Whitehead v. Simm Associates, Inc.
Plaintiff: Sylvia Whitehead
Defendant: Simm Associates, Inc.
Case Number: 4:2012cv05158
Filed: October 4, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: Oakland Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: Donna M. Ryu
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1692 Fair Debt Collection Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 21, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER re 17 Notice of Settlement filed by Sylvia Whitehead. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 03/21/2013. (dmrlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/21/2013)
February 28, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER to File Amended Motion for Default Judgment. Motions terminated: 14 MOTION for Default Judgment filed by Sylvia Whitehead. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 02/28/2013. (dmrlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/28/2013)
February 11, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER re 11 Status Report filed by Sylvia Whitehead. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 02/11/2013. (dmrlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/11/2013)
January 3, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER Vacating Case Management Conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 01/03/13. (dmrlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/3/2013)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Whitehead v. Simm Associates, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sylvia Whitehead
Represented By: G. Thomas Martin, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Simm Associates, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?