Turner v. J.P. Morgan Chase Bank
Plaintiff: Twialla Turner
Defendant: J.P. Morgan Chase Bank
Case Number: 4:2012cv04161
Filed: August 8, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: Oakland Office
County: Solano
Presiding Judge: Donna M. Ryu
Nature of Suit: Employment
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 31, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER VACATING 16 Order Re Overdue Status Report. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on January 31, 2013. (jswlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/31/2013)
October 2, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER GRANTING 13 Stipulation to Arbitrate and to Stay and Requiring Joint Status Reports. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on October 2, 2012. (jswlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/2/2012)
September 26, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER, Case reassigned to Hon. Jeffrey S. White. Hon. Richard Seeborg no longer assigned to the case.. Signed by Executive Committee on 9/26/12. (ha, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/26/2012)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Turner v. J.P. Morgan Chase Bank
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Twialla Turner
Represented By: Pamela Octavia Pitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J.P. Morgan Chase Bank
Represented By: Jennifer Rose Cotner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?