Baptiste v. LIDS et al
Plaintiff: Christian Ruiz Baptiste
Defendant: LIDS, Hat World, Inc., Genesco, Inc. and Michael Samoon
Case Number: 4:2012cv05209
Filed: October 9, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: Oakland Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: Phyllis J. Hamilton
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1981 Job Discrimination (Race)
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 28, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 173 ORDER by Judge Hamilton denying 140 Motion to Vacate Judgment (pjhlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/28/2014)
April 4, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 168 ORDER VACATING HEARING DATE. Signed by Judge Hamilton on 4/4/2014. (pjhlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/4/2014)
February 5, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 131 ORDER by Judge Hamilton granting 63 Motion for Summary Judgment; granting 64 Motion for Summary Judgment; denying 114 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal; denying 125 Motion for Leave to File (pjhlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/5/2014)
October 29, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 60 Discovery Order Re Return of Email Messages Produced by OSH 54 58 . Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 10/29/2013. (mejlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/29/2013)
October 28, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 57 ORDER by Judge Maria-Elena James denying 56 Discovery Letter Brief (mejlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/28/2013)
October 18, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 49 DISCOVERY ORDER by Judge Maria-Elena James granting Defendant's request to compel Plaintiff to execute release of medical records 32 (mejlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/18/2013)
September 19, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 26 Discovery Order, Motions terminated: 24 MOTION to Quash Subpoenas to Third Parties or, Alternatively, for Protective Order. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 9/19/2013. (mejlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/19/2013)
February 20, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 19 CASE MANAGEMENT AND PRETRIAL ORDER re 18 Case Management Conference - Initial. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 2/20/13. (nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/20/2013)
November 9, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Joint Case Management Statement due by 2/7/2013. Initial Case Management Conference set for 2/14/2013 02:00 PM. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 11/9/12. (nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/9/2012)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Baptiste v. LIDS et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LIDS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hat World, Inc.
Represented By: Eric Meckley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Genesco, Inc.
Represented By: Eric Meckley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Samoon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christian Ruiz Baptiste
Represented By: Megan A Shapiro
Represented By: Frank Mathew Radoslovich
Represented By: Derek Charles Decker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?