Koehler v. Litehouse, Inc.
Plaintiff: Garrett Koehler
Defendant: Litehouse, Inc.
Case Number: 4:2012cv04055
Filed: August 1, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: Susan Illston
Nature of Suit: Contract Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 23, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ORDER DISMISSING CASE. Signed by Judge Susan Illston on 7/23/13. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/23/2013)
January 17, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER, Case association terminated: Initial Case Management Conference set for 2/1/13 is continued to 3/1/2013 02:30 PM in Courtroom 10, 19th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge Susan Illston on 1/16/13. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/17/2013)
January 9, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER, Motions terminated: 41 STIPULATION and Proposed Order selecting Mediation by Garrett Koehler filed by Garrett Koehler.. Signed by Judge Susan Illston on 1/8/13. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/9/2013)
December 13, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS AND GRANTING DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO STRIKE 24 25 (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 12/13/2012)
September 5, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER Initial Case Management Conference set for 10/5/12 is continued to 2/1/2013 02:30 PM in Courtroom 10, 19th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge Susan Illston on 8/31/12., Motions terminated: 14 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re 13 Clerks Notice, filed by Litehouse, Inc.. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/5/2012)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Koehler v. Litehouse, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Garrett Koehler
Represented By: Benjamin Michael Lopatin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Litehouse, Inc.
Represented By: Joanne Lichtman
Represented By: Hayes F. Michel, Esq.
Represented By: Nicole A. Skolout
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?