Board of Trustees, in their capacities as Trustees of the Patterson Vegetable Company and Teamsters Local 948 Health and Welfare Trust v. Patterson Vegetable Company, LLC
Plaintiff: Board of Trustees, in their capacities as Trustees of the Patterson Vegetable Company and Teamsters Local 948 Health and Welfare Trust
Defendant: Patterson Vegetable Company, LLC
Case Number: 4:2012cv04287
Filed: August 16, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: Oakland Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: Donna M. Ryu
Nature of Suit: Employee Retirement Income Security Act of 1974
Cause of Action: 29:1001
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 14, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 33 STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL re 32 Stipulation filed by Board of Trustees, in their capacities as Trustees of the Patterson Vegetable Company and Teamsters Local 948 Health and Welfare Trust. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 8/14/13. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/14/2013)
April 22, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 26 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 25 Order to Continue ADR Phone Conference and CMC deadlines filed by Patterson Vegetable Company, LLC Case Management Statement due by 7/11/2013. Further Case Management Conference set for 7/18/2013 10:30 AM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 4/22/13. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/22/2013) Modified on 4/22/2013 (bpf, COURT STAFF).
January 25, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER RESETTING CMC TO 4/25/13 AT 10:30 A.M. Case Management Statement due by 4/18/2013. Further Case Management Conference set for 4/25/2013 10:30 AM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 1/25/13. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/25/2013)
November 6, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 16 STANDING ORDER. Signed by Judge EDWARD M. CHEN on 11/6/12. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/6/2012)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Board of Trustees, in their capacities as Trustees of the Patterson Vegetable Company and Teamsters Local 948 Health and Welfare Trust v. Patterson Vegetable Company, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Patterson Vegetable Company, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Board of Trustees, in their capacities as Trustees of the Patterson Vegetable Company and Teamsters Local 948 Health and Welfare Trust
Represented By: Ezekiel D. Carder
Represented By: Jordan David Mazur
Represented By: David Albert Rosenfeld
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?