Aksu v. County of Contra Costa et al

Plaintiff: Hasan Arda Aksu
Defendant: County of Contra Costa, Suzanne Porter and Terrence Thompson
Case Number: 4:2012cv04268
Filed: August 13, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: Oakland Office
County: Contra Costa
Presiding Judge: Donna M. Ryu
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 19, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 130 ORDER for DISMISSAL with prejudice of defendant Stephen Tanabe. (beS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/19/2015)
September 24, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 128 ORDER granting 127 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER DISMISSING DEFENDANTS BUTLER AND CHETCUTI filed by Hasan Arda Aksu. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 9/24/2015. Christopher Butler and Benny Chetcuti, Jr. terminated.(beS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/24/2015)
July 27, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 109 ORDER For Dismissal with Prejudice. Suzanne Porter and Terrence Thompson terminated. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 7/27/2015. (beS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/27/2015)
April 2, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 91 ORDER by Judge Charles R. Breyer denying 78 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment. (crblc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/2/2015)
March 10, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 81 ORDER by Judge Charles R. Breyer denying 76 Motion to Set a Special Status Conference. (crblc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/10/2015)
August 25, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 54 ORDER Re: 53 Stipulated Request to change time of briefing schedule for Defendant Tanabe's Motion for Protective Order. Replies due by 9/26/2014. Responses due by 9/19/2014. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 8/25/2014. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/25/2014)
June 30, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ORDER granting Motions terminated: 49 STIPULATION FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE filed by Hasan Arda Aksu Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 6/30/2014. County of Contra Costa terminated.(beS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/30/2014)
October 26, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 17 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 10 DISMISSAL OF SHERIFF DAVID LIVINGSTON AND DISMISSAL OF CERTAIN CLAIMS AS TO DEFENDANTS COUNTY OF CONTRA COSTA AND STEPHEN TANABE filed by County of Contra Costa. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 10/26/12. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/26/2012)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Aksu v. County of Contra Costa et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hasan Arda Aksu
Represented By: Brian Gearinger
Represented By: R Stephen LaRoe
Represented By: Andrew Charles Schwartz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: County of Contra Costa
Represented By: D. Cameron Baker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Suzanne Porter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Terrence Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?