California Service Employees Health & Welfare Trust Fund et al v. Paramount Building Solutions, LLC et al
Plaintiff: California Service Employees Health & Welfare Trust Fund, Mike Garcia, Charles Gilchrist, David Stilwell, Raymond C. Nann and Larry T. Smith
Defendant: Paramount Building Solutions, LLC, JMS Building Solutions, LLC and DCSS Investments, Inc.
Case Number: 4:2012cv05232
Filed: October 9, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: Oakland Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: Donna M. Ryu
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 1132 E.R.I.S.A.: Employee Benefits
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 17, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER GRANTING STIPULATED DISMISSAL OF DEFENDANTS PARAMOUNT AND JMS by Hon. William Alsup granting 29 Stipulation.(whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/17/2013)
March 29, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER GRANTING STIPULATION by Hon. William Alsup granting 20 Stipulation.(whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/29/2013)
March 20, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 19 STIPULATION FOR VOLUNTARYDISMISSAL AS TO DEFENDANTDCSS INVESTMENTS, INC., ONLY; by Hon. William Alsup granting 18 Stipulation.(whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/20/2013)
March 14, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 16 SUPPLEMENTAL ORDER TO ORDER SETTING INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Signed by Judge William Alsup on 10/16/12. (dt, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/14/2013)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: California Service Employees Health & Welfare Trust Fund et al v. Paramount Building Solutions, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: California Service Employees Health & Welfare Trust Fund
Represented By: Philip M. Miller
Represented By: Kimberly Anne Hancock
Represented By: Anne M. Bevington
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mike Garcia
Represented By: Philip M. Miller
Represented By: Kimberly Anne Hancock
Represented By: Anne M. Bevington
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charles Gilchrist
Represented By: Anne M. Bevington
Represented By: Kimberly Anne Hancock
Represented By: Philip M. Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Stilwell
Represented By: Anne M. Bevington
Represented By: Kimberly Anne Hancock
Represented By: Philip M. Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Raymond C. Nann
Represented By: Anne M. Bevington
Represented By: Kimberly Anne Hancock
Represented By: Philip M. Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Larry T. Smith
Represented By: Anne M. Bevington
Represented By: Kimberly Anne Hancock
Represented By: Philip M. Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paramount Building Solutions, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JMS Building Solutions, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DCSS Investments, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?