Anderson v. Solis
Plaintiff: George Anderson
Defendant: Jose Solis
Case Number: 4:2012cv03855
Filed: July 24, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Napa
Presiding Judge: Donna M. Ryu
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 28, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 102 ORDER OF DISMISSAL. Signed by Judge Vince Chhabria on 8/28/2015. (knm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/28/2015)
August 3, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 101 Order as Modified by Hon. Vince Chhabria granting 99 Motion for the case to be reopened until 8/25/2015.(knm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/3/2015)
June 24, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 98 ORDER REOPENING CASE until July 26, 2015. Signed by Judge Vince Chhabria on 6/24/2015. (knm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/24/2015)
April 27, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 96 ORDER DISMISSING CASE. Signed by Judge Vince Chhabria on 4/27/2015. (knm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/27/2015)
April 14, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 92 ORDER RE REQUEST FOR FURTHER BRIEFING: Responses due by 4/16/2015. Replies due by 4/20/2015. Signed by Judge Vince Chhabria on 4/14/2015. (knm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/14/2015)
February 11, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 77 Order by Hon. Vince Chhabria granting 76 Stipulation to Continue Summary Judgment Motion Hearing and to Extend Opposition and Reply Deadlines to Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment.(knm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/11/2015)
October 24, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 65 Order as Modified by Hon. Vince Chhabria granting 64 Stipulation to Continue Case Management Conference.(knm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/24/2014)
October 8, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 62 Order by Hon. Vince Chhabria granting 61 Stipulation to Continue the Case Management Conference.(knm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/8/2014)
January 14, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 49 ORDER GRANTING EXTENSION OF TIME TO COMPLETE SERVICE re 47 Letter filed by George Anderson. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 1/14/14. (nahS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/14/2014)
December 19, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 45 REVISED CASE MANAGEMENT AND PRETRIAL ORDER re 41 Motion Hearing, Set Deadlines/Hearings. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 12/19/13. (nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/19/2013)
February 4, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 31 CASE MANAGEMENT AND PRETRIAL ORDER re 30 Case Management Conference - Initial. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 2/4/13. (nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/4/2013)
January 22, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER by Judge Hamilton denying 17 Motion to Dismiss. (pjhlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/22/2013)
October 16, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER APPROVING STIPULATED BRIEFING SCHEDULE re 20 Proposed Order filed by Jose Solis. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 10/16/12. (nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/16/2012)
October 12, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Joint Case Management Statement due by 1/24/2013. Initial Case Management Conference set for 1/31/2013 02:00 PM. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 10/12/12. (nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/12/2012)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Anderson v. Solis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: George Anderson
Represented By: Michael Dennis Meadows
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jose Solis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?