Fund. Responses due by 7/21/2014. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Proposed Order)(Tiedeken, Jennifer) (Filed on 7/7/2014)
July 7, 2014 Filing 220 TRIAL BRIEF OF BOARD MEMBER DEFENDANTS by Joann Asami, R. Thomas Beach, Jane Breyer, Jennifer Lowe Campbell, Oren Cheyette, Lynn De Jonghe, Roz Hamar, Tim Moppin, Gina Moreland, Curry Villeneuve, Valerie McCann Woodson. (Beneville, Susan) (Filed on 7/7/2014)
July 7, 2014 Filing 219 MOTION in Limine To Preclude Witness Mark Loewenstein From Testifying At Trial filed by Joann Asami, R. Thomas Beach, Jane Breyer, Jennifer Lowe Campbell, Oren Cheyette, Lynn De Jonghe, Roz Hamar, Tim Moppin, Gina Moreland, Curry Villeneuve, Valerie McCann Woodson. Motion Hearing set for 8/4/2014 09:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu. Responses due by 7/21/2014. Replies due by 7/28/2014. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Susan P. Beneville, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4)(Beneville, Susan) (Filed on 7/7/2014)
July 7, 2014 Filing 218 Request for Judicial Notice of Articles Regarding 2008 Global Recession and Financial Crisis; Declaration of Susan P. Beneville filed byJoann Asami, R. Thomas Beach, Jane Breyer, Jennifer Lowe Campbell, Oren Cheyette, Lynn De Jonghe, Roz Hamar, Tim Moppin, Gina Moreland, Curry Villeneuve, Valerie McCann Woodson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Beneville, Susan) (Filed on 7/7/2014)
July 7, 2014 Filing 217 MOTION in Limine to Exclude Hearsay Statements from Deposition Exhibits 67 and 280: An email from Jennifer Campbell to Ilana Kaufman and Caroline Mccall Dated April 11, 2010; Request for Rule 403 Hearing filed by Joann Asami, R. Thomas Beach, Jane Breyer, Jennifer Lowe Campbell, Oren Cheyette, Lynn De Jonghe, Roz Hamar, Tim Moppin, Gina Moreland, Curry Villeneuve, Valerie McCann Woodson. Motion Hearing set for 8/4/2014 09:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu. Responses due by 7/21/2014. Replies due by 7/28/2014. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Susan P. Beneville, #2 Exhibit A to Declaration of Susan P. Beneville, #3 Exhibit B to Declaration of Susan P. Beneville, #4 Exhibit C to Declaration of Susan P. Beneville)(Beneville, Susan) (Filed on 7/7/2014)
July 7, 2014 Filing 216 Witness List by Stone & Youngberg LLC . (Jaskowiak, Nathan) (Filed on 7/7/2014)
July 7, 2014 Filing 215 MOTION in Limine to Exclude from Evidence Deposition Exhibit 302: An Email from Bobbi Poulton to Christina Pernisie dated September 28, 2011 filed by Joann Asami, R. Thomas Beach, Jane Breyer, Jennifer Lowe Campbell, Oren Cheyette, Lynn De Jonghe, Roz Hamar, Tim Moppin, Gina Moreland, Curry Villeneuve, Valerie McCann Woodson. Motion Hearing set for 8/4/2014 09:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu. Responses due by 7/21/2014. Replies due by 7/28/2014. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Susan P. Beneville, #2 Exhibit 1 to Declaration of Susan P. Beneville, #3 Exhibit 2 to Declaration of Susan P. Beneville)(Beneville, Susan) (Filed on 7/7/2014)
July 7, 2014 Filing 214 Proposed Jury Instructions, Verdict Form and Voir Dire Questions by Stone & Youngberg LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(Jaskowiak, Nathan) (Filed on 7/7/2014) Modified on 7/8/2014 (vlkS, COURT STAFF).
July 7, 2014 Filing 213 Designation of Written Discovery Responses to be Used at Trial by Stone & Youngberg LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E)(Jaskowiak, Nathan) (Filed on 7/7/2014) Modified on 7/8/2014 (vlkS, COURT STAFF).
July 7, 2014 Filing 212 MOTION in Limine to Exclude Testimony of Tom Puckett and Teresa Hempeck from Evidence filed by Joann Asami, R. Thomas Beach, Jane Breyer, Jennifer Lowe Campbell, Oren Cheyette, Lynn De Jonghe, Roz Hamar, Tim Moppin, Gina Moreland, Curry Villeneuve, Valerie McCann Woodson. Motion Hearing set for 8/4/2014 09:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu. Responses due by 7/21/2014. Replies due by 7/28/2014. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Susan P. Beneville, #2 Exhibit A to Decl. of Susan P. Beneville, #3 Exhibit B to Decl. of Susan P. Beneville, #4 Exhibit C to Decl. of Susan P. Beneville, #5 Exhibit D to Decl. of Susan P. Beneville, #6 Exhibit E to Decl. of Susan P. Beneville, #7 Exhibit F to Decl. of Susan P. Beneville, #8 Exhibit G to Decl. of Susan P. Beneville, #9 Exhibit H to Decl. of Susan P. Beneville)(Beneville, Susan) (Filed on 7/7/2014)
July 7, 2014 Filing 211 NOTICE of defendant Board Members Designation of the Deposition Testimony of Virginia Housum, Daniel Solender, Richard Beames and Joseph Gulli by Joann Asami, R. Thomas Beach, Jane Breyer, Jennifer Lowe Campbell, Oren Cheyette, Lynn De Jonghe, Roz Hamar, Tim Moppin, Gina Moreland, Curry Villeneuve, Valerie McCann Woodson (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit)(Beneville, Susan) (Filed on 7/7/2014) Modified on 7/8/2014 (vlkS, COURT STAFF).
July 7, 2014 Filing 210 Designation of Deposition Testimony to be Used at Trial by Stone & Youngberg LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F)(Jaskowiak, Nathan) (Filed on 7/7/2014) Modified on 7/8/2014 (vlkS, COURT STAFF).
July 7, 2014 Filing 209 Proposed Jury Instructions by Joann Asami, R. Thomas Beach, Jane Breyer, Jennifer Lowe Campbell, Oren Cheyette, Lynn De Jonghe, Roz Hamar, Tim Moppin, Gina Moreland, Curry Villeneuve, Valerie McCann Woodson . (Beneville, Susan) (Filed on 7/7/2014)
July 7, 2014 Filing 208 DESIGNATION OF DISCOVERY RESPONSES FOR USE AT TRIAL by Joann Asami, R. Thomas Beach, Jane Breyer, Jennifer Lowe Campbell, Oren Cheyette, Lynn De Jonghe, Roz Hamar, Tim Moppin, Gina Moreland, Curry Villeneuve, Valerie McCann Woodson . (Beneville, Susan) (Filed on 7/7/2014) Modified on 7/8/2014 (vlkS, COURT STAFF).
July 7, 2014 Filing 207 MOTION in Limine to Exclude Evidence or Argument that Mitigation of Damages is a Defense to the California and New Jersey Securities Acts filed by Lord Abbett California Tax-Free Income Fund, Lord Abbett Municipal Income Fund, Inc., Lord Abbett National Tax-Free Income Fund. Responses due by 7/21/2014. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Tiedeken, Jennifer) (Filed on 7/7/2014)
July 7, 2014 Filing 206 Witness List by Joann Asami, R. Thomas Beach, Jane Breyer, Jennifer Lowe Campbell, Oren Cheyette, Lynn De Jonghe, Roz Hamar, Tim Moppin, Gina Moreland, Curry Villeneuve, Valerie McCann Woodson EXPERT WITNESS QUALIFICATIONS AND EXPERIENCE. (Beneville, Susan) (Filed on 7/7/2014)
July 7, 2014 Filing 205 Proposed Form of Verdict by Joann Asami, R. Thomas Beach, Jane Breyer, Jennifer Lowe Campbell, Oren Cheyette, Lynn De Jonghe, Roz Hamar, Tim Moppin, Gina Moreland, Curry Villeneuve, Valerie McCann Woodson SPECIAL VERDICT FORM. (Beneville, Susan) (Filed on 7/7/2014)
July 7, 2014 Filing 204 Proposed Voir Dire by Joann Asami, R. Thomas Beach, Jane Breyer, Jennifer Lowe Campbell, Oren Cheyette, Lynn De Jonghe, Roz Hamar, Tim Moppin, Gina Moreland, Curry Villeneuve, Valerie McCann Woodson . (Beneville, Susan) (Filed on 7/7/2014)
July 7, 2014 Filing 203 MOTION in Limine to Exclude Evidence or Argument Related to Plaintiff's Other Lawsuits filed by Lord Abbett California Tax-Free Income Fund, Lord Abbett Municipal Income Fund, Inc., Lord Abbett National Tax-Free Income Fund. Responses due by 7/21/2014. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Tiedeken, Jennifer) (Filed on 7/7/2014)
July 7, 2014 Filing 202 MOTION in Limine to Exclude Evidence or Argument that Plaintiff has a Duty to Investigate Under the Securities Laws of California and New Jersey filed by Lord Abbett California Tax-Free Income Fund, Lord Abbett Municipal Income Fund, Inc., Lord Abbett National Tax-Free Income Fund. Responses due by 7/21/2014. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Tiedeken, Jennifer) (Filed on 7/7/2014)
July 7, 2014 Filing 201 MOTION in Limine to Exclude Video Exhibits filed by Lord Abbett California Tax-Free Income Fund, Lord Abbett Municipal Income Fund, Inc., Lord Abbett National Tax-Free Income Fund. Responses due by 7/21/2014. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Proposed Order)(Tiedeken, Jennifer) (Filed on 7/7/2014)
July 7, 2014 Filing 200 Declaration of Nathan Jaskowiak In Support of Motions in Limine and Motion to Exclude Expert Witness Testimony filed byStone & Youngberg LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit L, #13 Exhibit M, #14 Exhibit N, #15 Exhibit O, #16 Exhibit P, #17 Exhibit Q, #18 Exhibit R, #19 Exhibit S, #20 Exhibit T, #21 Exhibit U, #22 Exhibit V, #23 Exhibit W, #24 Exhibit X, #25 Exhibit Y)(Jaskowiak, Nathan) (Filed on 7/7/2014)
July 7, 2014 Filing 199 MOTION in Limine to Exclude the Testimony of Lord Abbett's Expert Witness Cynthia King filed by Stone & Youngberg LLC. Responses due by 7/14/2014. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Jaskowiak, Nathan) (Filed on 7/7/2014)
July 7, 2014 Filing 198 MOTION in Limine to Exclude Evidence or Argument that Windrush did not Default on the Bonds filed by Lord Abbett California Tax-Free Income Fund, Lord Abbett Municipal Income Fund, Inc., Lord Abbett National Tax-Free Income Fund. Responses due by 7/21/2014. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Proposed Order)(Tiedeken, Jennifer) (Filed on 7/7/2014)
July 7, 2014 Filing 197 MOTION in Limine to Limit Testimony of Lord Abbett's Witness Patrick Donovan filed by Stone & Youngberg LLC. Responses due by 7/14/2014. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Jaskowiak, Nathan) (Filed on 7/7/2014)
July 7, 2014 Filing 196 MOTION in Limine to Exclude Evidence or Argument Relating to Stone & Youngberg's Routine Destruction of Documents filed by Stone & Youngberg LLC. Responses due by 7/14/2014. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Jaskowiak, Nathan) (Filed on 7/7/2014)
July 7, 2014 Filing 195 MOTION in Limine to Exclude Evidence or Argument Relating to Prior Lawsuit Involving Expert Witness Paul Maco filed by Stone & Youngberg LLC. Responses due by 7/14/2014. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Jaskowiak, Nathan) (Filed on 7/7/2014)
July 7, 2014 Filing 194 MOTION in Limine to Exclude Evidence or Argument Relating to Alleged Concealment of Making Waves filed by Stone & Youngberg LLC. Responses due by 7/14/2014. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Jaskowiak, Nathan) (Filed on 7/7/2014)
July 7, 2014 Filing 193 MOTION in Limine to Exclude Evidence or Argument that Interest on Plaintiff's Negligent Misrepresentation Claim Should Accrue From the Date of Purchase of the Bonds filed by Stone & Youngberg LLC. Responses due by 7/14/2014. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Jaskowiak, Nathan) (Filed on 7/7/2014)
July 7, 2014 Filing 192 MOTION in Limine Regarding Reliance and Causation filed by Lord Abbett California Tax-Free Income Fund, Lord Abbett Municipal Income Fund, Inc., Lord Abbett National Tax-Free Income Fund. Responses due by 7/21/2014. Replies due by 7/28/2014. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Tiedeken, Jennifer) (Filed on 7/7/2014)
July 7, 2014 Filing 191 MOTION in Limine to Exclude Evidence or Argument that Wells Fargo's Use of the Debt Service Reserve Fund was Proper filed by Stone & Youngberg LLC. Responses due by 7/14/2014. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Jaskowiak, Nathan) (Filed on 7/7/2014)
July 7, 2014 Filing 190 MOTION in Limine to Determine the Applicable Law to Plaintiff's Negligent Misrepresentation Claim filed by Stone & Youngberg LLC. Responses due by 7/14/2014. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Jaskowiak, Nathan) (Filed on 7/7/2014)
July 7, 2014 Filing 189 EXHIBITS TO #188 TRIAL BRIEF by Stone & Youngberg LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit L, #13 Exhibit M, #14 Exhibit N)(Jaskowiak, Nathan) (Filed on 7/7/2014) Modified on 7/8/2014 (vlkS, COURT STAFF).
July 7, 2014 Filing 188 TRIAL BRIEF by Stone & Youngberg LLC. (Jaskowiak, Nathan) (Filed on 7/7/2014)
June 26, 2014 Filing 187 Minute Entry: Motion Hearing held on 6/26/2014 before Judge Donna M. Ryu (Date Filed: 6/26/2014). (Recording #FTR: 11:03:44 - 12:03:48.) (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 6/26/2014)
June 12, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 186 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu granting #181 Motion for Pro Hac Vice. CORRECTION OF DOCKET NO. 185. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 06/10/2014. (dmrlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/12/2014)
June 11, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 185 ***FILED IN ERROR. PLEASE SEE DOCKET NO. #186 *** ORDER by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu granting #181 Motion for Pro Hac Vice. (Filed on 6/11/2014) Modified on 6/12/2014 (dmrlc1, COURT STAFF).
June 10, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 184 ***FILED IN ERROR. PLEASE SEE DOCKET NO. #185 .*** Order by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu granting #181 Motion for Pro Hac Vice.(dmrlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/10/2014) Modified on 6/11/2014 (dmrlc1, COURT STAFF).
June 9, 2014 Filing 183 REPLY (re #115 MOTION for Summary Judgment or in the Alternative, Partial Summary Judgment ) ; Evidentiary Objections filed byStone & Youngberg LLC. (Jaskowiak, Nathan) (Filed on 6/9/2014)
June 9, 2014 Filing 182 REPLY (re #124 MOTION for Summary Judgment ) filed byJoann Asami, R. Thomas Beach, Jane Breyer, Jennifer Lowe Campbell, Oren Cheyette, Orpheus Crutchfield, Lynn De Jonghe, Roz Hamar, Tim Moppin, Gina Moreland, Curry Villeneuve, Valerie McCann Woodson. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Reply Declaration of Alex P. Catalona, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 48 to Reply Decl. of Alex P. Catalona, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 49 to Reply Decl. of Alex P. Catalona, #4 Exhibit Exhibit 50 to Reply Decl. of Alex P. Catalona)(Catalona, Alex) (Filed on 6/9/2014)
June 6, 2014 Filing 181 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice for Scott W. Wilkinson ( Filing fee $ 305, receipt number 0971-8675790.) filed by Lord Abbett California Tax-Free Income Fund, Lord Abbett Municipal Income Fund, Inc., Lord Abbett National Tax-Free Income Fund. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing for Scott Warren Wilkinson)(Radford, Francine) (Filed on 6/6/2014)
June 5, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 180 ORDER by Judge Donna M. Ryu Denying #179 Stipulation for ENLARGEMENT OF PAGE LIMITATIONSFOR REPLY BRIEFS IN SUPPORT OF MOTIONS FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/5/2014) Modified on 6/6/2014 (vlkS, COURT STAFF).
June 4, 2014 Filing 179 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER regarding Enlargement of Page Limitations for Reply Briefs in Support of Motions for Summary Judgment filed by Stone & Youngberg LLC. (Jaskowiak, Nathan) (Filed on 6/4/2014)
June 4, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 178 ORDER by Judge Donna M. Ryu granting #177 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Gary Ceriani representing Plaintiff. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/4/2014)
June 3, 2014 Filing 177 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice Gary J. Ceriani ( Filing fee $ 305, receipt number 0971-8663463.) filed by Lord Abbett California Tax-Free Income Fund, Lord Abbett Municipal Income Fund, Inc., Lord Abbett National Tax-Free Income Fund. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Radford, Francine) (Filed on 6/3/2014)
June 2, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 176 ORDER by Judge Donna M. Ryu granting #175 Stipulation to Substitute Document #120-37 with Exhibit A (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/2/2014)
May 28, 2014 Filing 175 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER to Substitute Document #120-37 with Exhibit A filed by Lord Abbett California Tax-Free Income Fund, Lord Abbett Municipal Income Fund, Inc., Lord Abbett National Tax-Free Income Fund. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Proposed Order)(Tiedeken, Jennifer) (Filed on 5/28/2014)
May 27, 2014 Filing 174 EXHIBITS re #158 Declaration in Support,, filed byLord Abbett California Tax-Free Income Fund, Lord Abbett Municipal Income Fund, Inc., Lord Abbett National Tax-Free Income Fund. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 146, #2 Exhibit 147, #3 Exhibit 148, #4 Exhibit 149, #5 Exhibit 150, #6 Exhibit 151, #7 Exhibit 152, #8 Exhibit 153, #9 Exhibit 154, #10 Exhibit 155)(Related document(s) #158 ) (Tiedeken, Jennifer) (Filed on 5/27/2014)
May 27, 2014 Filing 173 EXHIBITS re #158 Declaration in Support,, filed byLord Abbett California Tax-Free Income Fund, Lord Abbett Municipal Income Fund, Inc., Lord Abbett National Tax-Free Income Fund. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 142, Part 2, #2 Exhibit 142, Part 3, #3 Exhibit 142, Part 4, #4 Exhibit 142, Part 5, #5 Exhibit 142, Part 6, #6 Exhibit 142, Part 7, #7 Exhibit 142, Part 8, #8 Exhibit 143, #9 Exhibit 144, #10 Exhibit 145)(Related document(s) #158 ) (Tiedeken, Jennifer) (Filed on 5/27/2014)
May 27, 2014 Filing 172 EXHIBITS re #158 Declaration in Support,, filed byLord Abbett California Tax-Free Income Fund, Lord Abbett Municipal Income Fund, Inc., Lord Abbett National Tax-Free Income Fund. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 133, #2 Exhibit 134, #3 Exhibit 135, #4 Exhibit 136, #5 Exhibit 137, #6 Exhibit 138, #7 Exhibit 139, #8 Exhibit 140, #9 Exhibit 141, #10 Exhibit 142, Part 1)(Related document(s) #158 ) (Tiedeken, Jennifer) (Filed on 5/27/2014)
May 27, 2014 Filing 171 EXHIBITS re #158 Declaration in Support,, filed byLord Abbett California Tax-Free Income Fund, Lord Abbett Municipal Income Fund, Inc., Lord Abbett National Tax-Free Income Fund. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 123, #2 Exhibit 124, #3 Exhibit 125, #4 Exhibit 126, #5 Exhibit 127, #6 Exhibit 128, #7 Exhibit 129, #8 Exhibit 130, #9 Exhibit 131, #10 Exhibit 132)(Related document(s) #158 ) (Tiedeken, Jennifer) (Filed on 5/27/2014)
May 27, 2014 Filing 170 EXHIBITS re #158 Declaration in Support,, filed byLord Abbett California Tax-Free Income Fund, Lord Abbett Municipal Income Fund, Inc., Lord Abbett National Tax-Free Income Fund. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 113, #2 Exhibit 114, #3 Exhibit 115, #4 Exhibit 116, #5 Exhibit 117, #6 Exhibit 118, #7 Exhibit 119, #8 Exhibit 120, #9 Exhibit 121, #10 Exhibit 122)(Related document(s) #158 ) (Tiedeken, Jennifer) (Filed on 5/27/2014)
May 27, 2014 Filing 169 EXHIBITS re #158 Declaration in Support,, filed byLord Abbett California Tax-Free Income Fund, Lord Abbett Municipal Income Fund, Inc., Lord Abbett National Tax-Free Income Fund. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 103, #2 Exhibit 104, #3 Exhibit 105, #4 Exhibit 106, #5 Exhibit 107, #6 Exhibit 108, #7 Exhibit 109, #8 Exhibit 110, #9 Exhibit 111, #10 Exhibit 112)(Related document(s) #158 ) (Tiedeken, Jennifer) (Filed on 5/27/2014)
May 27, 2014 Filing 168 EXHIBITS re #158 Declaration in Support,, filed byLord Abbett California Tax-Free Income Fund, Lord Abbett Municipal Income Fund, Inc., Lord Abbett National Tax-Free Income Fund. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 93, #2 Exhibit 94, #3 Exhibit 95, #4 Exhibit 96, #5 Exhibit 97, #6 Exhibit 98, #7 Exhibit 99, #8 Exhibit 100, #9 Exhibit 101, #10 Exhibit 102)(Related document(s) #158 ) (Tiedeken, Jennifer) (Filed on 5/27/2014)
May 27, 2014 Filing 167 EXHIBITS re #158 Declaration in Support,, filed byLord Abbett California Tax-Free Income Fund, Lord Abbett Municipal Income Fund, Inc., Lord Abbett National Tax-Free Income Fund. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 85, #2 Exhibit 86, #3 Exhibit 87, #4 Exhibit 88, #5 Exhibit 89, #6 Exhibit 90, #7 Exhibit 91, Part 1, #8 Exhibit 91, Part 2, #9 Exhibit 91, Part 3, #10 Exhibit 92)(Related document(s) #158 ) (Tiedeken, Jennifer) (Filed on 5/27/2014)
May 27, 2014 Filing 166 EXHIBITS re #158 Declaration in Support,, filed byLord Abbett California Tax-Free Income Fund, Lord Abbett Municipal Income Fund, Inc., Lord Abbett National Tax-Free Income Fund. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 75, #2 Exhibit 76, #3 Exhibit 77, #4 Exhibit 78, #5 Exhibit 79, #6 Exhibit 80, #7 Exhibit 81, #8 Exhibit 82, #9 Exhibit 83, #10 Exhibit 84)(Related document(s) #158 ) (Tiedeken, Jennifer) (Filed on 5/27/2014)
May 27, 2014 Filing 165 EXHIBITS re #158 Declaration in Support,, filed byLord Abbett California Tax-Free Income Fund, Lord Abbett Municipal Income Fund, Inc., Lord Abbett National Tax-Free Income Fund. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 65, #2 Exhibit 66, #3 Exhibit 67, #4 Exhibit 68, #5 Exhibit 69, #6 Exhibit 70, #7 Exhibit 71, #8 Exhibit 72, #9 Exhibit 73, #10 Exhibit 74)(Related document(s) #158 ) (Tiedeken, Jennifer) (Filed on 5/27/2014)
May 27, 2014 Filing 164 EXHIBITS re #158 Declaration in Support,, filed byLord Abbett California Tax-Free Income Fund, Lord Abbett Municipal Income Fund, Inc., Lord Abbett National Tax-Free Income Fund. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 55, #2 Exhibit 56, #3 Exhibit 57, #4 Exhibit 58, #5 Exhibit 59, #6 Exhibit 60, #7 Exhibit 61, #8 Exhibit 62, #9 Exhibit 63, #10 Exhibit 64)(Related document(s) #158 ) (Tiedeken, Jennifer) (Filed on 5/27/2014)
May 27, 2014 Filing 163 EXHIBITS re #158 Declaration in Support,, filed byLord Abbett California Tax-Free Income Fund, Lord Abbett Municipal Income Fund, Inc., Lord Abbett National Tax-Free Income Fund. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 45, #2 Exhibit 46, #3 Exhibit 47, #4 Exhibit 48, #5 Exhibit 49, #6 Exhibit 50, #7 Exhibit 51, #8 Exhibit 52, #9 Exhibit 53, #10 Exhibit 54)(Related document(s) #158 ) (Tiedeken, Jennifer) (Filed on 5/27/2014)
May 27, 2014 Filing 162 EXHIBITS re #158 Declaration in Support,, filed byLord Abbett California Tax-Free Income Fund, Lord Abbett Municipal Income Fund, Inc., Lord Abbett National Tax-Free Income Fund. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 35, #2 Exhibit 36, #3 Exhibit 37, #4 Exhibit 38, #5 Exhibit 39, #6 Exhibit 40, #7 Exhibit 41, #8 Exhibit 42, #9 Exhibit 43, #10 Exhibit 44)(Related document(s) #158 ) (Tiedeken, Jennifer) (Filed on 5/27/2014)
May 27, 2014 Filing 161 EXHIBITS re #158 Declaration in Support,, filed byLord Abbett California Tax-Free Income Fund, Lord Abbett Municipal Income Fund, Inc., Lord Abbett National Tax-Free Income Fund. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 30, #2 Exhibit 31, #3 Exhibit 32, #4 Exhibit 33, #5 Exhibit 34, Part 1, #6 Exhibit 34, Part 2, #7 Exhibit 34, Part 3, #8 Exhibit 34, Part 4, #9 Exhibit 34, Part 5, #10 Exhibit 34, Part 6)(Related document(s) #158 ) (Tiedeken, Jennifer) (Filed on 5/27/2014)
May 27, 2014 Filing 160 EXHIBITS re #158 Declaration in Support,, filed byLord Abbett California Tax-Free Income Fund, Lord Abbett Municipal Income Fund, Inc., Lord Abbett National Tax-Free Income Fund. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 20, #2 Exhibit 21, #3 Exhibit 22, #4 Exhibit 23, #5 Exhibit 24, #6 Exhibit 25, #7 Exhibit 26, #8 Exhibit 27, #9 Exhibit 28, #10 Exhibit 29)(Related document(s) #158 ) (Tiedeken, Jennifer) (Filed on 5/27/2014)
May 27, 2014 Filing 159 EXHIBITS re #158 Declaration in Support,, filed byLord Abbett California Tax-Free Income Fund, Lord Abbett Municipal Income Fund, Inc., Lord Abbett National Tax-Free Income Fund. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 10, #2 Exhibit 11, #3 Exhibit 12, #4 Exhibit 13, #5 Exhibit 14, #6 Exhibit 15, #7 Exhibit 16, #8 Exhibit 17, #9 Exhibit 18, #10 Exhibit 19)(Related document(s) #158 ) (Tiedeken, Jennifer) (Filed on 5/27/2014)
May 27, 2014 Filing 158 Declaration of Jennifer A. Tiedeken in Support of #153 Opposition/Response to Motion, filed byLord Abbett California Tax-Free Income Fund, Lord Abbett Municipal Income Fund, Inc., Lord Abbett National Tax-Free Income Fund. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, Part 1, #4 Exhibit 3, Part 2, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7, #9 Exhibit 8, #10 Exhibit 9)(Related document(s) #153 ) (Tiedeken, Jennifer) (Filed on 5/27/2014)
May 27, 2014 Filing 157 Declaration of Patrick Donovan in Support of #153 Opposition/Response to Motion, filed byLord Abbett California Tax-Free Income Fund, Lord Abbett Municipal Income Fund, Inc., Lord Abbett National Tax-Free Income Fund. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit A)(Related document(s) #153 ) (Tiedeken, Jennifer) (Filed on 5/27/2014)
May 27, 2014 Filing 156 Declaration of Cynthia King in Support of #153 Opposition/Response to Motion, filed byLord Abbett California Tax-Free Income Fund, Lord Abbett Municipal Income Fund, Inc., Lord Abbett National Tax-Free Income Fund. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, Part 1, #2 Exhibit 1, Part 2, #3 Exhibit 1, Part 3)(Related document(s) #153 ) (Tiedeken, Jennifer) (Filed on 5/27/2014)
May 27, 2014 Filing 155 Declaration of Mark J. Loewenstein in Support of #153 Opposition/Response to Motion, filed byLord Abbett California Tax-Free Income Fund, Lord Abbett Municipal Income Fund, Inc., Lord Abbett National Tax-Free Income Fund. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Related document(s) #153 ) (Tiedeken, Jennifer) (Filed on 5/27/2014)
May 27, 2014 Filing 154 Declaration of Joseph Gulli in Support of #153 Opposition/Response to Motion, filed byLord Abbett California Tax-Free Income Fund, Lord Abbett Municipal Income Fund, Inc., Lord Abbett National Tax-Free Income Fund. (Related document(s) #153 ) (Tiedeken, Jennifer) (Filed on 5/27/2014)
May 27, 2014 Filing 153 RESPONSE (re #115 MOTION for Summary Judgment or in the Alternative, Partial Summary Judgment, #124 MOTION for Summary Judgment ) filed byLord Abbett California Tax-Free Income Fund, Lord Abbett Municipal Income Fund, Inc., Lord Abbett National Tax-Free Income Fund. (Tiedeken, Jennifer) (Filed on 5/27/2014)
May 16, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 152 Order by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu granting AS MODIFIED #151 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re #115 MOTION for Summary Judgment or in the Alternative, Partial Summary Judgment, #124 MOTION for Summary Judgment.(dmrlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/16/2014)
May 15, 2014 Filing 151 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Response and Replies to Motions for Summary Judgment filed by Lord Abbett California Tax-Free Income Fund, Lord Abbett Municipal Income Fund, Inc., Lord Abbett National Tax-Free Income Fund. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Declaration of Jennifer A. Tiedeken, #2 Proposed Order)(Tiedeken, Jennifer) (Filed on 5/15/2014)
May 12, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 150 ORDER re Briefing and Hearing Schedule for Summary Judgment Motions and Amended Case Management and Pretrial Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 05/12/2014. (dmrlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/12/2014)
May 12, 2014 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #115 MOTION for Summary Judgment or in the Alternative, Partial Summary Judgment, #124 MOTION for Summary Judgment . Motion Hearing set for 6/26/2014 11:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu. (dmrlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/12/2014)
May 12, 2014 Set/Reset Hearing Pretrial Conference set for 7/28/2014 02:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu. (dmrlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/12/2014)
May 9, 2014 Filing 149 RESPONSE (re #146 MOTION to File an Omnibus Opposition to Defendants Stone & Youngberg LLC's and Board Member Defendants' Motions for Summary Judgment ) filed byJoann Asami, R. Thomas Beach, Natasha Beery, Jane Breyer, Jennifer Lowe Campbell, Oren Cheyette, Sarah Clugg, Orpheus Crutchfield, Lynn De Jonghe, Roz Hamar, Natalie Lenz-Acuna, Tim Moppin, Gina Moreland, Joanne Rubio, Stone & Youngberg LLC, Curry Villeneuve, Andrew Weill, Valerie McCann Woodson. (Jaskowiak, Nathan) (Filed on 5/9/2014)
May 9, 2014 Filing 148 NOTICE by Stone & Youngberg LLC of Supplemental Designation of Rule 26 Expert Witnesses (Jaskowiak, Nathan) (Filed on 5/9/2014)
May 9, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 147 ORDER re #145 , #146 Parties' Submissions re Briefing for Summary Judgment Motions. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 05/09/2014. (dmrlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/9/2014)
May 8, 2014 Filing 146 MOTION to File an Omnibus Opposition to Defendants Stone & Youngberg LLC's and Board Member Defendants' Motions for Summary Judgment filed by Lord Abbett California Tax-Free Income Fund, Lord Abbett Municipal Income Fund, Inc., Lord Abbett National Tax-Free Income Fund. Responses due by 5/12/2014. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Declaration of Jennifer A. Tiedeken, #2 Proposed Order)(Tiedeken, Jennifer) (Filed on 5/8/2014)
May 8, 2014 Filing 145 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Regarding Enlargement of Time for Response and Replies to Motions for Summary Judgment filed by Lord Abbett California Tax-Free Income Fund, Lord Abbett Municipal Income Fund, Inc., Lord Abbett National Tax-Free Income Fund. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Declaration of Jennifer A. Tiedeken, #2 Proposed Order)(Tiedeken, Jennifer) (Filed on 5/8/2014)
May 2, 2014 Filing 144 NOTICE by Joann Asami, R. Thomas Beach, Jane Breyer, Jennifer Lowe Campbell, Oren Cheyette, Lynn De Jonghe, Roz Hamar, Tim Moppin, Gina Moreland, Curry Villeneuve, Valerie McCann Woodson Board Members' Amended Expert Designation (Beneville, Susan) (Filed on 5/2/2014)
May 2, 2014 Filing 143 NOTICE by Stone & Youngberg LLC of Expert Witness Disclosures (Jaskowiak, Nathan) (Filed on 5/2/2014)
May 2, 2014 Filing 142 NOTICE by Joann Asami, R. Thomas Beach, Jane Breyer, Jennifer Lowe Campbell, Oren Cheyette, Lynn De Jonghe, Roz Hamar, Tim Moppin, Gina Moreland, Curry Villeneuve, Valerie McCann Woodson disclosure of expert witnesses (Beneville, Susan) (Filed on 5/2/2014)
May 2, 2014 Filing 141 NOTICE by Lord Abbett California Tax-Free Income Fund, Lord Abbett Municipal Income Fund, Inc., Lord Abbett National Tax-Free Income Fund of Expert Witness Disclosures (Tiedeken, Jennifer) (Filed on 5/2/2014)
May 1, 2014 Filing 140 EXHIBITS re #124 MOTION for Summary Judgment Exhibits 33-37 and Exhibits 46-47 filed byJoann Asami, R. Thomas Beach, Jane Breyer, Jennifer Lowe Campbell, Oren Cheyette, Lynn De Jonghe, Roz Hamar, Tim Moppin, Gina Moreland, Curry Villeneuve, Valerie McCann Woodson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 33 (part 2 of 6), #2 Exhibit Exhibit 33 (part 3 of 6), #3 Exhibit Exhibit 33 (part 4 of 6), #4 Exhibit Exhibit 33 (part 5 of 6), #5 Exhibit Exhibit 33 (part 6 of 6), #6 Exhibit Exhibit 34, #7 Exhibit Exhibit 35, #8 Exhibit Exhibit 36, #9 Exhibit Exhibit 37, #10 Exhibit Exhibit 46, #11 Exhibit Exhibit 47)(Related document(s) #124 ) (Beneville, Susan) (Filed on 5/1/2014)
May 1, 2014 Filing 139 Declaration of Alex P. Catalona in Support of #124 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed byJoann Asami, R. Thomas Beach, Jane Breyer, Jennifer Lowe Campbell, Oren Cheyette, Lynn De Jonghe, Roz Hamar, Tim Moppin, Gina Moreland, Curry Villeneuve, Valerie McCann Woodson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit Exhibit 6 (part 1 of 2), #7 Exhibit Exhibit 6 (part 2 of 2), #8 Exhibit Exhibit 7, #9 Exhibit Exhibit 8, #10 Exhibit Exhibit 9, #11 Exhibit Exhibit 10, #12 Exhibit Exhibit 11, #13 Exhibit Exhibit 12, #14 Exhibit Exhibit 13, #15 Exhibit Exhibit 14, #16 Exhibit Exhibit 15, #17 Exhibit Exhibit 16, #18 Exhibit Exhibit 17, #19 Exhibit Exhibit 18, #20 Exhibit Exhibit 19, #21 Exhibit Exhibit 20, #22 Exhibit Exhibit 21, #23 Exhibit Exhibit 22, #24 Exhibit Exhibit 23, #25 Exhibit Exhibit 24, #26 Exhibit Exhibit 25, #27 Exhibit Exhibit 26, #28 Exhibit Exhibit 27, #29 Exhibit Exhibit 28, #30 Exhibit Exhibit 29, #31 Exhibit Exhibit 30, #32 Exhibit Exhibit 31, #33 Exhibit Exhibit 32)(Related document(s) #124 ) (Beneville, Susan) (Filed on 5/1/2014)
May 1, 2014 Filing 138 Declaration of Bonnie Whitler in Support of #124 MOTION for Summary Judgment By the Board Members filed byJoann Asami, R. Thomas Beach, Jane Breyer, Jennifer Lowe Campbell, Oren Cheyette, Lynn De Jonghe, Roz Hamar, Tim Moppin, Gina Moreland, Curry Villeneuve, Valerie McCann Woodson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 39, #2 Exhibit 40, #3 Exhibit 41, #4 Exhibit 42, #5 Exhibit 43, #6 Exhibit 44, #7 Exhibit 45)(Related document(s) #124 ) (Beneville, Susan) (Filed on 5/1/2014)
May 1, 2014 Filing 137 Declaration of R. Thomas Beach in Support of #124 MOTION for Summary Judgment by the Board Members filed byJoann Asami, R. Thomas Beach, Jane Breyer, Jennifer Lowe Campbell, Oren Cheyette, Lynn De Jonghe, Roz Hamar, Tim Moppin, Gina Moreland, Curry Villeneuve, Valerie McCann Woodson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 38)(Related document(s) #124 ) (Beneville, Susan) (Filed on 5/1/2014)
May 1, 2014 Filing 136 Statement re #124 MOTION for Summary Judgment Joint Statement of Undisputed Facts by Joann Asami, R. Thomas Beach, Jane Breyer, Jennifer Lowe Campbell, Oren Cheyette, Lynn De Jonghe, Roz Hamar, Tim Moppin, Gina Moreland, Curry Villeneuve, Valerie McCann Woodson. (Beneville, Susan) (Filed on 5/1/2014)
May 1, 2014 Filing 135 Declaration of Jennifer Curry Villeneuve in Support of #124 MOTION for Summary Judgment by the Board Members filed byJoann Asami, R. Thomas Beach, Jane Breyer, Jennifer Lowe Campbell, Oren Cheyette, Lynn De Jonghe, Roz Hamar, Tim Moppin, Gina Moreland, Curry Villeneuve, Valerie McCann Woodson. (Related document(s) #124 ) (Beneville, Susan) (Filed on 5/1/2014)
May 1, 2014 Filing 134 Declaration of Gina Moreland in Support of #124 MOTION for Summary Judgment by the Board Members filed byJoann Asami, R. Thomas Beach, Jane Breyer, Jennifer Lowe Campbell, Oren Cheyette, Lynn De Jonghe, Roz Hamar, Tim Moppin, Gina Moreland, Curry Villeneuve, Valerie McCann Woodson. (Related document(s) #124 ) (Beneville, Susan) (Filed on 5/1/2014)
May 1, 2014 Filing 133 Declaration of Tim Moppin in Support of #124 MOTION for Summary Judgment by the Board Members filed byJoann Asami, R. Thomas Beach, Jane Breyer, Jennifer Lowe Campbell, Oren Cheyette, Lynn De Jonghe, Roz Hamar, Tim Moppin, Gina Moreland, Curry Villeneuve, Valerie McCann Woodson. (Related document(s) #124 ) (Beneville, Susan) (Filed on 5/1/2014)
May 1, 2014 Filing 132 Declaration of Valerie McCann Woodson in Support of #124 MOTION for Summary Judgment by the Board Members filed byJoann Asami, R. Thomas Beach, Jane Breyer, Jennifer Lowe Campbell, Oren Cheyette, Lynn De Jonghe, Roz Hamar, Tim Moppin, Gina Moreland, Curry Villeneuve, Valerie McCann Woodson. (Related document(s) #124 ) (Beneville, Susan) (Filed on 5/1/2014)
May 1, 2014 Filing 131 Declaration of Rosalind Hamar in Support of #124 MOTION for Summary Judgment by the Board Members filed byJoann Asami, R. Thomas Beach, Jane Breyer, Jennifer Lowe Campbell, Oren Cheyette, Lynn De Jonghe, Roz Hamar, Tim Moppin, Gina Moreland, Curry Villeneuve, Valerie McCann Woodson. (Related document(s) #124 ) (Beneville, Susan) (Filed on 5/1/2014)
May 1, 2014 Filing 130 Declaration of Lynn DeJonghe in Support of #124 MOTION for Summary Judgment by the Board Members filed byJoann Asami, R. Thomas Beach, Jane Breyer, Jennifer Lowe Campbell, Oren Cheyette, Lynn De Jonghe, Roz Hamar, Tim Moppin, Gina Moreland, Curry Villeneuve, Valerie McCann Woodson. (Related document(s) #124 ) (Beneville, Susan) (Filed on 5/1/2014)
May 1, 2014 Filing 129 Declaration of Oren Cheyette in Support of #124 MOTION for Summary Judgment by the Board Members filed byJoann Asami, R. Thomas Beach, Jane Breyer, Jennifer Lowe Campbell, Oren Cheyette, Lynn De Jonghe, Roz Hamar, Tim Moppin, Gina Moreland, Curry Villeneuve, Valerie McCann Woodson. (Related document(s) #124 ) (Beneville, Susan) (Filed on 5/1/2014)
May 1, 2014 Filing 128 Declaration of Jennifer Lowe Campbell in Support of #124 MOTION for Summary Judgment by the Board Members filed byJoann Asami, R. Thomas Beach, Jane Breyer, Jennifer Lowe Campbell, Oren Cheyette, Lynn De Jonghe, Roz Hamar, Tim Moppin, Gina Moreland, Curry Villeneuve, Valerie McCann Woodson. (Related document(s) #124 ) (Beneville, Susan) (Filed on 5/1/2014)
May 1, 2014 Filing 127 Declaration of Jane Breyer in Support of #124 MOTION for Summary Judgment by the Board Members filed byJoann Asami, R. Thomas Beach, Jane Breyer, Jennifer Lowe Campbell, Oren Cheyette, Lynn De Jonghe, Roz Hamar, Tim Moppin, Gina Moreland, Curry Villeneuve, Valerie McCann Woodson. (Related document(s) #124 ) (Beneville, Susan) (Filed on 5/1/2014)
May 1, 2014 Filing 126 Declaration of Joann Asami in support of the Board Members' Motion for Summary Judgment filed byJoann Asami, R. Thomas Beach, Jane Breyer, Jennifer Lowe Campbell, Oren Cheyette, Lynn De Jonghe, Roz Hamar, Tim Moppin, Gina Moreland, Curry Villeneuve, Valerie McCann Woodson. (Beneville, Susan) (Filed on 5/1/2014)
May 1, 2014 Filing 125 Proposed Order re #124 MOTION for Summary Judgment by Joann Asami, R. Thomas Beach, Jane Breyer, Jennifer Lowe Campbell, Oren Cheyette, Lynn De Jonghe, Roz Hamar, Tim Moppin, Gina Moreland, Curry Villeneuve, Valerie McCann Woodson. (Beneville, Susan) (Filed on 5/1/2014)
May 1, 2014 Filing 124 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Joann Asami, R. Thomas Beach, Jane Breyer, Jennifer Lowe Campbell, Oren Cheyette, Lynn De Jonghe, Roz Hamar, Tim Moppin, Gina Moreland, Curry Villeneuve, Valerie McCann Woodson. Motion Hearing set for 6/5/2014 11:00 AM in Courtroom 4, 3rd Floor, Oakland before Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu. Responses due by 5/15/2014. Replies due by 5/22/2014. (Beneville, Susan) (Filed on 5/1/2014)
May 1, 2014 Filing 123 STIPULATION for Dismissal of Defendants Natasha Beery, Sarah Cluff, Orpheus Crutchfield, Natalie Lenz-Acuna and Andrew Weill Pursuant to F.R.C.P. 41(a)(1)(A)(ii) filed by Lord Abbett California Tax-Free Income Fund, Lord Abbett Municipal Income Fund, Inc., Lord Abbett National Tax-Free Income Fund. (Tiedeken, Jennifer) (Filed on 5/1/2014)
April 28, 2014 Filing 122 Declaration of Dirk ten Grotenhuis in Support of #115 MOTION for Summary Judgment or in the Alternative, Partial Summary Judgment filed byStone & Youngberg LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Related document(s) #115 ) (Jaskowiak, Nathan) (Filed on 4/28/2014)
April 28, 2014 Filing 121 Declaration of Lauren Post in Support of #115 MOTION for Summary Judgment or in the Alternative, Partial Summary Judgment filed byStone & Youngberg LLC. (Related document(s) #115 ) (Jaskowiak, Nathan) (Filed on 4/28/2014)
April 28, 2014 Filing 120 Declaration of Nathan R. Jaskowiak in Support of #115 MOTION for Summary Judgment or in the Alternative, Partial Summary Judgment filed byStone & Youngberg LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit L, #13 Exhibit M, #14 Exhibit N, #15 Exhibit O, #16 Exhibit P, #17 Exhibit Q, #18 Exhibit R, #19 Exhibit S, #20 Exhibit T, #21 Exhibit U, #22 Exhibit V, #23 Exhibit W, #24 Exhibit X, #25 Exhibit Y, #26 Exhibit Z, #27 Exhibit AA, #28 Exhibit BB, #29 Exhibit CC, #30 Exhibit DD, #31 Exhibit EE, #32 Exhibit FF, #33 Exhibit GG, #34 Exhibit HH, #35 Exhibit II - 1, #36 Exhibit II - 2, # 37 Exhibit II - 3, #38 Exhibit JJ, #39 Exhibit KK, #40 Exhibit LL, #41 Exhibit MM, #42 Exhibit NN, #43 Exhibit OO, #44 Exhibit PP, #45 Exhibit QQ, #46 Exhibit RR, #47 Exhibit SS)(Related document(s) #115 ) (Jaskowiak, Nathan) (Filed on 4/28/2014)
April 28, 2014 Filing 119 Declaration of Kenneth Holman in Support of #115 MOTION for Summary Judgment or in the Alternative, Partial Summary Judgment filed byStone & Youngberg LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Related document(s) #115 ) (Jaskowiak, Nathan) (Filed on 4/28/2014)
April 28, 2014 Filing 118 Declaration of Richard Beames in Support of #115 MOTION for Summary Judgment or in the Alternative, Partial Summary Judgment filed byStone & Youngberg LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Related document(s) #115 ) (Jaskowiak, Nathan) (Filed on 4/28/2014)
April 28, 2014 Filing 117 Declaration of Marie Autphenne in Support of #115 MOTION for Summary Judgment or in the Alternative, Partial Summary Judgment filed byStone & Youngberg LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J - 1, #11 Exhibit J - 2)(Related document(s) #115 ) (Jaskowiak, Nathan) (Filed on 4/28/2014)
April 28, 2014 Filing 116 Statement re #115 MOTION for Summary Judgment or in the Alternative, Partial Summary Judgment Joint Statement of Undisputed Facts by Stone & Youngberg LLC. (Jaskowiak, Nathan) (Filed on 4/28/2014)
April 28, 2014 Filing 115 MOTION for Summary Judgment or in the Alternative, Partial Summary Judgment filed by Stone & Youngberg LLC. Motion Hearing set for 6/5/2014 11:00 AM in Courtroom 4, 3rd Floor, Oakland before Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu. Responses due by 5/12/2014. Replies due by 5/19/2014. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Jaskowiak, Nathan) (Filed on 4/28/2014)
April 25, 2014 Filing 114 STIPULATION for Dismissal of Defendant Joanne Rubio filed by Lord Abbett California Tax-Free Income Fund, Lord Abbett Municipal Income Fund, Inc., Lord Abbett National Tax-Free Income Fund. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Notice of Chapter 7 Bankruptcy)(Pappas, Valeri) (Filed on 4/25/2014)
April 15, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 113 AMENDED CASE MANAGEMENT AND PRETRIAL ORDER: (See Order for all dates set by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu). Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 4/15/14. (ig, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/15/2014)
April 15, 2014 Set/Reset Trial Management Order Deadlines: Expert shall be disclosed and reports due by 5/2/2014; Rebuttal experts shall be disclosed and reports by 5/9/2014; All discovery from experts shall be completed by 6/18/2014; Last day for hearing dispositive motions by 6/5/2014. (ig, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/15/2014)
April 11, 2014 Filing 112 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER filed by Lord Abbett California Tax-Free Income Fund, Lord Abbett Municipal Income Fund, Inc., Lord Abbett National Tax-Free Income Fund. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Amended Case Management and Pretrial Order for Jury Trial)(Pappas, Valeri) (Filed on 4/11/2014)
April 8, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 111 ORDER Denying #110 Request to Continue Trial and Pretrial Dates. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 04/08/2014. (dmrlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/8/2014)
April 7, 2014 Filing 110 Letter from Joint Letter from All Counsel Regarding Modification to the Case Management Order . (Tiedeken, Jennifer) (Filed on 4/7/2014)
March 10, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 109 Order by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu granting AS MODIFIED #108 Stipulation re Deadlines. Last day for hearing dispositive motions is 6/5/14.(dmrlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/10/2014)
March 10, 2014 Filing 108 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Extending Expert Witness Deadlines and for Dispositive Motions Hearing Date filed by Lord Abbett California Tax-Free Income Fund, Lord Abbett Municipal Income Fund, Inc., Lord Abbett National Tax-Free Income Fund. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Amended Case Management and Pretrial Order for Jury Trial)(Pappas, Valeri) (Filed on 3/10/2014)
February 26, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 107 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu granting #106 Stipulation Re: Deposition of Cecil Bobey. (ig, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/26/2014)
February 26, 2014 Filing 106 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER RE DEPOSITION OF CECIL BOBEY filed by Joann Asami, R. Thomas Beach, Natasha Beery, Jane Breyer, Jennifer Lowe Campbell, Oren Cheyette, Sarah Clugg, Orpheus Crutchfield, Lynn De Jonghe, Roz Hamar, Natalie Lenz-Acuna, Tim Moppin, Gina Moreland, Joanne Rubio, Curry Villeneuve, Andrew Weill, Valerie McCann Woodson. (Beneville, Susan) (Filed on 2/26/2014)
February 18, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 105 Order by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on #104 Discovery Letter Brief.(dmrlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/18/2014)
February 7, 2014 Filing 104 Letter from Plaintiff Lord Abbett and Defendant Stone & Youngberg, LLC Regarding Additional Deposition of a Representative of Stone & Youngberg, LLC. (Pappas, Valeri) (Filed on 2/7/2014) Modified on 2/18/2014 (dmrlc1, COURT STAFF).
January 22, 2014 Filing 103 Minute Entry: Further Case Management Conference HELD on 1/22/2014 before Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu. (FTR Recording: 1:35-1:40) (ig, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 1/22/2014)
January 15, 2014 Filing 102 JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by Joann Asami, R. Thomas Beach, Natasha Beery, Jane Breyer, Jennifer Lowe Campbell, Oren Cheyette, Sarah Clugg, Orpheus Crutchfield, Lynn De Jonghe, Roz Hamar, Natalie Lenz-Acuna, Tim Moppin, Gina Moreland, Joanne Rubio, Curry Villeneuve, Andrew Weill, Valerie McCann Woodson, Lord Abbett California Tax-Free Income Fund, Lord Abbett Municipal Income Fund, Inc., Lord Abbett National Tax-Free Income Fund. (Tiedeken, Jennifer) (Filed on 1/15/2014) Modified on 1/16/2014 (vlkS, COURT STAFF).
December 4, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 101 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu granting #100 Stipulation to continue the Further Case Management Conference. (ig, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/4/2013)
December 4, 2013 Set/Reset Deadlines and Hearing re #101 Order on Stipulation: Updated Joint Case Management Statement due by 1/15/2014. Further Case Management Conference continued to 1/22/2014 01:30 PM. (ig, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/4/2013)
December 4, 2013 Filing 100 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Re Case Management Conference filed by Lord Abbett California Tax-Free Income Fund, Lord Abbett Municipal Income Fund, Inc., Lord Abbett National Tax-Free Income Fund. (Radford, Francine) (Filed on 12/4/2013)
November 27, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 99 Order by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu granting #93 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal.(dmrlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/27/2013)
November 27, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 98 Order by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu granting #92 Stipulation AS MODIFIED.(dmrlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/27/2013)
November 25, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 97 Order by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu denying #91 Discovery Letter Brief.(dmrlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/25/2013)
November 21, 2013 Filing 96 Minute Entry: Motion Hearing HELD on 11/21/2013 before Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu re #91 Joint Discovery Letter Brief filed by Lord Abbett National Tax-Free Income Fund, Joann Asami, Lord Abbett Municipal Income Fund, Inc., Tim Moppin, Andrew Weill, Orpheus Crutchfield, Valerie McCann Woodson, Natalie Lenz-Acuna, Joanne Rubio, R. Thomas Beach, Sarah Clugg, Oren Cheyette, Lord Abbett California Tax-Free Income Fund, Jennifer Lowe Campbell, Roz Hamar, Natasha Beery, Lynn De Jonghe, Jane Breyer, Curry Villeneuve, Gina Moreland - Motion DENIED. Court's written Order to follow. (FTR Recording: 11:26-11:54) (ig, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 11/21/2013)
November 15, 2013 Filing 95 CLERKS NOTICE: Notice is hereby given to all parties that the Further Case Management Conference previously set on 12/11/2013 01:30 PM has been rescheduled to 12/11/2013 03:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu. (This is a text only docket entry, there is no document associated with this notice.) (ig, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/15/2013)
October 30, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 94 ORDER Setting Hearing on #91 Joint Discovery Letter Brief: Motion Hearing set for 11/21/2013 11:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 10/30/2013. (dmrlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/30/2013)
October 25, 2013 Filing 93 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by Joann Asami, R. Thomas Beach, Natasha Beery, Jane Breyer, Jennifer Lowe Campbell, Oren Cheyette, Sarah Clugg, Orpheus Crutchfield, Lynn De Jonghe, Roz Hamar, Natalie Lenz-Acuna, Tim Moppin, Gina Moreland, Joanne Rubio, Curry Villeneuve, Andrew Weill, Valerie McCann Woodson. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration of Stephanie L. Smith in support of Motion to File Documents Under Seal, #2 Exhibit Exhibit A to Declaration of Stephanie L. Smith, #3 Exhibit Exhibit B to Declaration of Stephanie L. Smith, #4 Exhibit Exhibit C to Declaration of Stephanie L. Smith, #5 Proposed Order Proposed Order, #6 Redacted Version of Exhibit A, #7 Unredacted Version of Exhibit A, #8 Redacted Version of Exhibit O, #9 Unredacted Version of Exhibit O, #10 Redacted Version of Exhibit T, #11 Unredacted Version of Exhibit T, #12 Redacted Version of Exhibit U, #13 Unredacted Version of Exhibit U)(Beneville, Susan) (Filed on 10/25/2013)
October 25, 2013 Filing 92 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER filed by Joann Asami, R. Thomas Beach, Natasha Beery, Jane Breyer, Jennifer Lowe Campbell, Oren Cheyette, Sarah Clugg, Orpheus Crutchfield, Lynn De Jonghe, Roz Hamar, Natalie Lenz-Acuna, Lord Abbett California Tax-Free Income Fund, Lord Abbett Municipal Income Fund, Inc., Lord Abbett National Tax-Free Income Fund, Tim Moppin, Gina Moreland, Joanne Rubio, Curry Villeneuve, Andrew Weill, Valerie McCann Woodson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit B to Stip. and (Proposed) Order, #2 Exhibit Exhibit C to Stip. and (Proposed) Order, #3 Exhibit Exhibit D to Stip. and (Proposed) Order, #4 Exhibit Exhibit E to Stip. and (Proposed) Order, #5 Exhibit Exhibit F to Stip. and (Proposed) Order, #6 Exhibit Exhibit G to Stip. and (Proposed) Order, #7 Exhibit Exhibit H to Stip. and (Proposed) Order, #8 Exhibit Exhibit I to Stip. and (Proposed) Order, #9 Exhibit Exhibit J to Stip. and (Proposed) Order, #10 Exhibit Exhibit K to Stip. and (Proposed) Order, #11 Exhibit Exhibit L to Stip. and (Proposed) Order, #12 Exhibit Exhibit M to Stip. and (Proposed) Order, #13 Exhibit Exhibit N to Stip. and (Proposed) Order, #14 Exhibit Exhibit P to Stip. and (Proposed) Order, #15 Exhibit Exhibit Q to Stip. and (Proposed) Order, #16 Exhibit Exhibit R to Stip. and (Proposed) Order, #17 Exhibit Exhibit S to Stip. and (Proposed) Order, #18 Exhibit Exhibit T to Stip. and (Proposed) Order, #19 Exhibit Exhibit V to Stip. and (Proposed) Order, #20 Exhibit Exhibit W to Stip. and (Proposed) Order, #21 Exhibit Exhibit X to Stip. and (Proposed) Order, #22 Exhibit Exhibit Y to Stip. and (Proposed) Order, #23 Exhibit Exhibit Z to Stip. and (Proposed) Order)(Beneville, Susan) (Filed on 10/25/2013)
October 25, 2013 Filing 91 Joint Discovery Letter Brief filed by Joann Asami, R. Thomas Beach, Natasha Beery, Jane Breyer, Jennifer Lowe Campbell, Oren Cheyette, Sarah Clugg, Orpheus Crutchfield, Lynn De Jonghe, Roz Hamar, Natalie Lenz-Acuna, Lord Abbett California Tax-Free Income Fund, Lord Abbett Municipal Income Fund, Inc., Lord Abbett National Tax-Free Income Fund, Tim Moppin, Gina Moreland, Joanne Rubio, Curry Villeneuve, Andrew Weill, Valerie McCann Woodson. (Beneville, Susan) (Filed on 10/25/2013)
October 25, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 90 Order by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu granting #87 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages.(dmrlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/25/2013)
October 24, 2013 Filing 89 Joint Discovery Letter Brief filed by Joann Asami, R. Thomas Beach, Natasha Beery, Jane Breyer, Jennifer Lowe Campbell, Oren Cheyette, Sarah Clugg, Orpheus Crutchfield, Lynn De Jonghe, Roz Hamar, Natalie Lenz-Acuna, Lord Abbett California Tax-Free Income Fund, Lord Abbett Municipal Income Fund, Inc., Lord Abbett National Tax-Free Income Fund, Tim Moppin, Gina Moreland, Joanne Rubio, Curry Villeneuve, Andrew Weill, Valerie McCann Woodson. (Beneville, Susan) (Filed on 10/24/2013)
October 24, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 88 ORDER to Submit Joint Letter re Parties' Discovery Dispute. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 10/24/2013. (dmrlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/24/2013)
October 24, 2013 Filing 87 Joint MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages Administrative Relief: Expansion of Page Limitation for Joint Discovery Letter; [Proposed] Order filed by Lord Abbett California Tax-Free Income Fund, Lord Abbett Municipal Income Fund, Inc., Lord Abbett National Tax-Free Income Fund. (Radford, Francine) (Filed on 10/24/2013)
October 16, 2013 Filing 86 AMENDED ANSWER to Complaint byStone & Youngberg LLC. (Jaskowiak, Nathan) (Filed on 10/16/2013)
October 16, 2013 Filing 85 STIPULATION to Amend Answer filed by Stone & Youngberg LLC. (Jaskowiak, Nathan) (Filed on 10/16/2013)
October 11, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 84 Order by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on #79 Discovery Letter Brief.(dmrlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/11/2013)
October 7, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 83 ORDER Vacating 10/10/13 Hearing re #79 Discovery Letter Brief. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 10/07/2013. (dmrlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/7/2013)
October 7, 2013 Filing 82 Exhibits to #79 Discovery Letter Brief filed by Joann Asami, R. Thomas Beach, Natasha Beery, Jane Breyer, Jennifer Lowe Campbell, Oren Cheyette, Sarah Clugg, Orpheus Crutchfield, Lynn De Jonghe, Roz Hamar, Natalie Lenz-Acuna, Tim Moppin, Gina Moreland, Joanne Rubio, Curry Villeneuve, Andrew Weill, Valerie McCann Woodson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Amended Exhibit A to discovery letter brief, #2 Exhibit Amended Exhibit B to discovery letter brief)(Beneville, Susan) (Filed on 10/7/2013) Modified on 10/8/2013 (cjlS, COURT STAFF).
September 26, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 81 ORDER: Hearing re #79 Discovery Letter Brief set for 10/10/2013 11:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 9/26/13. (ig, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/26/2013)
September 25, 2013 Filing 80 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re #79 Discovery Letter Brief filed by Joann Asami, R. Thomas Beach, Natasha Beery, Jane Breyer, Jennifer Lowe Campbell, Oren Cheyette, Sarah Clugg, Orpheus Crutchfield, Lynn De Jonghe, Roz Hamar, Natalie Lenz-Acuna, Lord Abbett California Tax-Free Income Fund, Lord Abbett Municipal Income Fund, Inc., Lord Abbett National Tax-Free Income Fund, Tim Moppin, Gina Moreland, Joanne Rubio, Stone & Youngberg LLC, Curry Villeneuve, Andrew Weill, Valerie McCann Woodson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Errata Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit Exhibit E, #5 Exhibit Exhibit F, #6 Exhibit Exhibit G, #7 Exhibit Exhibit H, #8 Exhibit Exhibit I, #9 Exhibit Exhibit D Part One, #10 Exhibit Exhibit D Part Two)(Beneville, Susan) (Filed on 9/25/2013)
September 25, 2013 Filing 79 Discovery Letter Brief filed by Joann Asami, R. Thomas Beach, Natasha Beery, Jane Breyer, Jennifer Lowe Campbell, Oren Cheyette, Sarah Clugg, Orpheus Crutchfield, Lynn De Jonghe, Roz Hamar, Natalie Lenz-Acuna, Lord Abbett California Tax-Free Income Fund, Lord Abbett Municipal Income Fund, Inc., Lord Abbett National Tax-Free Income Fund, Tim Moppin, Gina Moreland, Joanne Rubio, Stone & Youngberg LLC, Curry Villeneuve, Andrew Weill, Valerie McCann Woodson. (Beneville, Susan) (Filed on 9/25/2013)
August 12, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 78 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu granting #77 Stipulation Extending Deadling for Private Mediation and Setting Further Case Management Conference. (ig, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/12/2013)
August 12, 2013 Set/Reset Deadlines and Hearing re #78 Order on Stipulation: Updated Joint Case Management Statement due by 12/4/2013. Further Case Management Conference set for 12/11/2013 01:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu. (ig, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/12/2013)
August 9, 2013 Filing 77 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re #76 Terminate Deadlines and Hearings, Case Management Conference - Further,, EXTENDING DEADLINE FOR PRIVATE MEDIATION AND SETTING FURTHER CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE filed by Lord Abbett California Tax-Free Income Fund, Lord Abbett Municipal Income Fund, Inc., Lord Abbett National Tax-Free Income Fund. (Attachments: #1 Cover letter for stipulation and proposed order re ADR deadline/CMC)(Radford, Francine) (Filed on 8/9/2013)
July 31, 2013 Filing 76 Minute Entry: Further Case Management Conference HELD on 7/31/2013 before Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu. Parties shall promptly submit a Stipulation and Order to the Court to extend the deadline for completion of private mediation. Stipulation shall include proposed date for further case management conference. See minutes for more particulars. (FTR Recording 1:34-2:18) (ig, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 7/31/2013)
July 24, 2013 Filing 75 JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by Lord Abbett California Tax-Free Income Fund, Lord Abbett Municipal Income Fund, Inc., Lord Abbett National Tax-Free Income Fund, Stone & Youngberg LLC. (Tiedeken, Jennifer) (Filed on 7/24/2013) Modified on 7/25/2013 (kcS, COURT STAFF).
July 12, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 74 Order by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu granting #72 Stipulation (Protective Order).(dmrlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/12/2013)
July 12, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 73 Order by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu granting #71 Stipulation.(dmrlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/12/2013)
July 11, 2013 Filing 72 PROPOSED STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER filed by Joann Asami, R. Thomas Beach, Natasha Beery, Jane Breyer, Jennifer Lowe Campbell, Oren Cheyette, Sarah Clugg, Orpheus Crutchfield, Lynn De Jonghe, Roz Hamar, Natalie Lenz-Acuna, Tim Moppin, Gina Moreland, Joanne Rubio, Curry Villeneuve, Andrew Weill, Valerie McCann Woodson. (Beneville, Susan) (Filed on 7/11/2013) Modified on 7/12/2013 (vlk, COURT STAFF).
July 10, 2013 Filing 71 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Regarding Information Produced Information Produced by Non-Party Windrush School Pursuant to Subpoena filed by Lord Abbett California Tax-Free Income Fund, Lord Abbett Municipal Income Fund, Inc., Lord Abbett National Tax-Free Income Fund. (Attachments: #1 Cover letter for stipulated protective order for Windrush production)(Radford, Francine) (Filed on 7/10/2013) Modified on 7/11/2013 (vlk, COURT STAFF).
June 27, 2013 Filing 70 TRANSCRIPT ORDER by Stone & Youngberg LLC for Court Reporter Raynee Mercado. (Jaskowiak, Nathan) (Filed on 6/27/2013)
June 27, 2013 Filing 69 FILED IN ERROR. SEE DOCUMENT #70 FOR CORRECT ATTACHMENT.TRANSCRIPT ORDER by Stone & Youngberg LLC for Court Reporter Raynee Mercado. (Jaskowiak, Nathan) (Filed on 6/27/2013) Modified on 6/27/2013 (vlk, COURT STAFF).
June 25, 2013 Filing 68 Transcript of Proceedings held on May 30, 2013, before Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu. Transcriber Raynee H. Mercado, Telephone number 510-451-7530, rayneeh@hotmail.com, raynee_mercado@cand.uscourts.gov. Tape Number: FTR Recording 11:46-12:31. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 9/23/2013. (Related documents(s) #63 , #64 ) (rhm) (Filed on 6/25/2013)
June 24, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 67 ORDER by Judge Donna M. Ryu granting #66 Stipulation to continue Further Case Management Conference. (ig, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/24/2013)
June 24, 2013 Filing 66 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re #50 Case Management Conference filed by Lord Abbett California Tax-Free Income Fund, Lord Abbett Municipal Income Fund, Inc., Lord Abbett National Tax-Free Income Fund. (Radford, Francine) (Filed on 6/24/2013) Modified on 6/25/2013 (vlk, COURT STAFF).
June 24, 2013 Filing 65 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re #50 Case Management Conference filed by Lord Abbett California Tax-Free Income Fund, Lord Abbett Municipal Income Fund, Inc., Lord Abbett National Tax-Free Income Fund. (Radford, Francine) (Filed on 6/24/2013) Modified on 6/25/2013 (vlk, COURT STAFF).
June 24, 2013 Set/Reset Hearing Further Case Management Conference set for 7/31/2013 01:30 PM. (ig, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/24/2013)
June 24, 2013 Set Deadlines/Hearings: Updated Joint Case Management Statement due by 7/24/2013. Further Case Management Conference set for 7/31/2013 01:30 PM. (ig, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/24/2013) Modified on 6/24/2013 (ig, COURT STAFF).
May 31, 2013 Filing 64 TRANSCRIPT ORDER by Joann Asami, R. Thomas Beach, Natasha Beery, Jane Breyer, Jennifer Lowe Campbell, Oren Cheyette, Sarah Clugg, Orpheus Crutchfield, Lynn De Jonghe, Roz Hamar, Natalie Lenz-Acuna, Tim Moppin, Gina Moreland, Joanne Rubio, Stone & Youngberg LLC, Curry Villeneuve, Andrew Weill, Valerie McCann Woodson for Court Reporter FTR - Oakland. (Becherer, Patrick) (Filed on 5/31/2013)
May 31, 2013 Filing 63 TRANSCRIPT ORDER by Lord Abbett California Tax-Free Income Fund, Lord Abbett Municipal Income Fund, Inc., Lord Abbett National Tax-Free Income Fund for Court Reporter FTR - Oakland. (Radford, Francine) (Filed on 5/31/2013)
May 30, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 62 Order by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu re #56 Discovery Letter Brief.(dmrlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/30/2013)
May 30, 2013 Filing 61 Minute Entry: Motion Hearing HELD on 5/30/2013 before Donna M. Ryu re #56 Joint Discovery Letter Brief filed by Lord Abbett National Tax-Free Income Fund, Lord Abbett Municipal Income Fund, Inc., Lord Abbett California Tax-Free Income Fund. Court's written Order to follow. (FTR Recording 11:46-12:31) (ig, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 5/30/2013)
May 24, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 60 STIPULATION AND ORDER: Deadline for completing mediation shall be extended to 8/30/2013 re #59 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER for Extension of Deadline to Complete ADR filed by Lord Abbett National Tax-Free Income Fund, Lord Abbett Municipal Income Fund, Inc., Lord Abbett California Tax-Free Income Fund. Signed by Judge Donna M. Ryu on 5/24/13. (ig, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/24/2013) Modified on 5/29/2013 (kcS, COURT STAFF).
May 24, 2013 Filing 59 Plaintiff's Motion for Administrative Relief; Extension of Deadline to Complete ADR Pursuant to Stipulation filed by Lord Abbett California Tax-Free Income Fund, Lord Abbett Municipal Income Fund, Inc., Lord Abbett National Tax-Free Income Fund. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Stipulation and Order)(Radford, Francine) (Filed on 5/24/2013) Modified on 5/28/2013 (cjl, COURT STAFF).
May 1, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 58 ORDER Setting Hearing on Motion #56 Joint Discovery Letter Brief : Motion Hearing set for 5/30/2013 11:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 5/1/13. (ig, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/1/2013)
May 1, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 57 PLEASE DISREGARD DOCKET ENTRY NO. 57 AND GO TO DOCKET ENTRY NO. 58 INSTEAD DUE TO A TYPO. ERROR AS TO YEAR OF THE HEARING DATE ORDER Setting Hearing on Motion #56 Joint Discovery Letter Brief : Motion Hearing set for 5/30/2013 11:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 5/1/13. (ig, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/1/2013) Modified on 5/1/2013 (ig, COURT STAFF).
April 19, 2013 Filing 56 Joint Discovery Letter Brief filed by Lord Abbett California Tax-Free Income Fund, Lord Abbett Municipal Income Fund, Inc., Lord Abbett National Tax-Free Income Fund. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Becherer signature page, #4 Cillo signature page, #5 Cordova signature page, #6 Suter signature page)(Radford, Francine) (Filed on 4/19/2013)
April 17, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 55 ORDER Denying Without Prejudice #53 Discovery Letter Brief filed by Lord Abbett National Tax-Free Income Fund, Lord Abbett Municipal Income Fund, Inc., Lord Abbett California Tax-Free Income Fund, #52 Discovery Letter Brief filed by Stone & Youngberg LLC, Joann Asami, Tim Moppin, Andrew Weill, Orpheus Crutchfield, Valerie McCann Woodson, Natalie Lenz-Acuna, Joanne Rubio, R. Thomas Beach, Sarah Clugg, Oren Cheyette, Jennifer Lowe Campbell, Roz Hamar, Natasha Beery, Lynn De Jonghe, Jane Breyer, Curry Villeneuve, Gina Moreland. Joint Letter due 4/19/13.Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 04/17/2013. (dmrlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/17/2013)
April 17, 2013 Filing 54 EXHIBITS re #53 Discovery Letter Brief Exhibit A filed byLord Abbett California Tax-Free Income Fund, Lord Abbett Municipal Income Fund, Inc., Lord Abbett National Tax-Free Income Fund. (Related document(s) #53 ) (Radford, Francine) (Filed on 4/17/2013)
April 17, 2013 Filing 53 Discovery Letter Brief filed by Lord Abbett California Tax-Free Income Fund, Lord Abbett Municipal Income Fund, Inc., Lord Abbett National Tax-Free Income Fund. (Radford, Francine) (Filed on 4/17/2013)
April 17, 2013 Filing 52 Discovery Letter Brief filed by Joann Asami, R. Thomas Beach, Natasha Beery, Jane Breyer, Jennifer Lowe Campbell, Oren Cheyette, Sarah Clugg, Orpheus Crutchfield, Lynn De Jonghe, Roz Hamar, Natalie Lenz-Acuna, Tim Moppin, Gina Moreland, Joanne Rubio, Stone & Youngberg LLC, Curry Villeneuve, Andrew Weill, Valerie McCann Woodson. (Becherer, Patrick) (Filed on 4/17/2013)
February 21, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 51 AMENDED CASE MANAGEMENT AND PRETRIAL ORDER: Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 2/21/13. (ig, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/21/2013)
February 20, 2013 Filing 50 Minute Entry: Further Case Management Conference HELD on 2/20/2013 before Donna M. Ryu, Case referred to Private Mediation, which shall be completed within 120 days from the date of this Order. Plaintiffs' unopposed motion to consolidate cases C-12-3694-DMR and C-12-6185-DMR for all purposes including discovery and trial GRANTED. Updated Joint Case Management Statement due by 6/19/2013. Further Case Management Conference set for 6/26/2013 01:30 PM. Non-expert Discovery and Expert Disclosure due by 3/25/2014. Rebuttal Expert Disclosure due by 4/8/2014. Expert Discovery to be completed by: 4/22/2014. Last day to hear dispositive motions on 5/22/2014 11:00 AM. Joint Pretrial Conference Statement/Trial Briefs due by 7/7/2014. Pretrial Conference set for 7/23/2014 03:00 PM and Jury Trial (estimated for 2 weeks) set for 8/4/2014 09:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu. (FTR Recording: 1:32-1:44) (ig, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 2/20/2013)
February 12, 2013 Filing 49 JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by Lord Abbett California Tax-Free Income Fund, Lord Abbett Municipal Income Fund, Inc., Lord Abbett National Tax-Free Income Fund, Natasha Berry, Jane Breyer, Jennifer Lowe Campbell, Oren Cheyette, Sarah Clugg, Orpheus Crutchfield, Lynn De Jonghe, Roz Hamar, Natalie Lenz-Acuna, Tim Moppin, Gina Moreland, Joanne Rubio, Curry Villeneuve, Andrew Weill, Valerie McCann Woodson. (Radford, Francine) (Filed on 2/12/2013) Modified on 2/13/2013 (vlk, COURT STAFF).
February 7, 2013 ADR Remark: ADR Phone Conference held 2/7/2013 with Howard Herman, ADR Program Director. (cmf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/7/2013)
February 4, 2013 Filing 48 AFFIDAVIT of Merit Corrected of Gordon Yale by Lord Abbett California Tax-Free Income Fund, Lord Abbett Municipal Income Fund, Inc., Lord Abbett National Tax-Free Income Fund. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Tiedeken, Jennifer) (Filed on 2/4/2013)
February 1, 2013 Filing 47 AFFIDAVIT of Merit in Compliance with N.J.S.A. Section 2A:53A-27 by Gordon Yale by Lord Abbett California Tax-Free Income Fund, Lord Abbett Municipal Income Fund, Inc., Lord Abbett National Tax-Free Income Fund. (Tiedeken, Jennifer) (Filed on 2/1/2013)
December 21, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER Setting Hearing on Motion (44 in 4:12-cv-03694-DMR) MOTION to Consolidate Cases for Discovery and Trial (Unopposed), (36 in 4:12-cv-06185-DMR) MOTION to Consolidate Cases for Discovery and Trial (Unopposed) : Motion Hearing set for 2/20/2013 01:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 12/21/2012. (dmrlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/21/2012)
December 21, 2012 Filing 45 Memorandum in Support of #44 MOTION to Consolidate Cases for Discovery and Trial (Unopposed) filed by Lord Abbett California Tax-Free Income Fund, Lord Abbett Municipal Income Fund, Inc., Lord Abbett National Tax-Free Income Fund. (Related document(s) #44 ) (Radford, Francine) (Filed on 12/21/2012) Modified on 12/26/2012 (kcS, ).
December 21, 2012 Filing 44 MOTION to Consolidate Cases for Discovery and Trial (Unopposed) filed by Lord Abbett California Tax-Free Income Fund, Lord Abbett Municipal Income Fund, Inc., Lord Abbett National Tax-Free Income Fund. Motion Hearing set for 2/14/2013 11:00 AM in Courtroom 4, 3rd Floor, Oakland before Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu. Responses due by 1/4/2013. Replies due by 1/11/2013. (Radford, Francine) (Filed on 12/21/2012)
December 19, 2012 Filing 43 AMENDED ANSWER to Complaint and Jury Demand byJoann Asami, R. Thomas Beach, Natasha Beery, Jane Breyer, Jennifer Lowe Campbell, Oren Cheyette, Sarah Clugg, Orpheus Crutchfield, Lynn De Jonghe, Roz Hamar, Natalie Lenz-Acuna, Tim Moppin, Gina Moreland, Joanne Rubio, Curry Villeneuve, Andrew Weill, Valerie McCann Woodson. (Beneville, Susan) (Filed on 12/19/2012)
December 19, 2012 Filing 42 STIPULATION for Amendment of Answer of Windrush Trustees filed by Joann Asami, R. Thomas Beach, Natasha Beery, Jane Breyer, Jennifer Lowe Campbell, Oren Cheyette, Sarah Clugg, Orpheus Crutchfield, Lynn De Jonghe, Roz Hamar, Natalie Lenz-Acuna, Tim Moppin, Gina Moreland, Joanne Rubio, Curry Villeneuve, Andrew Weill, Valerie McCann Woodson. (Beneville, Susan) (Filed on 12/19/2012)
December 19, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER RELATING CASE to C-12-6185-JSC Lord Abbett Municipal Income Fund, et al v. Stone & Youngberg, LLC. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 12/19/12. (ig, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/19/2012)
December 17, 2012 Filing 40 STIPULATION WITH [PROPOSED] ORDER re Reassignment and Consolidation filed by Lord Abbett California Tax-Free Income Fund, Lord Abbett Municipal Income Fund, Inc., Lord Abbett National Tax-Free Income Fund, Natasha Berry, Jane Breyer, Jennifer Lowe Campbell, Oren Cheyette, Sarah Clugg, Orpheus Crutchfield, Lynn De Jonghe, Roz Hamar, Natalie Lenz-Acuna, Tim Moppin, Gina Moreland, Joanne Rubio, Curry Villeneuve, Andrew Weill, Valerie McCann Woodson. (Attachments: #1 Letter to Judge Ryu re Stipulation and Proposed Order re Consolidation)(Radford, Francine) (Filed on 12/17/2012) Modified on 12/18/2012 (cjl, COURT STAFF). Modified on 12/18/2012 (cjl, COURT STAFF).
December 3, 2012 ADR Remark: ADR Phone Conference held by HAH on 12/3/12. A further ADR Phone Conference has been scheduled for 2/7/2013 at 10:30 a.m. Pacific. Please note that the call-in information remains the same. (sgd, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/3/2012)
November 20, 2012 Filing 39 Transcript of Proceedings held on October 25, 2012, before Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu. Court Reporter Diane E. Skillman, Telephone number 510-451-2930, Diane_Skillman@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Redaction Request due 12/11/2012. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 12/21/2012. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 2/19/2013. (Skillman, Diane) (Filed on 11/20/2012)
November 14, 2012 Filing 38 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand byJoann Asami, R. Thomas Beach, Natasha Beery, Jane Breyer, Jennifer Lowe Campbell, Oren Cheyette, Sarah Clugg, Orpheus Crutchfield, Lynn De Jonghe, Roz Hamar, Natalie Lenz-Acuna, Tim Moppin, Gina Moreland, Joanne Rubio, Curry Villeneuve, Andrew Weill, Valerie McCann Woodson. (Schweitzer, Lori) (Filed on 11/14/2012)
October 31, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 37 Order by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu denying #11 Motion to Dismiss.(dmrlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/31/2012)
October 25, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 36 CASE MANAGEMENT AND PRETRIAL ORDER: Signed by Judge Donna M. Ryu on 10/25/12. (ig, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/25/2012)
October 25, 2012 Filing 35 Minute Entry: Motion Hearing HELD. on 10/25/2012 before Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu. Defendants' Motion to Dismiss, or in alternative, for Summary Judgment - DENIED. Written Order to follow. Initial Case Management Conference HELD on 10/25/2012 before Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu. No new parties or new claims may be added. Further ADR phone conference to take place as scheduled on 12/3/2012. Updated Joint Case Management Statement due by 2/13/2013. Further Case Management Conference set for 2/20/2013 01:30 PM. Non-expert Discovery and Expert Disclosure due by 9/17/2013. Rebuttal Expert Disclosure due by 10/1/2013. Expert Discovery to be completed by 10/15/2013. Last Day to hear dispositive motions on 11/14/2013 11:00 AM. Joint Pretrial Conference Statement/Trial Briefs due by 1/3/2014. Pretrial Conference set for 1/22/2014 03:00 PM and Jury Trial (estimated for 2 Weeks) set for 2/3/2014 09:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu. (Court Reporter Diane Skillman) (ig, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 10/25/2012).
October 24, 2012 ADR Remark: ADR Phone Conference held by HAH on 10/23/12. Please make note that the further ADR Phone Conference previously scheduled has changed. The further call is now set for Monday, December 3, 2012 at 10:30 a.m. Pacific. The call-in information remains the same. (sgd, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/24/2012)
October 18, 2012 Filing 34 ADR Clerk Notice Setting ADR Phone Conference on 10/23/12 at 10:30 a.m. Pacific. Please note that you must be logged into an ECF account of counsel of record in order to view this document. (sgd, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/18/2012)
October 18, 2012 Filing 33 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options (Schweitzer, Lori) (Filed on 10/18/2012)
October 17, 2012 Filing 32 NOTICE of need for ADR Phone Conference (ADR L.R. 3-5 d) (Becherer, Patrick) (Filed on 10/17/2012)
October 17, 2012 Filing 31 JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT and [Proposed] Order filed by Joann Asami, R. Thomas Beach, Natasha Beery, Jane Breyer, Jennifer Lowe Campbell, Oren Cheyette, Sarah Clugg, Orpheus Crutchfield, Lynn De Jonghe, Roz Hamar, Natalie Lenz-Acuna, Tim Moppin, Gina Moreland, Joanne Rubio, Curry Villeneuve, Andrew Weill, Valerie McCann Woodson, Lord Abbett California Tax-Free Income Fund, Lord Abbett Municipal Income Fund, Inc., Lord Abbett National Tax-Free Income Fund. (Becherer, Patrick) (Filed on 10/17/2012) Modified on 10/18/2012 (cjl, COURT STAFF).
October 5, 2012 Filing 30 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options (Franklin, Joshua) (Filed on 10/5/2012)
October 2, 2012 Filing 29 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options by Parties and Counsel (Radford, Francine) (Filed on 10/2/2012)
October 1, 2012 Filing 28 STIPULATION Extending Time to Serve Initial Disclosures Pursuant to FRCP 26 filed by Joann Asami, R. Thomas Beach, Natasha Beery, Jane Breyer, Jennifer Lowe Campbell, Oren Cheyette, Sarah Clugg, Orpheus Crutchfield, Lynn De Jonghe, Roz Hamar, Natalie Lenz-Acuna, Tim Moppin, Gina Moreland, Joanne Rubio, Curry Villeneuve, Andrew Weill, Valerie McCann Woodson. (Becherer, Patrick) (Filed on 10/1/2012)
September 26, 2012 Filing 27 REPLY (re #11 MOTION to Dismiss or, in the alternative, for Summary Judgment ) filed byJoann Asami, R. Thomas Beach, Natasha Beery, Jane Breyer, Jennifer Lowe Campbell, Oren Cheyette, Sarah Clugg, Orpheus Crutchfield, Lynn De Jonghe, Roz Hamar, Natalie Lenz-Acuna, Tim Moppin, Gina Moreland, Joanne Rubio, Curry Villeneuve, Andrew Weill, Valerie McCann Woodson. (Attachments: #1 Defendants Objection to Plaintiff's Evidence)(Beneville, Susan) (Filed on 9/26/2012)
September 19, 2012 Filing 26 Declaration of Bryant Ahn in Support of #23 Opposition/Response to Motion, to Dismiss, Or, Alternatively, For Summary Judgment filed byLord Abbett California Tax-Free Income Fund, Lord Abbett Municipal Income Fund, Inc., Lord Abbett National Tax-Free Income Fund. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Related document(s) #23 ) (Radford, Francine) (Filed on 9/19/2012)
September 19, 2012 Filing 25 Declaration of Virginia Anne Housum in Support of #23 Opposition/Response to Motion, to Dismiss, Or Alternatively, For Summary Judgment filed byLord Abbett California Tax-Free Income Fund, Lord Abbett Municipal Income Fund, Inc., Lord Abbett National Tax-Free Income Fund. (Related document(s) #23 ) (Radford, Francine) (Filed on 9/19/2012)
September 19, 2012 Filing 24 Declaration of Francine T. Radford in Support of #23 Opposition/Response to Motion, to Dismiss, Or, Alternatively, for Summary Judgment filed byLord Abbett California Tax-Free Income Fund, Lord Abbett Municipal Income Fund, Inc., Lord Abbett National Tax-Free Income Fund. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Related document(s) #23 ) (Radford, Francine) (Filed on 9/19/2012)
September 19, 2012 Filing 23 RESPONSE (re #11 MOTION to Dismiss or, in the alternative, for Summary Judgment ) filed byLord Abbett California Tax-Free Income Fund, Lord Abbett Municipal Income Fund, Inc., Lord Abbett National Tax-Free Income Fund. (Radford, Francine) (Filed on 9/19/2012)
September 6, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER granting #16 Valeri S. Pappas' Motion for admission Pro Hac Vice by Judge Donna M. Ryu. (ig, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/6/2012)
September 6, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER granting #15 Jennifer A. Tiedeken's Motion for admission Pro Hac Vice by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu. (ig, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/6/2012)
September 6, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER granting #14 Michael P. Cillo's Motion for admission Pro Hac Vice by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu. (ig, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/6/2012)
September 5, 2012 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #11 MOTION to Dismiss or, in the alternative, for Summary Judgment. Responses due by 9/19/2012. Replies due by 9/26/2012. Motion Hearing set for 10/25/2012 11:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu. (vlk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/5/2012)
September 5, 2012 Filing 19 Certificate of Interested Entities by Sarah Clugg, Roz Hamar (Beneville, Susan) (Filed on 9/5/2012)
September 5, 2012 Filing 18 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Sarah Clugg, Roz Hamar.. (Beneville, Susan) (Filed on 9/5/2012)
September 5, 2012 Filing 17 Amended NOTICE of Hearing on #11 MOTION to Dismiss or, in the alternative, for Summary Judgment filed by Joann Asami, R. Thomas Beach, Natasha Beery, Jane Breyer, Jennifer Lowe Campbell, Oren Cheyette, Sarah Clugg, Orpheus Crutchfield, Lynn De Jonghe, Roz Hamar, Natalie Lenz-Acuna, Tim Moppin, Gina Moreland, Joanne Rubio, Curry Villeneuve, Andrew Weill, Valerie McCann Woodson. Motion Hearing set for 10/25/2012 11:00 AM in Courtroom 4, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu. Responses due by 9/19/2012. Replies due by 9/26/2012. (Attachments: #1 Declaration (Supplemental) of Lori Schweitzer in support of Defendants' Motion to Dismiss, or, in the alternative, for Summary Judgment)(Beneville, Susan) (Filed on 9/5/2012) Modified on 9/7/2012 (kc, COURT STAFF).
September 5, 2012 Filing 16 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice re: Valeri S. Pappas ( Filing fee $ 305, receipt number 44611009356.) Filing fee previously paid on 9/5/2012 filed by Lord Abbett California Tax-Free Income Fund, Lord Abbett Municipal Income Fund, Inc., Lord Abbett National Tax-Free Income Fund. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(vlk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/5/2012)
September 4, 2012 Filing 15 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice re Jennifer A. Tiedeken ( Filing fee $ 305, receipt number 44611009352.) Filing fee previously paid on 9/4/2012 filed by Lord Abbett California Tax-Free Income Fund, Lord Abbett Municipal Income Fund, Inc., Lord Abbett National Tax-Free Income Fund. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(vlk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/4/2012) Modified on 9/5/2012 (vlk, COURT STAFF).
September 4, 2012 Filing 14 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice re Michael P. Cillo ( Filing fee $ 305, receipt number 44611009352.) Filing fee previously paid on 9/4/2012 filed by Lord Abbett California Tax-Free Income Fund, Lord Abbett Municipal Income Fund, Inc., Lord Abbett National Tax-Free Income Fund. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(vlk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/4/2012) Modified on 9/5/2012 (vlk, COURT STAFF).
September 4, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 13 Order by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu granting #12 Stipulation re Defendants' Motion to Dismiss, or, in the Alternative, For Summary Judgment.(dmrlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/4/2012)
September 4, 2012 Set Deadlines/Hearings: Case Management Statement due by 10/18/2012. Initial Case Management Conference set for 10/25/2012 11:00 AM. (dmrlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/4/2012)
September 4, 2012 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #11 MOTION to Dismiss or, in the alternative, for Summary Judgment. Responses due by 9/24/2012. Replies due by 10/4/2012. Motion Hearing set for 10/25/2012 11:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu. (dmrlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/4/2012)
August 31, 2012 Filing 12 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re #11 MOTION to Dismiss or, in the alternative, for Summary Judgment filed by Lord Abbett California Tax-Free Income Fund, Lord Abbett Municipal Income Fund, Inc., Lord Abbett National Tax-Free Income Fund. (Attachments: #1 Letter to Hon. Donna M. Ryu)(Radford, Francine) (Filed on 8/31/2012)
August 27, 2012 Filing 11 MOTION to Dismiss or, in the alternative, for Summary Judgment filed by Joann Asami, R. Thomas Beach, Natasha Beery, Jane Breyer, Jennifer Lowe Campbell, Oren Cheyette, Orpheus Crutchfield, Lynn De Jonghe, Natalie Lenz-Acuna, Tim Moppin, Gina Moreland, Joanne Rubio, Curry Villeneuve, Andrew Weill, Valerie McCann Woodson. Motion Hearing set for 10/11/2012 11:00 AM in Courtroom 4, 3rd Floor, Oakland before Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu. Responses due by 9/10/2012. Replies due by 9/17/2012. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Points and Authorities in support of Defendants' Motion to Dismiss, or, in the alternative, for Summary Judgment, #2 Request for Judicial Notice in support of Defendants' Motion to Dismiss, or, in the alternative, for Summary Judgment, #3 Declaration Declaration of James Ough in support of Defendants' Motion to Dismiss, or, in the alternative, for Summary Judgment, #4 Declaration of Lori A. Schweitzer in support of Defendants' Motion to Dismiss, or, in the alternative, for Summary Judgment (Pt. 1 of 3), #5 Declaration of Lori A. Schweitzer in support of Defendants' Motion to Dismiss, or, in the alternative, for Summary Judgment (Pt. 2 of 3), #6 Declaration of Lori A. Schweitzer in support of Defendants' Motion to Dismiss, or, in the alternative, for Summary Judgment (Pt. 3 of 3))(Schweitzer, Lori) (Filed on 8/27/2012)
August 23, 2012 Filing 10 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Joann Asami, R. Thomas Beach, Natasha Beery, Jane Breyer, Jennifer Lowe Campbell, Oren Cheyette, Orpheus Crutchfield, Lynn De Jonghe, Natalie Lenz-Acuna, Tim Moppin, Gina Moreland, Joanne Rubio, Curry Villeneuve, Andrew Weill, Valerie McCann Woodson.. (Schweitzer, Lori) (Filed on 8/23/2012)
August 16, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 9 Order by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu granting #7 Stipulation for Plaintiff to Issue a Third-Party Subpoena.(dmrlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/16/2012)
August 15, 2012 Filing 8 Certificate of Interested Entities by Joann Asami, R. Thomas Beach, Natasha Beery, Jane Breyer, Jennifer Lowe Campbell, Oren Cheyette, Orpheus Crutchfield, Lynn De Jonghe, Natalie Lenz-Acuna, Tim Moppin, Gina Moreland, Joanne Rubio, Curry Villeneuve, Andrew Weill, Valerie McCann Woodson (Beneville, Susan) (Filed on 8/15/2012)
August 14, 2012 Filing 7 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER for Plaintiff to Issue a Third-Party Subpoena Prior to FRCP 26(f) Conference filed by Lord Abbett California Tax-Free Income Fund, Lord Abbett Municipal Income Fund, Inc., Lord Abbett National Tax-Free Income Fund. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Signature Page (Declarations/Stipulations), #3 Cover letter to Honorable Donna M. Ryu)(Radford, Francine) (Filed on 8/14/2012)
August 13, 2012 Filing 6 Certificate of Interested Entities by Lord Abbett California Tax-Free Income Fund, Lord Abbett Municipal Income Fund, Inc., Lord Abbett National Tax-Free Income Fund (Radford, Francine) (Filed on 8/13/2012)
August 10, 2012 Filing 5 STIPULATION Extending Time for Responsive Pleading filed by Joann Asami, R. Thomas Beach, Natasha Beery, Jane Breyer, Jennifer Lowe Campbell, Oren Cheyette, Orpheus Crutchfield, Lynn De Jonghe, Natalie Lenz-Acuna, Tim Moppin, Gina Moreland, Joanne Rubio, Curry Villeneuve, Andrew Weill, Valerie McCann Woodson. (Becherer, Patrick) (Filed on 8/10/2012)
August 6, 2012 Filing 4 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Lord Abbett California Tax-Free Income Fund, Lord Abbett Municipal Income Fund, Inc., Lord Abbett National Tax-Free Income Fund.. (Radford, Francine) (Filed on 8/6/2012)
July 16, 2012 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (vlk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/16/2012)
July 13, 2012 Filing 2 ADR SCHEDULING ORDER: Case Management Statement due by 10/10/2012. Case Management Conference set for 10/17/2012 01:30 PM. (Attachments: #1 Standing Order)(vlk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/13/2012)
July 13, 2012 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with jury demand against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 350, receipt number 44611009106.). Filed byLord Abbett Municipal Income Fund, Inc., Lord Abbett California Tax-Free Income Fund, Lord Abbett National Tax-Free Income Fund. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(vlk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/13/2012)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lord Abbett Municipal Income Fund, Inc. et al v. Asami et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jennifer Lowe Campbell
Represented By: Lori A. Schweitzer
Represented By: Alex Paul Catalona
Represented By: Susan Phair Beneville
Represented By: Patrick James Becherer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: R. Thomas Beach
Represented By: Lori A. Schweitzer
Represented By: Alex Paul Catalona
Represented By: Susan Phair Beneville
Represented By: Patrick James Becherer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tim Moppin
Represented By: Lori A. Schweitzer
Represented By: Alex Paul Catalona
Represented By: Susan Phair Beneville
Represented By: Patrick James Becherer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Roz Hamar
Represented By: Lori A. Schweitzer
Represented By: Alex Paul Catalona
Represented By: Susan Phair Beneville
Represented By: Patrick James Becherer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Natasha Beery
Represented By: Lori A. Schweitzer
Represented By: Alex Paul Catalona
Represented By: Susan Phair Beneville
Represented By: Patrick James Becherer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Curry Villeneuve
Represented By: Lori A. Schweitzer
Represented By: Alex Paul Catalona
Represented By: Susan Phair Beneville
Represented By: Patrick James Becherer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joann Asami
Represented By: Lori A. Schweitzer
Represented By: Alex Paul Catalona
Represented By: Susan Phair Beneville
Represented By: Patrick James Becherer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lynn De Jonghe
Represented By: Lori A. Schweitzer
Represented By: Alex Paul Catalona
Represented By: Susan Phair Beneville
Represented By: Patrick James Becherer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jane Breyer
Represented By: Lori A. Schweitzer
Represented By: Alex Paul Catalona
Represented By: Susan Phair Beneville
Represented By: Patrick James Becherer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Oren Cheyette
Represented By: Lori A. Schweitzer
Represented By: Alex Paul Catalona
Represented By: Susan Phair Beneville
Represented By: Patrick James Becherer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Orpheus Crutchfield
Represented By: Lori A. Schweitzer
Represented By: Alex Paul Catalona
Represented By: Susan Phair Beneville
Represented By: Patrick James Becherer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sarah Clugg
Represented By: Lori A. Schweitzer
Represented By: Alex Paul Catalona
Represented By: Susan Phair Beneville
Represented By: Patrick James Becherer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew Weill
Represented By: Lori A. Schweitzer
Represented By: Susan Phair Beneville
Represented By: Patrick James Becherer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joanne Rubio
Represented By: Lori A. Schweitzer
Represented By: Alex Paul Catalona
Represented By: Susan Phair Beneville
Represented By: Patrick James Becherer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gina Moreland
Represented By: Lori A. Schweitzer
Represented By: Alex Paul Catalona
Represented By: Susan Phair Beneville
Represented By: Patrick James Becherer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Natalie Lenz-Acuna
Represented By: Lori A. Schweitzer
Represented By: Alex Paul Catalona
Represented By: Susan Phair Beneville
Represented By: Patrick James Becherer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Valerie McCann Woodson
Represented By: Lori A. Schweitzer
Represented By: Alex Paul Catalona
Represented By: Susan Phair Beneville
Represented By: Patrick James Becherer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lord Abbett National Tax-Free Income Fund
Represented By: Michael P Cillo
Represented By: Valeri S. Pappas
Represented By: Robert A. Goodin
Represented By: Joshua D Franklin
Represented By: Jennifer A. Tiedeken
Represented By: Scott Warren Wilkinson
Represented By: Francine Terhune Radford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lord Abbett California Tax-Free Income Fund
Represented By: Michael P Cillo
Represented By: Valeri S. Pappas
Represented By: Robert A. Goodin
Represented By: Joshua D Franklin
Represented By: Jennifer A. Tiedeken
Represented By: Scott Warren Wilkinson
Represented By: Francine Terhune Radford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lord Abbett Municipal Income Fund, Inc.
Represented By: Michael P Cillo
Represented By: Valeri S. Pappas
Represented By: Robert A. Goodin
Represented By: Joshua D Franklin
Represented By: Jennifer A. Tiedeken
Represented By: Scott Warren Wilkinson
Represented By: Gary James Ceriani
Represented By: Francine Terhune Radford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated defendant: Stone & Youngberg LLC
Represented By: Bernard Reynold Suter
Represented By: Nathan Randall Jaskowiak
Represented By: J Stephen Young
Represented By: Harry V. Osborne, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?