Shafi et al v. United Air Lines, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Areeg Shafi, Rami Shafi, Hadel Shafi and Dannah Shafi
Defendant: United Air Lines, Inc. and United Continental Holdings, Inc.
Case Number: 4:2012cv04451
Filed: August 24, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: Oakland Office
County: San Joaquin
Presiding Judge: Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers
Nature of Suit: Airplane
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 4, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 38 PETITION AND ORDER TO APPROVE COMPROMISE OF DISPUTED CLAIM OF MINOR D.S. re 37 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER. The Court approves the settlement. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 10/04/2013. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/4/2013)
August 19, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER OF DISMISSAL UPON SETTLEMENT. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 08/19/2013. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/19/2013)
August 9, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 33 STIPULATION AND ORDER REGARDING DISMISSAL, WITH PREJUDICE, OF CLAIM OF PLAINTIFF HADEL SHAFI ONLY re 32 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 08/09/2013. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/9/2013)
May 15, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER GRANTING UNOPPOSED MOTION FOR ADMINISTRATIVE RELIEF FOR CONTINUANCE OF CERTAIN PRETRIAL DATES [AS MODIFIED BY THE COURT] re 27 Ex Parte MOTION to Continue Certain Pre-Trial Deadlines filed by United Air Lines, Inc., United Continen tal Holdings, Inc., ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge for Settlement Conference to be completed by August 9, 2013. Non-Expert Discovery due by 11/8/2013. Dispositive Motions filed by 12/10/13. Case Management Conference set fo r 12/9/2013 02:00 PM in Courtroom 5, 2nd Floor, Oakland. Final Pretrial Conference set for Friday, 4/18/2014 09:00 AM. Jury Selection set for 5/5/2014 08:30 AM in Courtroom 5, 2nd Floor, Oakland before Hon. Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers. 5 Day Jury Tria l set for 5/5/2014 08:30 AM in Courtroom 5, 2nd Floor, Oakland before Hon. Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers. Dispositive Motion Hearing set for 1/14/2014 02:00 PM in Courtroom 5, 2nd Floor, Oakland before Hon. Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers. Compliance Hearing set for Friday, 3/28/2014 09:01 AM in Courtroom 5, 2nd Floor, Oakland before Hon. Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 5/15/13. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/15/2013)
January 15, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 24 CASE MANAGEMENT AND PRETRIAL ORDER. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 1/15/13. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/15/2013)
November 26, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER SEALING APPLICATION FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM ON THE COURT'S OWN MOTION AND GRANTING APPLICATION re 16 MOTION to Appoint Guardian ad Litem filed by Areeg Shafi, Hadel Shafi, Dannah Shafi, Rami Shafi. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 11/26/12. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/26/2012)
October 1, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers denying 4 Motion to Appoint Guardian Ad Litem for Dannah Shafi, without Prejudice. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/1/2012)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Shafi et al v. United Air Lines, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United Air Lines, Inc.
Represented By: Richard Grotch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United Continental Holdings, Inc.
Represented By: Richard Grotch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Areeg Shafi
Represented By: David G Yen
Represented By: Robert E. Cartwright, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rami Shafi
Represented By: Robert E. Cartwright, Jr.
Represented By: David G Yen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hadel Shafi
Represented By: David G Yen
Represented By: Robert E. Cartwright, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dannah Shafi
Represented By: David G Yen
Represented By: Robert E. Cartwright, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?