Equal Employment Opportunity Commission v. United Parcel Service Inc.
Plaintiff: Equal Employment Opportunity Commission
Defendant: United Parcel Service Inc.
Case Number: 4:2012cv04723
Filed: September 11, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: Oakland Office
County: San Mateo
Presiding Judge: Donna M. Ryu
Nature of Suit: Employment
Cause of Action: 42:2000
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 16, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER GRANTING 29 STIPULATION TO EXTEND DEADLINE FOR CONDUCTING MEDIATION. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on May 16, 2013. (jswlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/16/2013)
April 1, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER SCHEDULING TRIAL AND PRETRIAL MATTERS. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 4/1/13. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/1/2013)
January 16, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER GRANTING AS AMENDED 18 Stipulation to Continue Case Management Dates and Conference. Case Management Statement due by 3/15/2013. Case Management Conference set for 3/29/2013 01:30 PM in Courtroom 11, 19th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on January 16, 2013. (jswlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/16/2013)
January 14, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER GRANTING 16 STIPULATION selecting Mediation. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 1/14/13. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/14/2013)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Equal Employment Opportunity Commission v. United Parcel Service Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United Parcel Service Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Equal Employment Opportunity Commission
Represented By: Cindy O'Hara
Represented By: Jonathan T. Peck
Represented By: William Robert Tamayo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?