Rovio Entertainment LTD v. Royal Plush Toys, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Rovio Entertainment Ltd
Defendant: Western Sales and Services Inc., Royal Trade Int'l Inc., President Jong K. Park and Royal Plush Toys, Inc.
Not Classified By Court: US Department of Justice
Case Number: 4:2012cv05543
Filed: October 29, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: Oakland Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: Saundra Brown Armstrong
Referring Judge: Laurel Beeler
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 26, 2016. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 26, 2016 Filing 126 Mail sent to Jong K. Park returned as undeliverable - attempted not know. Unable to forward re #125 Order on Ex Parte Application. (jlmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/26/2016)
June 9, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 125 ORDER by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong granting #124 Amended Ex Parte Application for Order to Return Bond. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/9/2016)
June 7, 2016 Filing 124 Amended Ex Parte Application for Order to Return Bond filed by Rovio Entertainment Ltd. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Drangel, Jason) (Filed on 6/7/2016)
November 4, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 123 Order by Hon. Saundra Brown Armstrong granting #122 Plaintiff's Ex Parte Application to Return Bond.(tmiS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/4/2015)
November 4, 2015 Filing 122 Ex Parte MOTION for Order to Return Bond re #28 Order, #29 Receipt, filed by Rovio Entertainment Ltd. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Drangel, Jason) (Filed on 11/4/2015) Modified on 11/5/2015 (jlmS, COURT STAFF).
February 11, 2015 Filing 121 NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF JUDGMENT DEBTOR'S EXAMINATION SET FOR FEBRUARY 23, 2015 AS TO JONG K. PARK, PRESIDENT OF JUDGMENT DEBTORS ROYAL PLUSH TOYS, INC., WESTERN SALES AND SERVICES INC., and ROYAL TRADE INTERNATIONAL INC., filed by Rovio Entertainment Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Guerrini, John) (Filed on 2/11/2015) Modified on 2/12/2015 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
February 11, 2015 Filing 120 NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF JUDGMENT DEBTOR'S EXAMINATION SET FOR FEBRUARY 23, 2015 AS TO JUDGMENT DEBTOR JONG K. PARK, filed by Rovio Entertainment Ltd. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Guerrini, John) (Filed on 2/11/2015) Modified on 2/12/2015 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
January 6, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 119 ORDER for Appearance of Jong K. Park, President of Judgment Debtors, Royal Plush Toys, Inc., Western Sales and Services, Inc., and Royal Trade International, Inc., at Judgment Debtor's Examination. Signed by Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler on 1/5/2015. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(mklS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/6/2015) Modified on 1/6/2015 (mklS, COURT STAFF).
January 6, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 118 ORDER for Appearance of Judgment Debtor Jong K. Park at Judgment Debtor's Examination. Signed by Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler on 1/5/2015. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(mklS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/6/2015)
December 24, 2014 Filing 117 NOTICE of Continuance re 115 Judgment Debtor's Examination as to Jong K. Park, President of Judgment Debtors, filed by Rovio Entertainment Ltd (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Guerrini, John) (Filed on 12/24/2014) Modified on 12/29/2014 (jlmS, COURT STAFF).
December 24, 2014 Filing 116 NOTICE of Continuance re 115 Judgment Debtor Exam, filed by Rovio Entertainment Ltd (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Guerrini, John) (Filed on 12/24/2014) Modified on 12/29/2014 (jlmS, COURT STAFF).
December 17, 2014 Filing 115 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler: Judgment Debtor Exam held on 12/17/2014. Further Judgment Debtor Exam set for 2/23/2015 02:00 PM in Courtroom C, 15th Floor, San Francisco. Debtor Jong K. Park sworn. FTR Time: 9:16-9:17. Plaintiff Attorney Robert F. Cohen. Debtor: Jong K. Park (pro se). This is a text only Minute Entry.(lsS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 12/17/2014)
December 9, 2014 Filing 114 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Rovio Entertainment Ltd re #109 Order on Motion to Continue, (Guerrini, John) (Filed on 12/9/2014)
December 9, 2014 Filing 113 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Rovio Entertainment Ltd re #110 Order on Motion to Continue, (Guerrini, John) (Filed on 12/9/2014)
December 1, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 112 RELATED CASE ORDER. Signed by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong on 12/1/2014. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/1/2014)
November 21, 2014 Filing 111 NOTICE of Related Case in a Criminal Action CR-14-526-JD, filed by US Department of Justice. (Knight, Susan) (Filed on 11/21/2014) Modified on 11/24/2014 (kcS, COURT STAFF). Modified on 11/25/2014 (jlmS, COURT STAFF).
November 10, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 110 ORDER CONTINUING JUDGMENT DEBTOR'S EXAMINATION AS TO JONG K. PARK, PRESIDENT OF JUDGMENT DEBTORS ROYAL PLUSH TOYS, INC., WESTERN SALES AND SERVICES INC., and ROYAL TRADE INTERNATIONAL, INC. by Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler. Granting #108 Motion to Continue. Debtors Examination set for December 17, 2014 at 9:00 a.m. (lsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/10/2014)
November 10, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 109 ORDER CONTINUING JUDGMENT DEBTOR'S EXAMINATION OF JUDGMENT DEBTOR JONG K. PARK by Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler: Granting #107 Motion to Continue. Debtor Examination set for December 17, 2014 at 9:00 a.m. (lsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/10/2014)
November 10, 2014 Set/Reset Hearing Re: #110 Order on Motion to Continue; Re: #109 Order on Motion to Continue. Judgment Debtor Exam set for 12/17/2014 at 9:00 AM in Courtroom C, 15th Floor, San Francisco. (lsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/10/2014)
November 6, 2014 Filing 108 MOTION to Continue Judgment Debtor's Examination set for hearing on November 10, 2014 as to Jong K. Park, President of Judgment Debtors Royal Plush Toys, Inc., Western Sales and Services Inc., and Royal Trade International Inc., filed by Rovio Entertainment Ltd. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Guerrini, John) (Filed on 11/6/2014) Modified on 11/7/2014 (jlmS, COURT STAFF).
November 6, 2014 Filing 107 MOTION to Continue Judgment Debtor's Examination set for hearing on November 10, 2014 as to Judgment Debtor Jong K. Park, filed by Rovio Entertainment Ltd. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Guerrini, John) (Filed on 11/6/2014) Modified on 11/7/2014 (jlmS, COURT STAFF).
November 5, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 106 ORDER by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong DENYING #105 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal. Signed by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong, on 11/5/14 (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/5/2014) Modified on 11/6/2014 (jlmS, COURT STAFF).
October 10, 2014 Filing 105 Ex Parte Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by Rovio Entertainment Ltd. (Attachments: #1 Motion #1 - Memorandum, #2 Motion #1 - Declaration, #3 Motion #1 - Proposed Order, #4 Motion #2 - Motion, #5 Motion #2 - Proposed Order, #6 Motion #3 - Motion/Memorandum, #7 Motion #3 - Proposed Order, #8 Motion #4 - Motion, #9 Motion #4 - Memorandum, #10 Motion #4 - Declaration #1, #11 Motion #4 - Declaration #1 - Exhibit A, #12 Motion #4 - Declaration #1 - Exhibit B, #13 Motion #4 - Declaration #1 - Exhibit C, #14 Motion #4 - Declaration #1 - Exhibit D, #15 Motion #4 - Declaration #1 - Exhibit E, #16 Motion #4 - Declaration #1 - Exhibit F, #17 Motion #4 - Declaration #1 - Exhibit G, #18 Motion #4 - Declaration #1 - Exhibit H, #19 Motion #4 - Declaration #2, #20 Motion #4 - Declaration #2 - Exhibit A, #21 Motion #4 - Declaration #2 - Exhibit B, #22 Motion #4 - Declaration #2 - Exhibit C, #23 Motion #4 - Proposed Order)(Drangel, Jason) (Filed on 10/10/2014)
August 15, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 104 ORDER FOR APPEARANCE OF JUDGMENT DEBTOR JONG K. PARK AT JUDGMENT DEBTOR'S EXAMINATION by Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler: Granting #102 Motion for Judgment Debtor Exam. Judgment Debtor Exam set for 11/10/2014 at 9:00 AM in Courtroom C, 15th Floor, San Francisco. (lsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/15/2014)
August 15, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 103 ORDER FOR APPEARANCE OF JONG K. PARK, PRESIDENT OF JUDGMENT DEBTORS, ROYAL PLUSH TOYS, INC., WESTERN SALES AND SERVICES INC., AND ROYAL TRADE INTERNATIONAL INC., AT JUDGMENT DEBTOR'S EXAMINATION by Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler: Granting #101 Motion for Judgment Debtor Exam. Judgment Debtor Exam set for 11/10/2014 at 9:00 AM in Courtroom C, 15th Floor, San Francisco. (lsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/15/2014)
August 12, 2014 Filing 102 MOTION for Judgment Debtor Exam for Jong K. Park, filed by Rovio Entertainment Ltd. Motion Hearing set for 11/10/2014 09:00 AM in Courtroom C, 15th Floor, San Francisco before Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler. Responses due by 8/26/2014. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Proposed Order)(Guerrini, John) (Filed on 8/12/2014) Modified on 8/13/2014 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
August 12, 2014 Filing 101 MOTION for Judgment Debtor Exam for Jong K. Park, President of Judgment Debtors Royal Plush Toys, Inc., Western Sales and Services Inc., and Royal Trade International Inc., filed by Rovio Entertainment Ltd. Motion Hearing set for 11/10/2014 09:00 AM in Courtroom C, 15th Floor, San Francisco before Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler. Responses due by 8/26/2014. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Proposed Order)(Guerrini, John) (Filed on 8/12/2014) Modified on 8/13/2014 (jlm, COURT STAFF). Modified on 8/13/2014 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
July 31, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 100 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Beeler for Post Judgment/Collections Re: #98 , #99 MOTIONS for Judgment Debtor Exam. Signed by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong on 7/31/2014. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/31/2014)
July 30, 2014 Filing 99 MOTION for Judgment Debtor Exam as to Defendants Jong K. Park, Royal Plush Toys, Inc., Royal Trade Int'l Inc., Western Sales and Services Inc., filed by Rovio Entertainment Ltd. Responses due by 8/13/2014. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Proposed Order)(Guerrini, John) (Filed on 7/30/2014) Modified on 7/31/2014 (jlmS, COURT STAFF). Modified on 7/31/2014 (jlmS, COURT STAFF).
July 30, 2014 Filing 98 MOTION for Judgment Debtor Exam as to Defendant Jong K. Park, filed by Rovio Entertainment Ltd. Responses due by 8/13/2014. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Proposed Order)(Guerrini, John) (Filed on 7/30/2014) Modified on 7/31/2014 (jlmS, COURT STAFF). Modified on 7/31/2014 (jlmS, COURT STAFF).
June 2, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 97 ORDER by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong DENYING #94 MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service) (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/2/2014)
April 30, 2014 Filing 96 ABSTRACT OF JUDGMENT ISSUED as to Defendants Royal Plush Toys, Inc., Western Sales and Services Inc., Royal Trade International Inc., and President Jong K. Park, in the amount of $700,000. (jlmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/30/2014)
April 15, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 95 ORDER signed by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong on 4/14/2014 Granting #90 Motion for Order for Service of Process by Registered Process Server. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service) (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/15/2014)
April 11, 2014 Filing 94 MOTION for New Trial/De Novo Determination, filed by Jong K. Park. Responses due by 4/25/2014. Replies due by 5/2/2014. (jlmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/11/2014)
April 8, 2014 Filing 93 WRIT OF EXECUTION ISSUED in favor of Plaintiff and against Defendants: Royal Plush Toys, Inc., Western Sales and Services Inc., Royal Trade International Inc., and President Jong K. Park, in the amount of $700,000. (jlmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/8/2014)
April 8, 2014 Filing 92 ABSTRACT OF JUDGMENT ISSUED against Defendants Royal Plush Toys, Inc., Western Sales and Services Inc., Royal Trade International Inc., and President Jong K. Park, in the amount of $700,000. (jlmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/8/2014)
April 4, 2014 Filing 91 Affidavit and REQUEST for Issuance of Writ of Execution, filed by Rovio Entertainment Ltd. (jlmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/4/2014) Modified on 4/8/2014 (jlmS, COURT STAFF). Modified on 4/9/2014 (jlmS, COURT STAFF).
April 4, 2014 Filing 90 MOTION for Order for Service of Process by Registered Process Server, filed by Rovio Entertainment Ltd. Responses due by 4/18/2014. Replies due by 4/25/2014. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(jlmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/4/2014)
March 26, 2014 Filing 89 NOTICE OF ASSOCIATION OF COUNSEL as to John D. Guerrini and The Guerrini Law Firm, filed by Rovio Entertainment Ltd. (Drangel, Jason) (Filed on 3/26/2014) Modified on 3/27/2014 (jlmS, COURT STAFF).
March 21, 2014 Filing 88 REPORT on the determination of an action regarding TRADEMARK AND COPYRIGHT INFRINGEMENT (cc: form mailed to register). (Attachments: #1 Report and Recommendation, #2 Order Adopting Report and Recommendation, #3 Clerk's Judgment)(jlmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/21/2014)
March 20, 2014 Filing 87 CLERK'S JUDGMENT (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service) (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/20/2014)
March 20, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 86 ORDER by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong adopting #55 Report and Recommendations. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service) (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/20/2014)
March 14, 2014 Filing 85 CLERKS NOTICE. Case Management Statement due by 3/27/2014. Case Management Conference set for 4/3/2014 02:30 PM. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service) (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/14/2014)
January 17, 2014 Filing 84 CLERKS NOTICE CONTINUING TELEPHONIC CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Case Management Statement due by 3/13/2014. Telephonic Case Management Conference set for 3/20/2014 02:30 PM. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service) (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/17/2014)
November 27, 2013 Filing 83 CLERKS NOTICE CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Case Management Statement due by 1/22/2014. Case Management Conference set for 1/29/2014 02:30 PM. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service) (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/27/2013)
October 28, 2013 Filing 82 CLERKS NOTICE CONTINUING TELEPHONIC CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Case Management Statement due by 12/5/2013. Telephonic Case Management Conference set for 12/12/2013 02:45 PM. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service) (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/28/2013)
October 22, 2013 Filing 81 JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT and Proposed Order, filed by Jong K. Park, Rovio Entertainment Ltd, Royal Plush Toys, Inc., Royal Trade Int'l Inc.. (Drangel, Jason) (Filed on 10/22/2013) Modified on 10/23/2013 (jlmS, COURT STAFF).
October 11, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 80 ORDER by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong Granting #79 Motion to Substitute Attorney. Attorney Nicole Lynn Drey terminated. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service) (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/11/2013)
October 10, 2013 Filing 79 MOTION to Substitute Attorney, filed by Rovio Entertainment Ltd. (Attachments: #1 [Proposed] Order)(Wang, Annie) (Filed on 10/10/2013) Modified on 10/11/2013 (jlmS, COURT STAFF).
October 8, 2013 Filing 78 Revised COUNTERCLAIM and Request for Answer against Rovio Entertainment Ltd., Filed by Jong K. Park. (jlmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/8/2013)
September 25, 2013 Filing 77 ANSWER TO COUNTERCLAIM #76 Counterclaim byRovio Entertainment Ltd. (Drangel, Jason) (Filed on 9/25/2013)
September 6, 2013 Filing 76 COUNTERCLAIM against Rovio Entertainment Ltd. Filed by Jong K. Park. (jlm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/6/2013)
August 27, 2013 Filing 75 CLERKS NOTICE CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Case Management Statement due by 10/24/2013. Telephonic Case Management Conference set for 10/31/2013 02:30 PM. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service) (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/27/2013)
August 27, 2013 Filing 74 ***DISREGARD, SEE DOCKET NO. #75 .*** CLERKS NOTICE CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Case Management Statement due by 10/24/2013. Telephonic Case Management Conference set for 10/31/2013 02:30 PM. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service) (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/27/2013) Modified on 8/28/2013 (ndr, COURT STAFF).
August 21, 2013 Filing 73 JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT AND PROPOSED ORDER, filed by Rovio Entertainment Ltd., Jong K. Park (Drangel, Jason) (Filed on 8/21/2013) Modified on 8/22/2013 (jlmS, COURT STAFF).
July 24, 2013 Set Deadlines/Hearings: re #71 Order. Joint Case Management Statement due by 8/21/2013. (jlm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/24/2013)
July 24, 2013 Filing 72 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE re #71 Case Management Scheduling Order (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/24/2013)
July 24, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 71 CASE MANAGEMENT SCHEDULING ORDER: Case Management Conference set for 8/28/2013 02:45 PM. VIA TELEPHONE.. Signed by Judge ARMSTRONG on 7/23/13. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/24/2013)
June 26, 2013 Filing 70 REPLY to #55 Report and Recommendation to Motion for Default Judgment by the Court as to Defendants, filed by Jong K. Park. (jlm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/26/2013)
June 24, 2013 Filing 69 Reply to #65 Second Supplemental Brief in Support of Motion for Defaults and Judgment, filed by Jong K. Park. (jlm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/24/2013)
June 24, 2013 Filing 68 Reply to Claim Amount of Plaintiff and Reply to Declaration of Sean Reidy, filed by Jong K. Park. (jlm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/24/2013) Modified on 6/25/2013 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
June 24, 2013 Filing 67 Reply to #55 Report and Recommendations Motion for Default Judgment by the Court as to Defendants, filed by Jong K. Park. (jlm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/24/2013)
June 19, 2013 Filing 66 REPLY to Claim Amount of Plaintiff, and REPLY to Declaration of Sean Reidy, filed by Jong K. Park. (jlm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/19/2013) Modified on 6/24/2013 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
June 19, 2013 Filing 65 Second Supplemental Brief in Support re #45 Motion for Default Judgment by the Court as to Defendants and Sanctions for Violation of Preliminary Injunction and Discovery Order, filed by Rovio Entertainment Ltd. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Jason M. Drangel in Support of Plaintiff's Second Supplemental Filing In Support of its Motion For Default Judgment and Sanctions for Violation of Preliminary Injunction and Discovery Orders, #2 Exhibit A to the Declaration of Jason M. Drangel)(Related document(s) #45 ) (Drangel, Jason) (Filed on 6/19/2013) Modified on 6/20/2013 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
June 13, 2013 Filing 64 REPLY to #55 Report and Recommendations as to Motion for Default Judgment, filed by Jong K. Park. (jlm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/13/2013)
June 10, 2013 Filing 63 Email from J. K. Park. (ls, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/10/2013)
June 10, 2013 Filing 62 Supplemental Brief re #45 MOTION for Default Judgment by the Court as to Defendants filed byRovio Entertainment Ltd. (Attachments: #1 Declaration In Support of Plaintiff's Motion for Default Judgment and Sanctions For Violation of Preliminary Injunction)(Related document(s) #45 ) (Drangel, Jason) (Filed on 6/10/2013)
June 3, 2013 Filing 61 Email from J. K. Park. (ls, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/3/2013)
June 3, 2013 Filing 60 Email from J. K. Park. (ls, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/3/2013)
June 3, 2013 Filing 59 Email from J. K. Park. (ls, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/3/2013)
June 3, 2013 Filing 58 Email from J.K. Park. (ls, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/3/2013)
May 31, 2013 Filing 57 Email from J.K. Park. (ls, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/31/2013)
May 30, 2013 Filing 56 Minute Entry: Motion Hearing held on 5/30/2013 before Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler (Date Filed: 5/30/2013) re #45 MOTION for Default Judgment by the Court as to Defendants filed by Rovio Entertainment Ltd. (Recording #FTR: 10:53-10:53; 11:23-11:24) (ls, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 5/30/2013)
May 30, 2013 Filing 55 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re #45 Plaintiffs' Motion for Default Judgment. Signed by Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler on 5/30/2013. (lblc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/30/2013)
May 29, 2013 Set Deadlines/Hearings: Joint Case Management Statement due by 7/11/2013, per #54 Order. (jlm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/29/2013)
May 29, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 54 CASE MANAGEMENT SCHEDULING ORDER: Case Management Conference CONTINUED TO 7/18/2013 03:00 PM. VIA TELEPHONE. Signed by Judge ARMSTRONG on 5/29/13. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/29/2013)
May 15, 2013 Filing 53 Minute Entry: Motion for Default Judgment Hearing held on 5/15/2013 before Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler (Date Filed: 5/15/2013): re #45 MOTION for Default Judgment by the Court as to Defendants filed by Rovio Entertainment Ltd. Motion for Default Judgment Hearing set for 5/30/2013 at 10:30 AM in Courtroom C, 15th Floor, San Francisco before Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler. (Recording #FTR: 9:53-9:58) (ls, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 5/15/2013)
May 13, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 52 ORDER regarding Defendant Jong K. Park's appearance at the hearing on Plaintiff's motion for default judgment. Signed by Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler on 5/13/2013. (The court also will email this order to Mr. Jong.)(lblc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/13/2013)
May 13, 2013 CLERKS NOTICE SETTING A TELEPHONIC HEARING RE: MOTION FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT for May 15, 2013 at 9:30 a.m. Given the procedural nature of the case, counsel for Rovio need to appear only briefly by telephone and should not appear in person. Counsel to make the necessary arrangements for telephonic appearance through CourtCall. (This is a docket text entry only. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ls, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/13/2013)
April 24, 2013 CLERKS NOTICE VACATING MOTION HEARING on May 16, 2013 at 9:30 a.m. before Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler. Motion for Default Judgment Hearing reset to 5/15/2013 at 9:30 AM in Courtroom C, 15th Floor, San Francisco before Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler. (This is a docket text entry only. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ls, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/24/2013)
April 17, 2013 Filing 51 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Rovio Entertainment Ltd re #45 MOTION for Default Judgment by the Court as to Defendants (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service Federal Express Delivery Receipt)(Drangel, Jason) (Filed on 4/17/2013)
April 12, 2013 CLERKS NOTICE VACATING MOTION FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT on May 2, 2013 at 9:30 a.m. Plaintiff's Motion for Default Judgment Hearing reset for 5/16/2013 at 9:30 AM in Courtroom C, 15th Floor, San Francisco before Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler. (This is a docket text entry only. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ls, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/12/2013)
April 11, 2013 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #45 Motion for Default Judgment by the Court as to Defendants. Motion Hearing set for 5/2/2013 09:30 AM in Courtroom C, 15th Floor, San Francisco before Judge Louis C. Bechtle. (jlm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/11/2013)
April 11, 2013 Filing 50 [PUBLIC VERSION] Declaration of Kris Buckner in Support of #45 Motion for Default Judgment by the Court as to Defendants (Originally Filed in Support of Plaintiff's Ex Parte Motion for a Temporary Restraining Order), filed by Rovio Entertainment Ltd. (Related document(s) #45 ) (Drangel, Jason) (Filed on 4/11/2013) Modified on 4/12/2013 (jlm, COURT STAFF). Modified on 4/12/2013 (jlm, COURT STAFF). Modified on 4/12/2013 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
April 11, 2013 Filing 49 [PUBLIC VERSION] Declaration of Steven Greenfield in Support of #45 Motion for Default Judgment by the Court as to Defendants (Originally Filed in Support of Plaintiff's Ex Parte Motion for a Temporary Restraining Order), filed by Rovio Entertainment Ltd. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-C, #2 Exhibit D-E)(Related document(s) #45 ) (Drangel, Jason) (Filed on 4/11/2013) Modified on 4/12/2013 (jlm, COURT STAFF). Modified on 4/12/2013 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
April 11, 2013 Filing 48 [PUBLIC VERSION] Declaration of Mikael Hed in Support of #45 Motion for Default Judgment by the Court as to Defendants (Originally Filed in Support of Plaintiff's Ex Parte Motion for a Temporary Restraining Order), filed by Rovio Entertainment Ltd. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-O)(Related document(s) #45 ) (Drangel, Jason) (Filed on 4/11/2013) Modified on 4/12/2013 (jlm, COURT STAFF). Modified on 4/12/2013 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
April 11, 2013 Filing 47 [PUBLIC VERSION] Declaration of Michael Lansing in Support of #45 Motion for Default Judgment by the Court as to Defendants (Originally Filed in Support of Plaintiff's Ex Parte Motion for a Temporary Restraining Order), filed by Rovio Entertainment Ltd. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-2)(Related document(s) #45 ) (Drangel, Jason) (Filed on 4/11/2013) Modified on 4/12/2013 (jlm, COURT STAFF). Modified on 4/12/2013 (jlm, COURT STAFF). Modified on 4/12/2013 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
April 11, 2013 Filing 46 [PUBLIC VERSION] Declaration of Jason M. Drangel in Support of #45 Motion for Default Judgment by the Court as to Defendants (Originally Filed in Support of Plaintiff's Ex Parte Motion for a Temporary Restraining Order), filed by Rovio Entertainment Ltd. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-F, #2 Exhibit G, #3 Exhibit H, #4 Exhibit I-K, #5 Exhibit L-M)(Related document(s) #45 ) (Drangel, Jason) (Filed on 4/11/2013) Modified on 4/12/2013 (jlm, COURT STAFF). Modified on 4/12/2013 (jlm, COURT STAFF). Modified on 4/12/2013 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
April 11, 2013 Filing 45 MOTION for Default Judgment by the Court as to Defendants, filed by Rovio Entertainment Ltd.. Motion hearing set for 05/02/13 at 9:30 AM, before Hon. Judge Laurel Beeler, Courtroom C, 15th Floor, U.S. District Court, 450 Golden Gate Ave., S.F., CA 94102. Responses due by 4/25/2013. Replies due by 5/2/2013. (Drangel, Jason) (Filed on 4/11/2013) Modified on 4/12/2013 (jlm, COURT STAFF). Modified on 4/12/2013 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
March 28, 2013 Filing 44 Transcript of Proceedings held on 1/28/13, before Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero. Court Reporter Kelly L. Shainline, Email courtreporter232@aol.com, Telephone number (510)828-9404. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/26/2013. (Bryce, Kelly) (Filed on 3/28/2013)
March 13, 2013 Filing 43 TRANSCRIPT DESIGNATION Request for Transcript by Rovio Entertainment Ltd for proceedings held on 01/28/2013 before Judge Joseph C. Spero.. (Drangel, Jason) (Filed on 3/13/2013)
March 13, 2013 Filing 42 NOTICE OF REFERRAL. (ls, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/13/2013)
March 13, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 41 CASE MANAGEMENT SCHEDULING ORDER:, ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge for Report and Recommendation Case Management Conference set for 5/30/2013 03:15 PM. VIA TELEPHONE. Signed by Judge ARMSTRONG on 3/13/13. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/13/2013)
March 13, 2013 CASE REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler for Report and Recommendation (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/13/2013)
March 11, 2013 Filing 40 Letter to Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero Seeking Sanctions Against Defendants for Spoliation of Evidence and for Selling Counterfeit Goods in Direct Violation of Three Judicial Orders Entered on 11/06/12, 11/27/12 and 01/30/13, from Jason M. Drangel, on 03/11/13 (Drangel, Jason) (Filed on 3/11/2013) Modified on 3/12/2013 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
March 4, 2013 Filing 39 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by Rovio Entertainment Ltd. (Drangel, Jason) (Filed on 3/4/2013) Modified on 3/5/2013 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
January 30, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER GRANTING re #33 Letter/Motion to Conduct Limited Discovery on an Expedited Basis, and for Preservation of Evidence filed by Rovio Entertainment Ltd. Signed Magistrate by Judge Joseph C. Spero on 1/30/13. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/30/2013) Modified on 1/31/2013 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
January 28, 2013 Filing 37 Minute Entry: Telephonic Discovery Hearing held on 1/28/2013 before Joseph C. Spero re: Motion to Conduct Limited Discovery, docket no. 33. Motion Granted. (Court Reporter Kelly Shainline.) (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 1/28/2013)
January 24, 2013 Filing 36 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Rovio Entertainment Ltd re #35 Clerks Notice, (Drangel, Jason) (Filed on 1/24/2013)
January 24, 2013 CLERKS NOTICE Case Management Conference continued to 3/13/2013 02:30 PM. via telephone.THIS IS A TEXT ENTRY ONLY. THERE IS NO DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/24/2013)
January 23, 2013 Filing 35 CLERKS NOTICE. Telephonic Discovery Hearing set for 1/28/2013 at 10:30 AM in Courtroom G, 15th Floor, San Francisco before Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero re: Plaintiff's Motion to Conduct Limited Discovery on an Expedited Basis, docket no. 33. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/23/2013)
January 17, 2013 CASE REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero for Discovery (rmm2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/17/2013)
January 16, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge for Discovery purposes. Signed by Judge ARMSTRONG on 1/16/13. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/16/2013)
January 15, 2013 Filing 33 Letter to Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong Requesting Right to Enter Defendants' Business Premises on an Expedited Basis to Conduct Discovery, from Jason M. Drangel, dated 01/15/13. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - D)(Drangel, Jason) (Filed on 1/15/2013) Modified on 1/16/2013 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
December 14, 2012 Filing 32 Clerks Notice of ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Defendants: Royal Plush Toys, Inc., Western Sales & Service Inc., Royal Trade International Inc. and Jong K. Park, on 12/14/2012. (Related documents(s) #31 )(jlm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/14/2012)
December 13, 2012 Filing 31 MOTION for Entry of Default Clerk as to Defendants Royal Plush Toys, Inc., Western Sales & Service Inc., Royal Trade International Inc. and Jong K. Park, filed by Rovio Entertainment Ltd. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Jason M. Drangel in Support of Request for Entry of Default)(Drangel, Jason) (Filed on 12/13/2012) Modified on 12/13/2012 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
December 6, 2012 Filing 30 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Rovio Entertainment Ltd re #28 Order Granting Preliminary Injunction and Request for Expedited Discovery and Plaintiff's First Set of Requests for the Production of Documents and Things (Drangel, Jason) (Filed on 12/6/2012)
November 29, 2012 Filing 29 Receipt for Preliminary Injunction Bond, in the amount of $5,000.00. Receipt no. 44611009732, re #28 Order (jlm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/29/2012)
November 27, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER Granting Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction and Motion to Conduct Expedited Discovery #6 (sbalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/27/2012)
November 15, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong GRANTING #19 Motion for Pro Hac Vice for Jason M. Drangel (jlm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/15/2012)
November 15, 2012 Filing 26 Declaration of Brittni Popp in Support of Motion for Preliminary Injunction, filed by Rovio Entertainment Ltd. (Related document(s)) (Drey, Nicole) (Filed on 11/15/2012) Modified on 11/16/2012 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
November 15, 2012 Filing 25 Declaration of Sean Reidy in Support of Motion for Preliminary Injunction, filed by Rovio Entertainment Ltd. (Related document(s)) (Drey, Nicole) (Filed on 11/15/2012) Modified on 11/16/2012 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
November 15, 2012 Filing 24 Reply Memorandum re Motion for Preliminary Injunction, filed by Rovio Entertainment Ltd. (Drey, Nicole) (Filed on 11/15/2012) Modified on 11/16/2012 (jlm, COURT STAFF). Modified on 11/16/2012 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
November 9, 2012 Filing 23 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Rovio Entertainment Ltd (Proof of Service Summons and Complaint on Defendant Jong K. Park) (Drey, Nicole) (Filed on 11/9/2012)
November 9, 2012 Filing 22 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Rovio Entertainment Ltd (Proof of Service Summons and Complaint on Defendant Royal Trade International Inc.) (Drey, Nicole) (Filed on 11/9/2012)
November 9, 2012 Filing 21 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Rovio Entertainment Ltd (Proof of Service Summons and Complaint on Defendant Western Sales and Services Inc.) (Drey, Nicole) (Filed on 11/9/2012)
November 9, 2012 Filing 20 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Rovio Entertainment Ltd (Proof of Service Summons and Complaint on Defendant Royal Plush Toys, Inc.) (Drey, Nicole) (Filed on 11/9/2012)
November 7, 2012 Filing 19 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice for Jason M. Drangel ( Filing fee $ 305, receipt number 0971-7257635.) filed by Rovio Entertainment Ltd. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Drangel, Jason) (Filed on 11/7/2012) Modified on 11/16/2012 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
November 6, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER UNSEALING CASE: by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton DENYING #6 Ex Parte Motion for TRO and for Seizure Order; GRANTING #6 Motion for Order to Show Cause; DENYING WITHOUT PREJUDICE #6 Motion to Expedite Discovery Order; and DENYING #6 Motion to Substitute Custodian. A hearing on Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction is set for 11/21/12 at 1:00 PM, in Courtoom 1, 4th Floor. Defendants Opposition due by 11/13/12; Plaintiff's Reply due by 11/15/12. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton for Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong, on 11/06/12 (jlm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/6/2012) Modified on 11/6/2012 (jlm, COURT STAFF). Modified on 11/6/2012 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
November 6, 2012 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #18 Responses due by 11/13/2012. Replies due by 11/15/2012. Motion Hearing set for 11/21/2012 01:00 PM in Courtroom 1, 4th Floor, Oakland before Hon. Saundra Brown Armstrong. (jlm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/6/2012)
October 29, 2012 Filing 17 REPORT on the filing or determination of an action regarding copyright (cc: form mailed to register). (kcS, ) (Filed on 10/29/2012)
October 29, 2012 Filing 16 REPORT on the filing or determination of an action regarding trademark (cc: form mailed to register). (kcS, ) (Filed on 10/29/2012)
October 29, 2012 Filing 15 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Rovio Entertainment Ltd. (kcS, ) (Filed on 10/29/2012)
October 29, 2012 Filing 14 Notice of Interested Entities by Rovio Entertainment Ltd (kcS, ) (Filed on 10/29/2012)
October 29, 2012 Filing 13 Proposed Order re #6 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order, for Order to Show Cause, to Expedite Discovery, and to Substitute Custodian by Rovio Entertainment Ltd. (kcS, ) (Filed on 10/29/2012)
October 29, 2012 Filing 12 Declaration of Mikael Hed in Support of #6 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order, for Order to Show Cause, to Expedite Discovery, and to Substitute Custodian filed byRovio Entertainment Ltd. (Related document(s) #6 ) (kcS, ) (Filed on 10/29/2012)
October 29, 2012 Filing 11 Declaration of Jason M. Drangel in Support of #6 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order, for Order to Show Cause, to Expedite Discovery, and to Substitute Custodian filed byRovio Entertainment Ltd. (Related document(s) #6 ) (kcS, ) (Filed on 10/29/2012)
October 29, 2012 Filing 10 Declaration of Nicole L. Drey in Support of #6 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order, for Order to Show Cause, to Expedite Discovery, and to Substitute Custodian filed byRovio Entertainment Ltd. (Related document(s) #6 ) (kcS, ) (Filed on 10/29/2012)
October 29, 2012 Filing 9 Declaration of Steven Greenfield in Support of #6 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order, for Order to Show Cause, to Expedite Discovery, and to Substitute Custodian filed byRovio Entertainment Ltd. (Related document(s) #6 ) (kcS, ) (Filed on 10/29/2012)
October 29, 2012 Filing 8 Declaration of Kris Buckner in Support of #6 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order, for Order to Show Cause, to Expedite Discovery, and to Substitute Custodian filed byRovio Entertainment Ltd. (Related document(s) #6 ) (kcS, ) (Filed on 10/29/2012)
October 29, 2012 Filing 7 MEMORANDUM in Support of #6 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order, for Order to Show Cause, to Expedite Discovery, and to Substitute Custodian filed byRovio Entertainment Ltd. (Related document(s) #6 ) (kcS, ) (Filed on 10/29/2012)
October 29, 2012 Filing 6 APPLICATION for Temporary Restraining Order, for Order to Show Cause why a Preliminary Injunction Should Not Issue, for Expedited Discovery, and to Substitute Custodian filed by Rovio Entertainment Ltd. (kcS, ) (Filed on 10/29/2012)
October 29, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken GRANTING #4 Motion to Seal Case (kcS, ) (Filed on 10/29/2012)
October 29, 2012 Filing 4 MOTION to Seal Case filed by Rovio Entertainment Ltd. (kcS, ) (Filed on 10/29/2012)
October 29, 2012 Filing 3 ADR SCHEDULING ORDER: Case Management Statement due by 1/23/2013. Case Management Conference set for 1/30/2013 at 03:00 PM before Hon. Saundra Brown Armstrong. (Attachments: #1 Standing Order)(kcS, ) (Filed on 10/29/2012)
October 29, 2012 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Jong K. Park, Royal Plush Toys, Inc., Royal Trade Int'l Inc., Western Sales and Services Inc.. (kcS, ) (Filed on 10/29/2012)
October 29, 2012 Filing 1 COMPLAINT, jury trial requested, against Jong K. Park, Royal Plush Toys, Inc., Royal Trade Int'l Inc., Western Sales and Services Inc. (Filing fee $350, receipt number 44611009586). Filed byRovio Entertainment Ltd. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(kcS, ) (Filed on 10/29/2012)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rovio Entertainment LTD v. Royal Plush Toys, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Western Sales and Services Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Royal Trade Int'l Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: President Jong K. Park
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Royal Plush Toys, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rovio Entertainment Ltd
Represented By: John Donald Guerrini
Represented By: Annie S. Wang
Represented By: J. Andrew Coombs
Represented By: Jason M. Drangel
Represented By: Nicole Drey Huerter
Represented By: Robert A. Hartley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: US Department of Justice
Represented By: Susan Frances Knight
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?