Hoffman v. Hartford Life and Accident Insurance Company et al
Plaintiff: Elizabeth Hoffman
Defendant: Hartford Life and Accident Insurance Company and Group Long Term Disability Plan for Employees of Davita, Inc.
Case Number: 4:2012cv05350
Filed: October 17, 2012
Court: U.S. District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: Oakland Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: Saundra Brown Armstrong
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 1132 E.R.I.S.A.: Employee Benefits
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 29, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER DISMISSING CASE. Signed by Judge ARMSTRONG on 4/29/13. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/29/2013)
March 21, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER re 25 Stipulation, filed by Hartford Life and Accident Insurance Company, Elizabeth Hoffman. Signed by Judge ARMSTRONG on 3/21/13. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/21/2013)
February 13, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER by Judge ARMSTRONG granting 23 Stipulation (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/13/2013)
January 2, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 18 STIPULATION AND ORDER, Case referred to Private ADR.. Signed by Judge ARMSTRONG on 1/2/13. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/2/2013)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hoffman v. Hartford Life and Accident Insurance Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elizabeth Hoffman
Represented By: Lisa A. Martinez
Represented By: Susan Borondia Grabarsky
Represented By: Frank N. Darras
Represented By: Phillip S Bather
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hartford Life and Accident Insurance Company
Represented By: Edith Sanchez Shea
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Group Long Term Disability Plan for Employees of Davita, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?