Sims v. WorldPac, Inc.
Plaintiff: Steve Sims
Defendant: WorldPac, Inc.
Case Number: 4:2012cv05275
Filed: October 12, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: Jeffrey S. White
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28:1441 Petition for Removal - Employment Discrimination
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 19, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 65 ORDER GRANTING 46 Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on August 19, 2014. (jswlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/19/2014)
July 10, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 64 ORDER STIPULATION 63 to Continue Expert Discovery Cutoff. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on July 10, 2014. (jswlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/10/2014)
June 16, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 62 ORDER VACATING HEARING. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 6/16/14. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/16/2014)
March 17, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 54 ORDER GRANTING 53 STIPULATION to Continue Hearing on Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment. Motion Hearing set for 6/20/2014 09:00 AM in Courtroom 5, 2nd Floor, Oakland before Hon. Jeffrey S. White. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 3/17/14. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/17/2014)
September 23, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER GRANTING AS MODIFIED 42 STIPULATION To Continue Trial Date and Pre-Trial Deadlines. Discovery due by 2/7/2014. Expert Witness List due by 3/7/2014. Jury Selection set for 7/30/2014 08:00 AM in Courtroom 11, 19th Floor, San Francisco be fore Hon. Jeffrey S. White. Jury Trial set for 8/4/2014 08:00 AM in Courtroom 11, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Jeffrey S. White. Motion Hearing set for 3/28/2014 09:00 AM in Courtroom 11, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Jeffrey S. White. Pretrial Conference set for 7/14/2014 02:00 PM in Courtroom 11, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Jeffrey S. White.. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 9/23/13. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/23/2013)
June 19, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 39 Order by Magistrate Judge Nathanael M. Cousins granting in part and denying in part 32 Motion to Compel. (nclc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/19/2013)
April 23, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER GRANTING 30 Stipulated Protective Order. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 4/23/13. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/23/2013)
February 22, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER by Judge Jeffrey S. White DENYING 17 Motion to Dismiss. (jswlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/22/2013)
February 11, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER SCHEDULING TRIAL AND PRETRIAL MATTERS. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 2/11/13. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/11/2013)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sims v. WorldPac, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steve Sims
Represented By: Mary Delia Walsh
Represented By: Nancy E. Pritikin
Represented By: Jessica Lynn Marinelli
Represented By: Matthew Alan Mallet
Represented By: Kirk B. Freeman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WorldPac, Inc.
Represented By: Jessica Lynn Marinelli
Represented By: Matthew Alan Mallet
Represented By: Kirk B. Freeman
Represented By: Mary Delia Walsh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?