Golden Eagle Insurance Corporation et al v. Moon Marine (U.S.A.) Corporation
Plaintiff: General Insurance Company of America and Golden Eagle Insurance Corporation
Defendant: Moon Marine (U.S.A.) Corporation
Case Number: 4:2012cv05438
Filed: October 22, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Santa Clara
Presiding Judge: Donna M. Ryu
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Insurance Contract
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
November 15, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 68 ORDER DENYING 58 MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT by Hon. William Alsup.(whalc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/15/2013)
October 22, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 62 ORDER GRANTING IN PART 61 DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO SEAL by Hon. William Alsup.(whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/22/2013)
May 14, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 54 ORDER SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT HEARING (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/14/2013)
May 7, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 51 ORDER RE: ATTENDANCE AT MEDIATION. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 5/7/2013. (cdnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/7/2013)
February 14, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER DENYING MOTION TO INTERVENE by Judge William Alsup [denying 34 Motion to Intervene]. (whasec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/14/2013)
January 22, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 41 AMENDED ORDER GRANTING IN PART DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO STAY AND VACATING HEARING [re 40 Order on Motion to Dismiss]. Signed by Judge William Alsup on 1/22/2013. (whasec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/22/2013)
December 19, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 23 SUPPLEMENTAL ORDER TO ORDER SETTING INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE re 22 Clerks Notice. Signed by Judge William Alsup on 10/16/12. (dt, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/19/2012)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Golden Eagle Insurance Corporation et al v. Moon Marine (U.S.A.) Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: General Insurance Company of America
Represented By: Paul J Fraidenburgh
Represented By: Kelley Kurtis Beck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Golden Eagle Insurance Corporation
Represented By: Paul J Fraidenburgh
Represented By: Kelley Kurtis Beck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Moon Marine (U.S.A.) Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?