Vass v. JP Morgan Chase, NA
Plaintiff: Ira Vass
Defendant: JP Morgan Chase, NA
Case Number: 4:2012cv04094
Filed: August 2, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: Oakland Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: Donna M. Ryu
Nature of Suit: Rent, Lease, and Ejectment
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 31, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE AND CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE Show Cause Response due by 11/15/2012.. Signed by Judge Alsup on 10/31/12. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/31/2012)
October 17, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 20 SECOND ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE Show Cause Response due by 10/29/2012.. Signed by Judge Alsup on 10/17/12. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/17/2012)
September 14, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER, Case reassigned to Hon. William Alsup. Hon. Richard Seeborg no longer assigned to the case.. Signed by Executive Committee on 9/14/12. (ha, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/14/2012)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Vass v. JP Morgan Chase, NA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JP Morgan Chase, NA
Represented By: Jenny Lee Merris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ira Vass
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?