Martinez v. California Highway Patrol et al
Plaintiff: Gregory Scott Martinez
Defendant: Hohmeister, County of Marin, Marin County Sheriff's Department, California Highway Patrol and M. Perry
Case Number: 4:2012cv03736
Filed: July 17, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: Oakland Office
County: Marin
Presiding Judge: Donna M. Ryu
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 2, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER GRANTING CALIFORNIA HIGHWAY PATROL'S MOTION TO DISMISS; GRANTING COUNTY OF MARIN AND MARIN COUNTY SHERIFFS DEPARTMENT'S MOTION TO DISMISS; VACATING HEARING. The First, Second, and Third Claims for Relief, to the extent alleged against the California Highway Patrol, are dismissed without leave to amend. The Fourth Claim for Relief is dismissed with leave to amend. If plaintiff wishes to file a First Amended Complaint, plaintiff shall file and serve such amended pleading it no lat er than January 22, 2013. If plaintiff does not file a First Amended Complaint by January 22, 2013, the action will proceed against Officer Perry and Officer Hohmeister only. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on January 2, 2013. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/2/2013)
October 31, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER Discharging 8 Order to Show Cause and Setting Initial Case Management Conference. Case Management Statement due by 12/12/2012. Initial Case Management Conference set for 12/19/2012 01:30 PM. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 10/31/2012. (dmrlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/31/2012)
October 18, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. Show Cause Response due by 10/31/2012. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 10/18/2012. (dmrlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/18/2012)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Martinez v. California Highway Patrol et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hohmeister
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: County of Marin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marin County Sheriff's Department
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: California Highway Patrol
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M. Perry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gregory Scott Martinez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?