Bauldry v. Town of Danville et al
Plaintiff: Lane Bauldry
Defendant: Town of Danville, County of Contra Costa, City of Piedmont, Mona Daggett, Christopher Butler, Stephen Tanabe, Tom Henderson and Andy Wells
Case Number: 4:2012cv03943
Filed: July 26, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: Oakland Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: Donna M. Ryu
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 22, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 221 ORDER granting 220 request to excuse Thomas Henderson from appearing at settlement conference. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on October 22, 2015. (jcslc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/22/2015)
July 30, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 203 ORDER by Judge Charles R. Breyer granting 198 Motion for Reconsideration and granting partial summary judgment. (crblc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/30/2015)
July 9, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 200 ORDER granting 199 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER to continue opposition and reply deadlines filed by Lane Bauldry. Reset Deadlines as to 198 Amended MOTION for Reconsideration re 197 Joint MOTION for Reconsideration of the Court's Denial of Summary Judgment as to Plaintiff's 4th Amendment Claims, Related Conspiracy Claims, and State Wrongful Arrest Claim Pursuant to FRCP. Responses due by 7/9/2015. Replies due by 7/16/2015. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 7/7/2015. (beS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/9/2015)
April 23, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 187 ORDER GRANTING re 186 Letter filed by Tom Henderson, County of Contra Costa. Signed, as modified, by Judge Joseph C. Spero on 4/23/15. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/23/2015)
February 12, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 181 ORDER by Judge Charles R. Breyer denying 180 Administrative Motion to Set a Special Status Conference. (crblc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/12/2015)
February 3, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 178 REFERRAL ORDER. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 2/3/2015. (crblc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/3/2015)
September 8, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 128 ORDER by Judge Charles R. Breyer granting 127 Stipulation. (crblc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/8/2014)
July 10, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 116 ORDER re 115 Amended Document filed by Lane Bauldry. Reset Deadlines as. Dispositive Motions due by 11/1/2014. Motion Hearing set for 12/12/2014 10:00 AM in Courtroom 6, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Charles R. Breyer, Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 7/10/2014. (beS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/10/2014)
April 2, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 105 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 104 Order on Stipulation. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 4/2/14. (lrcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/2/2014)
April 23, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 66 ORDER by Judge Charles R. Breyer granting in part and denying in part 60 Motion to Dismiss. (crblc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/23/2013)
February 26, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 62 ORDER REGARDING ATTENDANCE AT HEARING. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 2/26/2013. (crblc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/26/2013)
February 12, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 54 ORDER by Judge Susan Illston granting 53 Stipulation. THEREFORE, the Stipulating Parties request that the Court extend the deadline for Daggett to respond to Plaintiffs Second Amended Complaint from February 8, 2013 to, and including, February 22, 2013. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/12/2013)
November 30, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER granting request to extend time to file First Amended Complaint to 12/5/12. Signed by Judge Susan Illston on 11/30/12. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/30/2012)
November 19, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO DISMISS WITH LEAVE TO AMEND 15 (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 11/19/2012)
October 19, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 19 JUDGE ILLSTON'S STANDING ORDER (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/19/2012)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bauldry v. Town of Danville et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lane Bauldry
Represented By: Matthew Daniel Haley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Town of Danville
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: County of Contra Costa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Piedmont
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mona Daggett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christopher Butler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stephen Tanabe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tom Henderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andy Wells
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?