Irving v. Liberty Life Assurance Company of Boston et al
Plaintiff: Thomas Irving
Defendant: Liberty Life Assurance Company of Boston and Group Long Term Disability Plan for Employees of Comcast Corporation
Case Number: 4:2012cv04792
Filed: September 13, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: Oakland Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: Kandis A. Westmore
Nature of Suit: Other Labor Litigation
Cause of Action: 28:1132
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 20, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER GRANTING STIPULATED DISMISSAL by Hon. William Alsup granting 24 Stipulation.(whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/20/2013)
February 7, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER RE NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT [re 19 Notice (Other) filed by Liberty Life Assurance Company of Boston, Group Long Term Disability Plan for Employees of Comcast Corporation]. Signed by Judge William Alsup on 2/7/2013. (whasec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/7/2013)
January 14, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE [re 15 Case Management Statement filed by Liberty Life Assurance Company of Boston]. Case Management Statement due by 1/24/2013. Case Management Conference set for 1/31/2013 11:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge William Alsup on 1/14/2013. (whasec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/14/2013)
January 9, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER DENYING EX PARTE APPLICATION TO CONTINUE CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE by Hon. William Alsup [denying 10 Ex Parte Application].(whasec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/9/2013)
December 18, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 9 SUPPLEMENTAL ORDER TO ORDER SETTING INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE re 8 Clerks Notice. Signed by Judge William Alsup on 10/16/12. (dt, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/18/2012)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Irving v. Liberty Life Assurance Company of Boston et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thomas Irving
Represented By: Emily A. Bolt
Represented By: James Pieper Keenley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Liberty Life Assurance Company of Boston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Group Long Term Disability Plan for Employees of Comcast Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?