Perrenod v. United States of America et al
Plaintiff: George Perrenod
Defendant: United States of America and Commissioner of Internal Revenue
Case Number: 4:2012cv03815
Filed: July 20, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: Oakland Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: Donna M. Ryu
Nature of Suit: Taxes (US Plaintiff or Defendant)
Cause of Action: 26:7422
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 8, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER RESETTING FINAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE. Final Pretrial Conference set for 8/14/2013 02:00 PM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco. Deadline for filing pretrial papers has passed. Signed by Judge William Alsup on 8/8/2013. (whasec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/8/2013)
July 5, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 42 NOTICE VACATING HEARING re 41 Order on Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge Alsup on July 5, 2013.. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/5/2013)
July 3, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT by Hon. William Alsup granting in part and denying in part 29 Motion for Summary Judgment.(whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/3/2013)
June 25, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER RE BRIEFING SCHEDULE re 31 Response to Order to Show Cause filed by George Perrenod, 30 Order to Show Cause. Signed by Judge Alsup on June 25, 2013.. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/25/2013)
June 24, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE Show Cause Response due by 6/26/2013.. Signed by Judge Alsup on June 24, 2013.. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/24/2013)
April 26, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER GRANTING EXTENSION OF ENE DEADLINE by Hon. William Alsup granting 26 Stipulation.(whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/26/2013)
February 7, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER GRANTING ENE EXTENSION by Hon. William Alsup granting 23 Stipulation.(whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/7/2013)
October 19, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 13 SUPPLEMENTAL ORDER TO ORDER SETTING INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE re 12 Clerks Notice. Signed by Judge William Alsup on 10/16/12. (dt, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/19/2012)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Perrenod v. United States of America et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: George Perrenod
Represented By: Robert Lawrence Goldstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Internal Revenue
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?