Craigslist, Inc. v. Papp
Plaintiff: Craigslist, Inc.
Defendant: Michael James Papp
Case Number: 4:2012cv05276
Filed: October 12, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: Oakland Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: Donna M. Ryu
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Other Contract
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
December 3, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 37 CONSENT JUDGMENT in favor of Craigslist, Inc. against Michael James Papp. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 12/3/2013. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/3/2013)
August 13, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER to Submit Status Report by 10/9/13. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 08/13/13. (dmrlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/13/2013)
May 30, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER Granting Plaintiff Leave to Serve Amended Subpoenas. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 05/30/2013. (dmrlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/30/2013)
May 10, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER re 18 Plaintiff's Second Proposed Discovery Plan. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 05/10/2013. (dmrlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/10/2013)
April 18, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER re 17 MOTION to Amend/Correct Complaint filed by Craigslist, Inc. Plaintiff shall submit proposed amended complaint by 4/30/13. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 04/18/2013. (dmrlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/18/2013)
February 5, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 15 Order by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu regarding 14 Plaintiff's Proposed Discovery Plan.(dmrlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/5/2013)
January 3, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER to Submit Proposed Discovery Plan re 10 MOTION Plaintiff craigslist Inc.'s Administrative Request Pursuant to Local Rule 7-11 for Leave to Conduct Damages Discovery filed by Craigslist, Inc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 01/03/2013. (dmrlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/3/2013)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Craigslist, Inc. v. Papp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Craigslist, Inc.
Represented By: Brian Patrick Hennessy
Represented By: James Patrick Corrigan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael James Papp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?