Jongerius Panoramic Technologies, LLC v. Google Inc. et al Featured Case
Plaintiff: Jongerius Panoramic Technologies, LLC
Defendant: Google Inc and Apple Inc
Case Number: 4:2012cv03797
Filed: July 20, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: Oakland Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35 U.S.C. ยง 271
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 18, 2014. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 24, 2012 Filing 73 CLERKS NOTICE to parties that case has been transferred to the U.S. District Court, Northern District of California (Oakland). (Attachments: # 1 Certificate/Proof of Service) (jlm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/24/2012)
July 20, 2012 Filing 72 ADR SCHEDULING ORDER: Case Management Statement due by 10/15/2012. Case Management Conference set for 10/22/2012 02:00 PM. (Attachments: # 1 Standing Order - YGR)(jlm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/20/2012)
July 20, 2012 Filing 71 Case transferred in from District of Florida Middle; Case Number 6:12-cv-00308. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. Modified on 7/24/2012 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
July 16, 2012 Filing 70 TRANSFER to the Northern District of California (JET)
July 13, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 69 ORDER granting 42 Motion to transfer case. This case is hereby TRANSFERRED to the United States District Court for the Northern District of California. The Clerk is directed to close this case. Signed by Chief Judge Anne C. Conway on 7/13/2012. (SR)
July 11, 2012 Filing 68 Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Thomas B. Smith. New case number: 6:12-cv-308-ORL-ACC-TBS. Magistrate Judge Karla R. Spaulding no longer assigned to the case. (MAL) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Thomas B. Smith.
July 6, 2012 Filing 67 NOTICE to counsel of filing of OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. Any party needing a copy of the transcript to review for redaction purposes may purchase a copy from the court reporter or view the document at the clerk's office public terminal. Court Reporter: Sandy Tremel (SKT)
July 6, 2012 Filing 66 TRANSCRIPT of motion to transfer held on June 25, 2012 before Judge Anne C. Conway. Court Reporter Sandy Tremel,Telephone number 407-245-3110. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER or purchased through the Court Reporter. Redaction Request due 7/27/2012, Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 8/6/2012, Release of Transcript Restriction set for 10/4/2012. (SKT)
June 25, 2012 Filing 65 Minute Entry. Proceedings held before Chief Judge Anne C. Conway: Motion Hearing held on 6/25/2012 re 42 MOTION to transfer case to Northern District of California filed by Google Inc. and Apple Inc.. Court Reporter: Sandy Tremel (SR)
June 21, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 64 ORDER granting 58 Motion to allow electronic equipment. Signed by Chief Judge Anne C. Conway on 6/20/2012. (SR)
June 20, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 63 ORDER granting in part and denying in part 56 Motion to seal. Defendant Google, Inc. shall file a copy of the unredacted Agreement in paper form and deliver a courtesy copy of the unredacted Agreement to the chambers of the presiding district judge today. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karla R. Spaulding on 6/20/2012.(LJN)
June 18, 2012 Filing 62 RESPONSE to motion re 56 Unopposed MOTION for leave to file under seal an unredacted version of Plaintiff's Exhibit E to Response 51 OR its Response to Motion to Substitute Exhibit filed by Jongerius Panoramic Technologies, LLC. (Cammack, Decker)
June 18, 2012 Filing 61 NOTICE of filing Substitute Exhibits and Corresponding Declarations re 51 Response by Jongerius Panoramic Technologies, LLC (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit A, # 4 Exhibit B, # 5 Exhibit C, # 6 Exhibit D, # 7 Exhibit E, # 8 Exhibit F, # 9 Exhibit G)(Cammack, Decker) Modified on 6/18/2012 (JET).
June 15, 2012 Set/reset deadlines as to 56 Unopposed MOTION for leave to file under seal an unredacted version of Plaintiff's Exhibit E to Response 51 OR its Response to Motion to Substitute Exhibit. Responses due by 6/19/2012. See Order #60. (JET)
June 15, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 60 ENDORSED ORDER that, on or before June 19, 2012, Plaintiff shall file it response to the motion by Defendants 56 supported by evidence and legal authority that the agreement between Plaintiff and the inventor-in-suit is entitled to confidential treatment. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karla R. Spaulding on 6/15/2012. (Spaulding, Karla)
June 15, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 59 ENDORSED ORDER granting in part and denying in part 54 Motion to delete certain exhibits from CM/ECF. The Clerk of Court is directed to delete the exhbits filed with Doc. No. 51. Plaintiff shall promptly refile the exhibits, substituting redacted copies as necessary. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karla R. Spaulding on 6/15/2012. (Spaulding, Karla)
June 13, 2012 Filing 58 Joint MOTION to allow electronic equipment, specifically laptop computers by Jongerius Panoramic Technologies, LLC, Apple, Inc., and Google Inc. (Cammack, Decker) Modified on 6/14/2012 to add filers (JET).
June 11, 2012 Filing 57 CERTIFICATE of compliance re directive in 52 Notice of Hearing on Motion (Delivery of Pleadings to Clerk's Office for Use by Chambers) by Jongerius Panoramic Technologies, LLC. (Gilchrist, Brian) Modified on 6/12/2012 (JET).
June 6, 2012 Filing 56 Unopposed MOTION for leave to file under seal an unredacted version of Plaintiff's Exhibit E to Response 51 OR its Response to 54 Motion to Substitute Exhibit by Google Inc. (Landa, Adam) Modified on 6/7/2012 (JET).
June 5, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 55 ENDORSED ORDER granting in part and denying in part 43 Motion to stay discovery. Discovery may not begin in this case until the Court enters a Case Management and Scheduling Order or the motion for transfer is resolved, whichever occurs first. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karla R. Spaulding on 6/5/2012. (Spaulding, Karla)
June 4, 2012 Filing 54 MOTION for miscellaneous relief, specifically Substitute Exhibit and Corresponding Declaration by Jongerius Panoramic Technologies, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Text of Proposed Order)(Gilchrist, Brian)
June 1, 2012 Filing 53 (document deleted per attorney request-contained unredacted information) MOTION for miscellaneous relief, specifically to Substitute Exhibit and Corresponding Declaration by Jongerius Panoramic Technologies, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Text of Proposed Order)(Cammack, Decker) Modified on 6/4/2012 (LAK).
May 31, 2012 Filing 52 NOTICE of Hearing on Motion 42 MOTION to transfer case to Northern District of California : Motion Hearing set for 6/25/2012 at 03:30 PM in Orlando Courtroom 6 A before Chief Judge Anne C. Conway. Counsel are directed to deliver to the clerk's office for use by chambers on or before June 11, 2012 a paper copy of all documents filed electronically in support of, or in opposition to, the Motion to Transfer.(CB)
May 31, 2012 Filing 51 RESPONSE to motion re 42 MOTION to transfer case to Northern District of California by Defendants Google Inc. and Apple Inc. filed by Jongerius Panoramic Technologies, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit A, # 4 Exhibit B, # 5 Exhibit C, # 6 Exhibit D, # 7 Exhibit E, # 8 Exhibit F, # 9 Exhibit G)(Cammack, Decker) Modified on 6/18/2012 (JET). EXHIBITS DELETED PER ORDER #59, TO BE REFILED WITH REDACTED COPIES AS NECESSARY.
May 30, 2012 Filing 50 RESPONSE to motion re 43 MOTION to stay discovery by Defendants Google Inc. and Apple Inc. filed by Jongerius Panoramic Technologies, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit, # 2 Exhibit 1)(Cammack, Decker)
May 29, 2012 Filing 49 CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT. (Cammack, Decker)
May 25, 2012 Filing 48 REPLY to 37 Counterclaim of Defendant Google Inc. by Jongerius Panoramic Technologies, LLC.(Cammack, Decker) Modified on 5/29/2012 (JET).
May 25, 2012 Filing 47 REPLY to 46 Counterclaim of Defendant Apple Inc. by Jongerius Panoramic Technologies, LLC. (Cammack, Decker) Modified on 5/29/2012 (JET).
May 23, 2012 Filing 46 Corrected ANSWER and affirmative defenses to 1 Complaint with Jury Demand, COUNTERCLAIM (Corrected) against Jongerius Panoramic Technologies, LLC by Apple Inc..(Tibbals, Lara)
May 22, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER granting 44 Motion for leave to file. The amended document shall be filed within 5 days. Signed by Chief Judge Anne C. Conway on 5/22/2012. (Conway, Anne)
May 21, 2012 Filing 44 Unopposed MOTION for leave to file Corrected Answer, Affirmative Defenses and Counterclaim and Incorporated Memorandum of Law by Apple Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Tibbals, Lara)
May 17, 2012 Filing 43 MOTION to stay discovery by Google Inc., and Apple Inc. (Landa, Adam) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Karla R. Spaulding. Modified on 5/18/2012 to add filer (JET).
May 17, 2012 Filing 42 MOTION to transfer case to Northern District of California by Google Inc., and Apple Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Adam Landa, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit 2, # 4 Exhibit 3, # 5 Exhibit 4, # 6 Exhibit 5, # 7 Exhibit 6, # 8 Exhibit 7, # 9 Exhibit 8, # 10 Exhibit 9, # 11 Exhibit 10, # 12 Exhibit 11, # 13 Exhibit 12, # 14 Exhibit 13, # 15 Exhibit 14, # 16 Exhibit 15, # 17 Exhibit 16)(Landa, Adam) Modified on 5/18/2012 to add filer(JET).
May 9, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER granting 36 Motion. The Clerk is directed to modify the Plaintiff's name on the docket ; granting 40 Motion to Appear Telephonically provided that each party must have one lawyer attend in person. Signed by Chief Judge Anne C. Conway on 5/9/2012. (Conway, Anne)
May 8, 2012 Filing 40 Unopposed Joint MOTION to Appear Telephonically at the Case Management Conference by all parties. (Landa, Adam) Modified on 5/9/2012 (JET).
May 8, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER granting 35 motion for Josef B. Schenker to appear pro hac vice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karla R. Spaulding on 5/8/2012. (LAK)
May 7, 2012 Filing 38 ANSWER and affirmative defenses to 1 Complaint with Jury Demand, COUNTERCLAIM against Panomap Technologies, LLC by Apple Inc..(Tibbals, Lara)
May 7, 2012 Filing 37 ANSWER and affirmative defenses to 1 Complaint with Jury Demand, COUNTERCLAIM against Panomap Technologies, LLC by Google Inc..(Landa, Adam)
May 7, 2012 Filing 36 NOTICE of Change of Plaintiff's Name and Unopposed MOTION for miscellaneous relief, specifically to Change the Style of the Case by Panomap Technologies, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1: Articles of Amendment, # 2 Exhibit 2: Notice from Patent and Trademark Office reflecting name change)(Cammack, Decker) Modified on 5/8/2012 (JET).
May 7, 2012 Filing 35 Unopposed MOTION for Josef B. Schenker to appear pro hac vice by Apple Inc.. (Tibbals, Lara) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Karla R. Spaulding.
May 7, 2012 ***PRO HAC VICE FEES paid and Special Admission Attorney Certification Form filed by attorney Josef Bryks Schenker appearing on behalf of Apple Inc, re 35 Unopposed Motion to appear pro hac vice. (Filing fee $10, receipt number TPA11101.) (JNB) Modified on 5/8/2012 (JET).
May 4, 2012 ***PRO HAC VICE FEES paid and Special Admission Attorney Certification Form filed by attorney Charanjit Brahma appearing on behalf of Google Inc. (Filing fee $10 receipt number ORL-16728.) Related document: 33 Verified MOTION for Charanjit Brahma to appear pro hac vice (MAL)
May 2, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER granting 33 motion for Charanjit Brahma to appear pro hac vice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karla R. Spaulding on 5/2/2012. (LAK)
May 1, 2012 Filing 33 Verified MOTION for Charanjit Brahma to appear pro hac vice by Google Inc.. (Landa, Adam) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Karla R. Spaulding.
April 27, 2012 Filing 32 NOTICE of pendency of related cases re 22 Related case/Interested persons/ECF per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Apple Inc.. Related case(s): no (Tibbals, Lara)
April 27, 2012 Filing 31 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re 22 Related case/Interested persons/ECF by Apple Inc.. (Tibbals, Lara)
April 20, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER granting 27 motion to appear pro hac vice; granting 28 motion to appear pro hac vice; granting 29 motion to appear pro hac vice. Attorneys James R. Batchelder, Khue V. Hoang and Paul M. Shoenhard may specially appearing this case as counsel for Apple Inc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karla R. Spaulding on 4/20/2012. (LAK)
April 20, 2012 ***PRO HAC VICE FEES paid and Special Admission Attorney Certification Form filed by attorney Khue V. Hoang appearing on behalf of Apple Inc. (Filing fee $10 receipt number TPA10832) (JNB) re 28 Unopposed MOTION for Khue V. Hoang to appear pro hac vice Modified on 4/25/2012 (IGC).
April 20, 2012 ***PRO HAC VICE FEES paid and Special Admission Attorney Certification Form filed by attorney Paul M. Schoenhard appearing on behalf of Apple Inc. (Filing fee $10 receipt number TPA10831) (JNB) re 29 Unopposed MOTION for Paul M. Schoenhard to appear pro hac vice Modified on 4/25/2012 (IGC).
April 20, 2012 ***PRO HAC VICE FEES paid and Special Admission Attorney Certification Form filed by attorney James R. Batchelder appearing on behalf of Apple Inc. (Filing fee $10 receipt number TPA10833.) (JNB) re 27 Unopposed MOTION for James R. Batchelder to appear pro hac vice Modified on 4/25/2012 (IGC).
April 19, 2012 Filing 29 Unopposed MOTION for Paul M. Schoenhard to appear pro hac vice by Apple Inc.. (Tibbals, Lara) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Karla R. Spaulding.
April 19, 2012 Filing 28 Unopposed MOTION for Khue V. Hoang to appear pro hac vice by Apple Inc.. (Tibbals, Lara) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Karla R. Spaulding.
April 19, 2012 Filing 27 Unopposed MOTION for James R. Batchelder to appear pro hac vice by Apple Inc.. (Tibbals, Lara) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Karla R. Spaulding.
April 16, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER granting 25 motion for Scott J. Bornstein to appear pro hac vice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karla R. Spaulding on 4/16/2012. (LAK)
April 13, 2012 Filing 25 MOTION for Scott J. Bornstein to appear pro hac vice by Google Inc.. (Landa, Adam) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Karla R. Spaulding.
April 13, 2012 Filing 24 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re 15 Related case/Interested persons/ECF by Google Inc.. (Landa, Adam)
April 13, 2012 Filing 23 NOTICE of pendency of related cases re 15 Related case/Interested persons/ECF per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Google Inc.. Related case(s): No (Landa, Adam)
April 13, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 22 RELATED CASE ORDER, INTERESTED PERSONS ORDER and ORDER Requiring Electronic Filing directed to Defendant, Apple, Inc.. Notice of pendency of other actions due by 4/29/2012. Certificate of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement due by 4/29/2012. Signed by Chief Judge Anne C. Conway on 4/13/2012. (SR)(copies mailed/emailed)
April 13, 2012 ***PRO HAC VICE FEES paid and Special Admission Attorney Certification Form filed by attorney Scott J. Bornstein appearing on behalf of Google Inc. (Filing fee $10 receipt number ORL-16124.) (MAL) re 25 MOTION for Scott J. Bornstein to appear pro hac vice Modified on 4/25/2012 (IGC).
April 3, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER granting 19 Motion for extension of time to answer or respond; Apple Inc. answer due 5/7/2012. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karla R. Spaulding on 4/3/2012. (LAK)
April 3, 2012 Filing 20 NOTICE of Appearance by Casey G. Reeder on behalf of Apple Inc. (Reeder, Casey)
April 2, 2012 Filing 19 Unopposed MOTION for extension of time until 5/7/12 to file answer or otherwise plead re 1 Complaint by Apple Inc. (Tibbals, Lara) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Karla R. Spaulding. Modified on 4/3/2012 (JET).
March 30, 2012 Filing 18 NOTICE of Appearance by Lara J. Tibbals on behalf of Apple Inc. (Tibbals, Lara)
March 30, 2012 Filing 17 NOTICE of Appearance by Benjamin H. Hill, III on behalf of Apple Inc. (Hill, Benjamin)
March 30, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER granting 14 Unopposed Motion for extension of time to answer or respond. Google Inc. response due 5/7/2012. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karla R. Spaulding on 3/30/2012. (ECJ)
March 30, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 15 RELATED CASE ORDER, INTERESTED PERSONS ORDER and ORDER Requiring Electronic Filing directed to defendant, Google, Inc.. Notice of pendency of other actions due by 4/13/2012. Certificate of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement due by 4/13/2012. Signed by Chief Judge Anne C. Conway on 3/30/2012. (SR) (copies mailed/emailed) Modified on 4/13/2012 (SR).
March 29, 2012 Filing 14 Unopposed MOTION for extension of time until 5/7/12 to file answer or otherwise plead re 1 Complaint by Google Inc. (Landa, Adam) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Karla R. Spaulding. Modified on 3/30/2012 (JET).
March 28, 2012 Filing 13 RETURN of service executed on 03/16/2012 by Panomap Technologies, LLC as to Apple Inc.. (Gilchrist, Brian)
March 28, 2012 Filing 12 RETURN of service executed on 03/16/2012 by Panomap Technologies, LLC as to Google Inc.. (Gilchrist, Brian)
March 8, 2012 Filing 11 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re 6 Related case/Interested persons/ECF-2 by Panomap Technologies, LLC. (Gilchrist, Brian)
March 8, 2012 Filing 10 NOTICE of pendency of related cases re 6 Related case/Interested persons/ECF-2 per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Panomap Technologies, LLC. Related case(s): No. (Gilchrist, Brian)
March 7, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting 7 motion to appear pro hac vice; granting 8 motion to appear pro hac vice. Brent N. Bumgardner and Decker A. Cammack may specially appear in this case as counsel for PanoMap Technologies, LLC. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karla R. Spaulding on 3/7/2012. (LAK)
March 6, 2012 Filing 8 MOTION for Decker A. Cammack, Esq. to appear pro hac vice by Panomap Technologies, LLC. (Gilchrist, Brian) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Karla R. Spaulding.
March 6, 2012 Filing 7 MOTION for Brent N. Bumgardner, Esq. to appear pro hac vice by Panomap Technologies, LLC. (Gilchrist, Brian) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Karla R. Spaulding.
March 6, 2012 ***PRO HAC VICE FEES re 7 paid and Special Admission Attorney Certification Form filed by attorney Brent N. Bumgardner appearing on behalf of Panomap Technologies, LLC (Filing fee $10 receipt number ORL-15129.) (MAL) Modified link on 3/6/2012 (MAL).
March 6, 2012 ***PRO HAC VICE FEES re 8 paid and Special Admission Attorney Certification Form filed by attorney Decker A. Cammack appearing on behalf of Panomap Technologies, LLC (Filing fee $10 receipt number ORL-15130.) (MAL) Modified link on 3/6/2012 (MAL).
February 27, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 6 RELATED CASE ORDER, NOTICE OF DESIGNATION under Local Rule 3.05 - Track 2, INTERESTED PERSONS ORDER and ORDER Requiring Electronic Filing. Notice of pendency of other actions due by 3/16/2012. Certificate of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement due by 3/16/2012. Signed by Chief Judge Anne C. Conway on 2/27/2012. (SR) (copies mailed/emailed)
February 27, 2012 Filing 5 NOTICE to counsel, Decker A. Cammack, of Local Rule 2:02 (signed by deputy clerk). (MAL)
February 27, 2012 Filing 4 NOTICE to counsel, Brent N. Bumgardner, of Local Rule 2:02 (signed by deputy clerk). (MAL)
February 27, 2012 Filing 3 Patent Report sent to Alexandria, VA. (MAL)
February 24, 2012 Filing 2 Summons issued as to Apple Inc. and Google Inc. (MAL)
February 24, 2012 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Apple Inc. and Google Inc. with Jury Demand (Filing fee $ 350 receipt number ORL14805) filed by Panomap Technologies, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Civil Cover Sheet)(MAL)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jongerius Panoramic Technologies, LLC v. Google Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Google Inc
Represented By: Scott J Bornstein
Represented By: Charanjit Brahma
Represented By: Nicholas A Brown
Represented By: Kakoli Caprihan
Represented By: Jim W. Fang
Represented By: Adam B. Landa
Represented By: Jack Lin
Represented By: Vera Ranieri
Represented By: Josef B. Schenker
Represented By: Paul M. Schoenhard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Apple Inc
Represented By: James R Batchelder
Represented By: James R. Batchelder
Represented By: Khue V. Hoang
Represented By: Josef Bryks Schenker
Represented By: Paul M. Schoenhard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jongerius Panoramic Technologies, LLC
Represented By: Brent N. Bumgardner
Represented By: Decker A. Cammack
Represented By: Brian R. Gilchrist
Represented By: Robert Warren Hicks
Represented By: Allison R. Imber
Represented By: Tricia Marie Wozniak
Represented By: Kenneth Robert Wright
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?